Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-13008

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:17-ap-01126
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2017
Terminated:Feb 15, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bari Home Corporation
Represented By
Bari Home Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Sue Naylor, Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Christopher Minier
Ringstad & Sanders LLP
contact info
Trustee
Karen S Naylor (TR)
P.O. Box 504
Santa Ana, CA 92702
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Thursday, December 19, 2019
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 12/19 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/19/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
33 33 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Tue 12/17 11:59 AM
Order Approving Stipulation Regarding Assignment Order. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/17/2019 (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 32
Friday, December 13, 2019
32 32 motion Stipulation (motion) Fri 12/13 3:02 PM
Stipulation By Karen S Naylor (TR) and Standard Textile Co., Inc. Regarding Assignment Order Filed by Trustee Karen S Naylor (TR) (Ramsaur, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
31 31 misc Proof of service Wed 08/07 2:53 PM
Proof of service (Process Receipt and Return) Levy Writ of Execution; Served at U.S. Bank; Notice sent to Brett Ramsur; Filed by Other Professional US Marshal Filed by Related [+]. (Toliver, Wanda)
Related: [-] 22 Writ of execution
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
30 30 misc Proof of service Wed 07/10 10:27 AM
Proof of service of Assignment Order on WestPoint Home, Inc. Filed by Trustee Karen S Naylor (TR). (Ramsaur, Brett)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Proof of service Wed 07/10 10:27 AM
Proof of service of Assignment Order on Standard Textile Co., Inc. Filed by Trustee Karen S Naylor (TR). (Ramsaur, Brett)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Proof of service Wed 07/10 10:25 AM
Proof of service of Assignment Order on Bari Home Corporation Filed by Trustee Karen S Naylor (TR). (Ramsaur, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
27 27 misc Proof of service Tue 07/09 10:03 AM
Proof of service of Assignment Order on Kohl's Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor. (Ramsaur, Brett)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
26 26 misc Proof of service Tue 07/02 9:07 AM
Proof of service (Process Receipt and Return) Writ of Execution/ served at Habib American Bank; notice of service copy sent to Brett Ramsur; Filed by other professional US Dept of Justice US Marshals Serv. Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor Related [+]. (Toliver, Wanda)
Related: [-] 22 Writ of execution
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 06/05 9:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Application for Service of Process by Registered Process Server (BNC-PDF)
Monday, June 03, 2019
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Application for Service of Process by Registered Process Server (BNC-PDF) Mon 06/03 5:57 PM
Order Approving Levy Of Writ Of Execution By Registered Process Server Nationwide Legal, LLC (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 6/3/2019 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 23
Thursday, May 30, 2019
23 23 motion Application for Service of Process by Registered Process Server (motion) Thu 05/30 6:13 PM
Application for Service of Process by Registered Process Server Judgment Creditors Ex Parte Application to Allow Service of Process for Levy or Writ of Execution by Registered Process Server Nationwide legal, LLC Filed by Trustee Karen S Naylor (TR) (Ramsaur, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
22 22 court Writ of execution Wed 05/29 3:05 PM
Writ of execution - Copy - Original issued 5/29/19 Filed by Karen Sue Naylor, Chapter 7 Trustee, attorney for plaintiff Related [+]. (Shimizu, Tina)
Related: [-] 11 DEFAULT JUDGMENT
21 21 misc Affidavit Wed 05/29 2:46 PM
Affidavit Re: Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution Filed by Attorney Natalie B Daghbandan for Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor, Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Shimizu, Tina)
Related: [-] 11 DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)
Sunday, May 12, 2019
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 05/12 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/12/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Friday, May 10, 2019
19 19 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Fri 05/10 4:08 PM
Assignment Order (BNC-PDF) Related [+] - PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER RULING Signed on 5/10/2019 (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, April 25, 2019
18 18 court Hearing Held (Motion) Thu 04/25 6:07 PM
Hearing Held (Bk Motion) Related [+] MOTION IS GRANTED. MOVANT TO SUBMIT ORDER (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 16 Motion For Assignment Order
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
17 17 court Hearing Set (Motion) Tue 04/02 6:14 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 4/25/2019 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Deramus, Glenda)
Related: [-] 16 Generic Motion filed by Trustee Karen S Naylor (TR)
16 16 motion X - Motion (Generic) (motion) Tue 04/02 3:14 PM
Motion Notice of Motion and Motion for Assignment Order; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities Filed by Trustee Karen S Naylor (TR) (Ramsaur, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Brett H Ramsaur in support of Motion
Att: 2 Proof of Service
Thursday, February 15, 2018
15 15 court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/15 5:35 PM
Adversary Case 8:17-ap-1126 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2018
14 14 court Hearing Held (Other) Fri 01/26 3:09 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] - VACATED: PER DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED 1/12/2018 - (Law, Tamika)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
13 13 misc Declaration Tue 01/16 1:58 PM
Declaration re: Arlene Martin Regarding Service of Entered Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor Related [+]. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-] 11 DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)
Sunday, January 14, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 01/14 9:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/14/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF)
Friday, January 12, 2018
11 11 order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Fri 01/12 5:07 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor, Chapter 7 Trustee, and against Defendant Bari Home Corporation (BNC-PDF) Signed on 1/12/2018 Related [+]. (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
Thursday, January 11, 2018
10 10 court Hearing Held (Motion) Thu 01/11 6:01 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] - MOTION IS GRANTED. MOVANT TO SUBMIT ORDER. (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
Monday, December 04, 2017
9 9 court Hearing Set (Motion) Tue 12/05 10:46 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 1/11/2018 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
8 8 motion Default Judgment (motion) Mon 12/04 3:27 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Under LBR 7055-1 Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor Default Judgment Motion due by 01/3/2018. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
7 7 notice Notice Tue 10/31 1:06 PM
Notice of Continued Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor Related [+]. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 8:17-ap-01126. Complaint by Karen Sue Naylor, Chapter 7 Trustee against Bari Home Corporation. (Charge To Estate). (Fee: $350.00) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfer Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Minier, Christopher) Modified on 8/3/2017. filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
Thursday, October 26, 2017
6 6 court Hearing Continued (Other) Mon 10/30 4:19 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] - STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING CONTINUED TO 1/25/2018 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701 - MINIER TO GIVE NOTICE. - The case judge is Theodor Albert (Law, Tamika)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
Thursday, October 12, 2017
5 5 misc Status report Thu 10/12 3:12 PM
Status report Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor Related [+]. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, August 04, 2017
4 4 notice Notice Fri 08/04 12:22 PM
Notice of Need to Comply With Local Bankruptcy Rule 7026-1, Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7026, and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 to Defendant, Bari Home Corporation Filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor Related [+]. (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 8:17-ap-01126. Complaint by Karen Sue Naylor, Chapter 7 Trustee against Bari Home Corporation. (Charge To Estate). (Fee: $350.00) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfer Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Minier, Christopher) Modified on 8/3/2017. filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/04 12:12 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bari Home Corporation 8/4/2017 (Minier, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 08/03 11:12 AM
Summons Issued on Bari Home Corporation Date Issued 8/3/2017, Answer Due 9/5/2017 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 10/26/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5B, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Theodor Albert (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Karen Sue Naylor
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/02 3:43 PM
Adversary case 8:17-ap-01126. Complaint by Karen Sue Naylor, Chapter 7 Trustee against Bari Home Corporation. (Charge To Estate). (Fee: $350.00) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfer Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Minier, Christopher) Modified on 8/3/2017 (Steinberg, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]