Daryl Agnew, et al v. Government of the District of
Original Case: 1:15-cv-00340
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cvpri-07114 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2019 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Government of the District of Columbia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Daryl Thomas Agnew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Alex Dennis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Rayneka Williamson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:28 AM EDT |
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. 17-7114 | ||
NOTICE OF APPEAL [1686110] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:15-cv-00340-ABJ filed by Daryl Thomas Agnew, Alex Dennis and Rayneka Williamson. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 17-7114 17-7114 | ||
CLERK'S ORDER [1686112] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/28/2017. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/28/2017. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/28/2017. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/28/2017. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/28/2017. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/28/2017. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/28/2017. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/28/2017. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/11/2017; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 08/28/2017. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/28/2017. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/28/2017. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/11/2017 17-7114 |