Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-09308

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Carol A Doyle
Case #: 1:17-ap-00411
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2017
Terminated:Nov 16, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Shanina Benjamin
Represented By
Shanina Benjamin
contact info
Defendant
John Doe Unknown Occupants
Represented By
John Doe Unknown Occupants
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald Peterson
Represented By
Ronald Peterson
Jenner & Block
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, November 16, 2017
9 9 court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/16 4:49 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-411 Closed . (Seamann, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
8 8 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Wed 11/15 4:17 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Ronald Peterson on behalf of Ronald Peterson. (Peterson, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
7 7 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 10/18 2:36 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 11/16/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 10/18/2017. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 4 Request for Issuance of Alias Summons
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
6 6 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 09/13 12:17 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 11/16/2017 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 09/13/2017. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
5 5 court Alias Summons Issued (auto) Tue 09/12 4:38 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Shanina Benjamin Answer Due 10/12/2017; John Doe Unknown Occupants Answer Due 10/12/2017 (Admin)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Request for Issuance of Alias Summons Tue 09/12 4:38 PM
Request for Issuance of Alias Summons by Ronald Peterson against Shanina Benjamin, John Doe Unknown Occupants. Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 10/18/2017 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Peterson, Ronald)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
3 3 crditcrd none Tue 08/08 3:10 PM
Receipt of Complaint 17-00411 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 35193735. Fee Amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 08/08 3:03 PM
Summons Issued on Shanina Benjamin Answer Due 09/7/2017; John Doe Unknown Occupants Answer Due 09/7/2017 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/08 3:03 PM
Adversary case 17-00411 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Ronald Peterson against Shanina Benjamin, John Doe Unknown Occupants. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 9/13/2017 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Peterson, Ronald)
Related: [-]