California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:15-bk-13008
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2015
Creditor Meeting:May 18, 2016
Claims Deadline:May 08, 2017
Converted:Mar 30, 2016
Terminated:Aug 01, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Anna's Linens, Inc.
3550 Hyland Avenue
Costa Mesa, CA 92626
Represented By
Juliet Y Oh
contact info
Todd M Arnold
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P
contact info
Eve H Karasik
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Brill L.L.P
contact info
Lindsey L Smith
Levene, Neale, Bender, Rankin & Bri
contact info
Ian Landsberg
Ecoff Landsberg, LLP
contact info
John-Patrick M Fritz
Levene Neale Bender Yoo Et Al
contact info
David B Golubchik
Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Brill LLP
contact info
Daniel J Weintraub
Weintraub & Selth Apc
contact info
Jeffrey S Kwong
Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Brill LLP
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 24, 2015 2:15 PM PDT
Attorney
A-S 106 Pasadena Town Center, L.P.
2 Riverway, Suite 700
Houston, TX 77056
Represented By
James V Lombardi, III
Ross Banks May Cron Cavin PC
contact info
Attorney
Earth Link
307 International Circle, Suite 270
Hunt Valley, MD 21030
Represented By
Denise Diaz
contact info
Attorney
Eldia M Diaz-Olmo
PO Box 363952
SAN JUAN, PR 00936
Attorney
Brazos TC South-Partnership A, L.P.
Ross Banks May Cron & Cavin, P.C c/o James V Lombardi, III 2 Riverway, Suite 700
Houston, TX 77056
Represented By
James V Lombardi, III
Ross Banks May Cron Cavin PC
contact info
Creditor
ROIC California, LLC
Represented By
Christopher L Parnell
Dunn Carney Allen Higins Tongue LLP
contact info
Creditor
Vestar California XXVI, LLC
Represented By
Ernie Zachary Park
Bewley Lassleben & Miller
contact info
Creditor
KDI Atlanta Mall, LLC
Represented By
Heather D Brown
Brown Law LLC
contact info
Creditor
Kenney Mtg.
Represented By
Wanda Borges
Borges And Associates LLC
contact info
Creditor
Vestar California XXVI, L.L.C.
Represented By
William Novotny
contact info
Creditor
Liberty Property Limited Partnership
Represented By
John E Lucian
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Christopher J Petersen
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Creditor
Linder Ventures IV, LLC
Sands Anderson PC PO Box 1998
Richmond, VA 23219
Represented By
William A Gray
Sands Anderson PC
contact info
Creditor
Linton Delray, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin P Branch
C/o Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
P&A Marketing
Represented By
David J Mahoney
Silverman Acampora LLP
contact info
Creditor
Panda Home Fashions LLC
Represented By
David J Mahoney
Silverman Acampora LLP
contact info
Creditor
Peter P. Bollinger 2003 LLC
Trainor Fairbrook 980 Fulton Avenue
Sacramento, CA 95825
Represented By
Jennifer Pruski
Trainor Fairbrook
contact info
Creditor
Hilco Merchant Resources, Llc
Represented By
Jonathan J Faria
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Joshua A Sussberg
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ramco-Gershenson Properties, LP
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin P Branch
C/o Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
RioCan America Management, LP
Represented By
Karen C Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
S. Lichtenberg & Co., Inc.
Represented By
Christopher J Petersen
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Michael Z Brownstein
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Creditor
SM 101 SIX, LLC
Represented By
Gordon G May
Grant Genovese & Baratta LLP
contact info
Creditor
UCR Asset Services
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin P Branch
C/o Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Simon Property Group, Inc.
225 W. Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Ronald M Tucker, Esq
contact info
Creditor
Starwood Retail Partners LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin P Branch
C/o Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Represented By
Kimberly Walsh
Texas Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
Transplace Texas, LP
Represented By
Rick A Steinberg
Nowell Amoroso Klein Bierman
contact info
Creditor
Ivie & Associates, Inc.
Represented By
Gary B Elmer
Ciardi Ciardi & Astin
contact info
Creditor
Watt Management Company
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin P Branch
C/o Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
WV Morgantown Crossings, LLC t/a Morgantown Crossings, L.P.
Represented By
Daniel R Utain
Kaplin Steward Meloff Reiter And Stein
contact info
Creditor
Acadia Realty Trust
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin P Branch
C/o Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Arlington ISD
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins Mott LLP c/o Elizabeth Banda Calvo 500 E Border St Ste 640
Arlington, TX 76094
Represented By
Eboney Cobb
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott Ll
contact info
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott Ll
contact info
Creditor
Aston Properties, DDR Corp., Equity One LLC, Gregory Greenfield & Associates, Ltd., Philips International and Rouse Properties, Inc.
Represented By
Eric R Wilson
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Creditor
Beatrice Home Fashions, Inc.
151 Helen Street
South Plainfield, NJ 07080
Represented By
David L Bruck
Greenbaum Rowe Smith Davis LLP
contact info
Creditor
Brentwood Originals, Inc.
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin P Branch
C/o Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Brixmor Property Group Inc.
Represented By
David L Pollack
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
City Of Lake Worth
Represented By
Eboney Cobb
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott Ll
contact info
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott Ll
contact info
Creditor
Countre Club Centre, LLC
Trainor Fairbrook 980 Fulton Avenue
Sacramento, CA 95825
Represented By
Jennifer Pruski
Trainor Fairbrook
contact info
Creditor
WP Glimcher Inc.
Represented By
Ronald E Gold
Frost Brown Todd LLC
contact info
Creditor
Crowley ISD
Represented By
Eboney Cobb
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott Ll
contact info
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott Ll
contact info
Creditor
Dallas County
Represented By
Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Deutsche Asset & Wealth Management
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin P Branch
C/o Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Gordon Brothers Retail Partners LLC
Represented By
Jonathan J Faria
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Joshua A Sussberg
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Creditor
Greenleaf Advertising & Media, Inc.
Represented By
Gary B Elmer
Ciardi Ciardi & Astin
contact info
Creditor
JANAF Shopping Center, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 2600
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Dustin P Branch
C/o Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
10100 Santa Monica Blvd., Ste 1300
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Jeffrey N Pomerantz
contact info
Creditor Committee
OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By
Jeffrey N Pomerantz
contact info
James KT Hunter
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Shirley Cho
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Stanley E Goldich
contact info
Ira D. Kharasch
Pachulski Stang Ziehl, Et Al.
contact info
Interested Party
Salus Capital Partners, LLC
1840 Century Park East Suite 1900
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Howard Steinberg
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Mette H Kurth
Fox Rothschild LLP 1800 Century Park East Ste 300 Los Angeles
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Mette H Kurth
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Joint Ventura Comprising Tiger Capital Group, LLC and Yellen Partners, LLC
Represented By
Evan D Smiley
Smiley Wang-Ekvall, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Courtesy NEF
Represented By
Andrew A Goodman
Greenberg & Bass
contact info
Roye Zur
Landau Gottfried & Berger LLP
contact info
Leslie A Cohen
Leslie Cohen Law PC
contact info
Juliet Y Oh
contact info
Kevin M Newman
Menter, Rudin & Trivelpiece, P.C.
contact info
Michael Avanesian
Simon Resnik Hayes, LLP
contact info
Robert Brier
contact info
Steven N Kurtz
Levinson Arshonsky & Kurtz LLP
contact info
Amanda N Ferns
Ferns Adams & Associates
contact info
David M Poitras
Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell LLP
contact info
William J Levant
Kaplin Stewart Meloff Reiter And Stein
contact info
Rebecca J Winthrop
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Eldia M Diaz-Olmo
Eldia M Diaz Olmo Law Offices
contact info
Steven T Gubner
Ezra Brutzkus & Gubner
contact info
Richard Girgado
contact info
Barouir B Yeretzian
Hinds & Shankman LLP
contact info
Robert S Marticello
Smiley Wang-Ekvall, LLP
contact info
Scott H Siegel
Levinson Arshonsky & Kurtz, LLP
contact info
Dustin P Branch
C/o Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Sidney Garabato
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC
contact info
Doah Kim
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Evan D Smiley
Smiley Wang-Ekvall, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
99 Cents Only Stores
Represented By
Andrew Haley
contact info
Andrew S Pauly
contact info
Trustee
Karen S Naylor (TR)
P.O. Box 504
Santa Ana, CA 92702
Represented By
Jason B Komorsky
Brutzkus Gubner
contact info
Andrew Still
contact info
Brett Ramsaur
Ramsaur Law Office
contact info
James C Bastian, Jr
contact info
Nanette D Sanders
Ringstad & Sanders
contact info
Richard C Donahoo
Ringstad & Sanders LLP
contact info
Todd C. Ringstad
contact info
Steven T Gubner
Ezra Brutzkus & Gubner
contact info
Ashley M Teesdale
contact info
Brian R Nelson
Ringstad & Sanders LLP
contact info
Jerrold L Bregman
Brutzkus Gubner Rozansky Seror Weber LLP
contact info
Christopher Minier
Ringstad & Sanders LLP
contact info
Melissa Davis Lowe
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 9041
Santa Ana, CA 92701
Represented By
Michael J Hauser
contact info
Frank Cadigan
contact info


1. Anna's Linens to close (times-herald.com)
Submitted Mon 07/20/2015
2. Discount home goods retailer Anna's Linens files for bankruptcy (valleymorningstar.com)
Submitted Tue 07/07/2015
3. Costa Mesa-based Anna's Linens files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy protection (ocregister.com)
Submitted Tue 06/16/2015
Docket last updated: 11/30/2022 8:24 AM PST
Sunday, June 14, 2015
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Sun 06/14 9:24 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:15-bk-13008) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40147092. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 1879 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 06/14 8:56 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Anna's Linens, Inc. List of Equity Security Holders due 06/29/2015. Summary of Schedules (Form B6 Pg 1) due 06/29/2015. Schedule A (Form B6A) due 06/29/2015. Schedule B (Form B6B) due 06/29/2015. Schedule D (Form B6D) due 06/29/2015. Schedule E (Form B6E) due 06/29/2015. Schedule F (Form B6F) due 06/29/2015. Schedule G (Form B6G) due 06/29/2015. Schedule H (Form B6H) due 06/29/2015. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules (Form B6) due 06/29/2015. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form B7) due 06/29/2015. Corporate Ownership Statement due by 06/29/2015.Statement of Related Cases due 06/29/2015. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form B203) due 06/29/2015. Incomplete Filings due by 06/29/2015. (Golubchik, David) WARNING: Item subsequently amended by docket #3, #4. 72 HOURS DEFICIENCY: Master Mailing List of Creditors must be uploaded in CM/ECF due 6/18/2015. Modified on 6/15/2015 (Shimizu, Tina)
Related: [-]
2 2 1879 pgs misc Addendum to Vol Pet Sun 06/14 10:09 PM
Addendum to voluntary petition (Amended) Filed by Debtor Anna's Linens, Inc.. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]