Hoag Urgent Care - Orange, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 8:17-bk-13077
Lead case is: 8:17-bk-13077
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Theodor Albert |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-13079 |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 02, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Hoag Urgent Care - Orange, Inc.
7630 E Chapman Ave Ste B
Orange, CA 92869-8536 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
Docket last updated: 08/01/2017 5:00 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Wed 08/02 12:37 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:17-bk-13079) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 45318865. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Case Reassigned (Manual)
Wed 08/02 4:44 PM
Judge Theodor Albert added to case, per low number. Case affiliated to 8:17-bk-13077-TA - Hoag Urgent Care-Tustin, Inc. Involvement of Judge Catherine E. Bauer Terminated (Corona, Heidi) |
||
1 | 1
38
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 08/02 12:35 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Hoag Urgent Care - Orange, Inc. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 08/16/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 08/16/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 08/16/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 08/16/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 08/16/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 08/16/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 08/16/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 08/16/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 08/16/2017. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 08/16/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 08/16/2017.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 09/1/2017 (McDow, Ashley) |