Affeld Grivakes LLP v. Pachulski
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-19548
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-19548
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Neil W Bason |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01028 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Jan 29, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Richard M Pachulski
10100 Santa Monica Blvd. #1300
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Affeld Grivakes LLP
2049 Century Park East, Suite 2460
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 1:05 PM PDT |
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
16 | 16
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 03/19 11:58 AM
Adversary Case 2:19-ap-1028 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (Sumlin, Sharon E.) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
Fri 02/21 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/21/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Wed 02/19 9:02 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice (BNC-PDF) Signed on 2/19/2020. (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) |
|
Tuesday, February 18, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
order
Dismissing Case (BNC-PDF)
Tue 02/18 12:45 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice (BNC-PDF). Signed on 2/18/2020. (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) CORRECTION: Incorrect event code used. See docket entry14 for correction. Modified on 2/19/2020 (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina). This notice was not mailed. Modified on 2/19/2020 (Smith, Cynthia Joyce) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Stipulation (motion)
Fri 02/14 4:16 PM
Stipulation By Richard M Pachulski and Affeld Grivakes LLP - Stipulated Dismissal Filed by Defendant Richard M Pachulski (Hunter, James) |
|
Thursday, November 14, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
Hearing Held (Other)
Thu 11/14 4:00 PM
Hearing Held on 11/12/19 at 2:00 p.m.: Continued to 12/10/19 at 11:00 a.m. (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Statement
Fri 11/08 11:05 AM
Statement /Joint Statement of Parties re Settlement and Rule 9019(a) Motion Filed by Defendant Richard M Pachulski. (Hunter, James) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Wed 10/02 3:19 PM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Status Hearing to be held on 11/12/2019 at 02:00 PM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1545 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (Sumlin, Sharon E.) |
||
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Wed 10/02 3:20 PM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Status Hearing to be held on 12/03/2019 at 09:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1545 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (Sumlin, Sharon E.) |
||
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Status report
Tue 09/24 3:53 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Affeld Grivakes LLP . (Robinson, Damion) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mediator's cert conclusion (unsettled)
Fri 08/16 2:51 PM
Mediator's certificate regarding conclusion of mediation conference (unsettled) Filed by . (Francis, Dawnette) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Fri 08/02 4:08 PM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Status Hearing to be held on 10/01/2019 at 02:00 PM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1545 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (Sumlin, Sharon E.) |
||
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Mon 06/17 9:09 AM
Notice of lodgment of Order Directing Parties to Mediation Filed by Plaintiff Affeld Grivakes LLP . (Robinson, Damion) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Wed 06/05 11:10 AM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Status Hearing to be held on 07/30/2019 at 11:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1545 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (Ghaltchi (Johnson), Dina) |
||
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
5
pgs
misc
Status report
Fri 05/31 5:35 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff Affeld Grivakes LLP . (Robinson, Damion) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Lodgment
Thu 04/04 5:51 PM
Notice of lodgment of Proposed Order Filed by Plaintiff Affeld Grivakes LLP .(Robinson, Damion) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
court
Hearing Continued (Other)
Thu 04/04 9:35 AM
Hearing (Adv Other) Continued Status Hearing to be held on 06/04/2019 at 11:00 AM 255 E. Temple St. Courtroom 1545 Los Angeles, CA 90012 for1 , (Milano, Sonny) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
5
pgs
misc
Status report
Mon 03/25 5:58 PM
Status report Joint Filed by Plaintiff Affeld Grivakes LLP . (Robinson, Damion) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
4
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/01 3:55 PM
Answer to Complaint /Answer of Richard M. Pachulski, Chapter 11 Trustee of Layfield & Barrett, APC Filed by Richard M Pachulski. (Hunter, James) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Thu 01/31 9:37 AM
Receipt of Complaint(2:19-ap-01028-NB) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 48447990. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Wed 01/30 5:34 PM
Summons Issued on Richard M Pachulski Date Issued 1/30/2019, Answer Due 3/1/2019 Status hearing to be held on 4/2/2019 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Neil W. Bason (Sumlin, Sharon E.) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/29 1:20 PM
Adversary case 2:19-ap-01028. Complaint by Affeld Grivakes LLP against Richard M Pachulski. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Robinson, Damion) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |