Layfield & Barrett, APC
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Neil W Bason |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-19548 |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2017 |
Debtor
Layfield & Barrett, APC
2720 Homestead Rd Ste 210
Park City, UT 84098-4887 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Petitioning Creditor
The Dominguez Firm
3250 Wilshire Blvd #2200
Los Angeles, CA 90010 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Mario Lara
5407 Sierra Vista #301
Los Angeles, CA 90038 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Nayazi Reyes
1549 W San Bernadino Rd Apt S
West Covina, CA 91790 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Maria A Rios
520 W Cressey St
Compton, CA 90222 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
GPO
Apr 23 2018
Order Denying stay motion (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # 253) Signed on 4/23/2018 (Sumlin, Sharon E.) |
Docket last updated: 08/02/2017 5:00 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
court
U - Assigned Judge to a case (Manual)
Thu 08/03 4:11 PM
Judge Neil W. Bason added to case due to related case 2:17-bk-18433-NB Maximum Legal (California), LLP (Ly, Lynn) |
||
court
X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired)
Thu 08/03 9:31 PM
Receipt of Involuntary Filing Fee - $335.00 by 20. Receipt Number 20220760. (admin) |
||
1 | 1
5
pgs
misc
Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Official Form 105 or 205)
Thu 08/03 4:09 PM
Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition Against a Non-Individual. Fee Amount $335 Re: Layfield & Barrett, APC Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): The Dominguez Firm (attorney Alan J Watson), Mario Lara (attorney Patricia Salcedo), Nayazi Reyes (attorney Patricia Salcedo), Maria A Rios (attorney Patricia Salcedo) . (Ly, Lynn) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration
Thu 08/03 4:24 PM
Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form 1015-2.1) , Declaration of Nellie Q Barnard in support of Involuntary Petition as Related to In Re: Maximum Legal (California) LLP Filed by Attorney Alan J Watson for Petitioning Creditor The Dominguez Firm . (Ly, Lynn) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Emergency motion (motion)
Thu 08/03 6:01 PM
Emergency motion FOR APPOINTMENT OF AN INTERIM TRUSTEE UNDER 11 U.S.C. § 303(G) AND GRANTING EMERGENCY RELIEF Filed by Petitioning Creditors Mario Lara, Nayazi Reyes, Maria A Rios, The Dominguez Firm (Watson, Alan) |
|
Att: 1 4 pgs Declaration of Joseph Barrett | ||
Att: 2 17 pgs Declaration of Nellie Barnard | ||
Att: 3 31 pgs Declaration of Patricia Salcedo | ||
4 | 4
court
Involuntary Summons Issued
Thu 08/03 6:10 PM
Involuntary Summons Issued on Layfield & Barrett, APC AND Notice of Status Conference in an Involuntary Bankruptcy Case set for 9/19/2017 at 11AM; (Garcia, Elaine L.) |
|
5 | 5
court
Hearing Set (Other)
Thu 08/03 6:11 PM
Hearing Set Status hearing to be held on 9/19/2017 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Neil W. Bason (Garcia, Elaine L.) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proof of service
Thu 08/03 6:32 PM
Proof of service docket entries 1 and 3 Filed by Petitioning Creditors Mario Lara, Nayazi Reyes, Maria A Rios, The Dominguez Firm. (Watson, Alan) |