Jeffrey Cutler v. Amber Green, et al
Original Case: 2:17-cv-00984
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02709 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 31, 2018 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
RON MARTIN
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
AMBER GREEN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RALPH HUTCHINSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JUDGE MARGARET MILLER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHRISTINA L. HAUSNER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RON MARTIN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
WGAL
|
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
WGAL
|
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
JUDGE MARGARET MILLER
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JEFFREY CUTLER, East Lampeter Township Elected Tax Collector
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/31/2018 4:32 AM EDT |
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Jeffrey Cutler in District Court No. 2-17-cv-00984. (CJG) |