Joint Admin
|
1:17-bk-16651 - Oak Park Avenue Realty, Ltd.
|
05/31/2017
|
Adversary
|
1:17-ap-00411 - Peterson v. Benjamin et al
|
08/08/2017
|
Adversary
|
1:17-ap-00573 - Peterson v. MTZ Enterprises, LLC
|
11/27/2017
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-00155 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. First Secure Bank & Trust Company
|
05/01/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-00905 - Peterson v. Dasher Texas 2, LLC
|
11/13/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:18-ap-00913 - Peterson v. Property Holdings LLC
|
11/19/2018
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00010 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Pinnacle Multi-Acquisitions Holdings, LLC et al
|
01/07/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00138 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. A1 Platta Construction, LLC
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00140 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. NOLA Landscape, LLC
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00141 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. ABT Electronics, Inc.
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00142 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. APIA, Inc.
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00143 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Bank of America
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00144 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Nola North, LLC
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00145 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Only Plumbing 2, Inc.
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00146 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. PLS Check Cashers
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00147 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Premier Remodeling Group, LLC
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00148 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Premier Electric Services Corp.
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00149 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Regnier
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00150 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Republic Bank Of Chicago
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00151 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. RR Mulch and Soil LLC d/b/aRR Landscape Supply
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00152 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. RUD Industries, Inc.
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00153 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Rzeminski, Sr.
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00154 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Sanches
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00155 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Shenouda
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00156 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Sherwin-Williams Co.
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00157 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. A M Sieger Inc.
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00158 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Slomka Law Group
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00159 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. StanCorp Mortgage Investors, LLC
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00160 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. T Sikes, Inc.
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00161 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Teumer
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00162 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Third Federal Savings & Loan Association of Clevel
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00163 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. TRK Services, Inc.
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00164 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Vaitkus
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00165 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Vela
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00166 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Chad Wilkins d/b/a Wilkins and Sons Construction
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00167 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. What Will They Do Next, LLC
|
03/19/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00168 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Covington
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00169 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Davila
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00170 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Doddy's Deli and Cafe Corp.
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00171 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. D S Electric & Remodeling, Inc.
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00172 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Dynamic Plumbing Consulting Inc.
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00173 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Fidelity Tax Services, LLC
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00174 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Flores Construction Services, Inc.
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00175 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Gutierrez
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00176 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Holbrook Partners, LLC
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00177 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Holland
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00178 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ali et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00179 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Arellano et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00180 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Atsaides et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00181 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Baker, Jr.
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00182 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Barker et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00183 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Beasley
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00184 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Bhojwani
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00185 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Bih
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00186 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Knipe
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00187 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Blankenship et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00188 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Bosler
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00189 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Koka et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00190 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Lai
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00191 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Lake et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00192 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Lin
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00193 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Luzys Construction, Inc.
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00194 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ma
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00195 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Maniar
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00196 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Markuse et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00197 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Martinez
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00198 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Miller et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00199 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Brunk et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00200 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Karen Butler d/b/a Homes Plus
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00201 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Castellucci
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00202 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Chakanava et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00203 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Cheng et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00204 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Chera et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00205 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Cheung
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00206 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Chi et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00207 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Choudhury
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00208 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Clements et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00209 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Comeau
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00210 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Monitto
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00211 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Morrissette et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00212 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Morton
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00213 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Murad
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00214 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Odenbach
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00215 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Paparelli
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00216 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Paul
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00217 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Pittacora Law Group, LLC
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00218 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Pugh
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00219 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ramirez
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00220 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Regard et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00221 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Reifel et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00222 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Rojas
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00223 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Romanello et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00224 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Rosenthal
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00225 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Selective Insurance Company of America
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00226 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Silkenson et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00227 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Snarr et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00228 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Snyder
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00229 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Snyder
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00230 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Cook
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00231 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Snyder
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00232 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Craigmile et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00233 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Cunningham et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00234 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Gulati
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00235 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Dao
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00236 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Steen
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00237 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Denton
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00238 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Stock
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00239 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. DeRobertis
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00240 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Terry
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00241 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Desai
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00242 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Donnelly et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00243 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Thompson et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00245 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Dunn
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00246 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Torok et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00247 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Dunning
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00248 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Electronic Funds Source, LLC
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00249 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Tinley Park Associates LLC
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00250 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Eichenberger et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00251 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Tran et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00252 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Tucker
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00253 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Turner
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00254 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Urquhart et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00255 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Volkerink
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00256 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Vyas
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00257 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Walsh
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00258 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Wang et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00259 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Wei et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00260 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Einck
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00261 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Einck et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00262 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Farrell
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00263 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ferdman
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00264 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ferrara
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00265 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Fujinaga
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00266 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Gabler
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00267 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Gillette et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00268 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Goldberg
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00269 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Gunawan et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00270 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Hart
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00271 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Heitner
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00272 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Weinhold et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00273 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Hill et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00274 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Hull et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00275 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Weliever et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00276 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ibrahim
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00277 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. White
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00278 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Wiedner
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00279 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Iroquois Federal Savings and Loan Association
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00280 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Jauregui
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00281 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Wight et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00282 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Jeffery
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00283 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Wilson et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00284 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack and Witt
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00285 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Worden
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00286 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Yang
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00287 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Jones et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00288 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Yip et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00289 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Austin
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00290 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Boor
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00291 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Burmeister
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00292 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Chan et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00293 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Choy et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00294 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Clausing
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00295 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Comeau et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00296 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Cusick et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00297 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Cuthbert et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00298 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Doma et al
|
03/20/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00299 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Khan et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00300 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Kawaguchi
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00301 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Kero et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00302 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Kesireddy
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00303 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Kim
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00304 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Kim
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00305 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Klaus
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00306 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Dowey et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00307 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Lee
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00308 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Duffy et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00309 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Liddi et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00310 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Flores
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00311 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Fries et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00312 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Lo
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00313 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Mangalpally
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00314 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Maniar
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00315 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. MB Financial Bank, N.A.
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00316 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Mindus et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00317 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Mitri
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00318 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Morauer
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00319 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Goldberg
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00320 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Northern Illinois Gas Company d/b/a Nicor Gas Comp
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00321 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. O'Connor
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00322 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Gregory et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00323 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Panguluri et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00324 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Grewal et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00325 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Parkin et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00326 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Hajikhani
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00327 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Petak et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00328 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Haruguchi
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00330 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Hawkins
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00331 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Porter-Coleman
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00332 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Sarraf et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00333 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Hood
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00334 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Sarin et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00335 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Hsu
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00336 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Scanlan
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00337 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Stevens et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00338 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Tomita
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00339 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Jansen
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00340 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Turczynskyj
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00341 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. JAZ-C Consulting, Inc.
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00342 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Van Arkel et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00343 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Michael Washington d/b/a Michael Washington Servic
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00344 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Zhang
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00345 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Zhou et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00346 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. JC Property Management, Inc.
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00347 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Jeshang
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00348 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Jung et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00349 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Jurado et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00350 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. JV's Flooring, Inc.
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00351 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Kalman
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00352 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Keely
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00353 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ky's Lawn Service, Inc.
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00354 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. K-W Exteriors, Inc.
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00355 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Knapik
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00356 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Lang
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00357 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00358 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Lupita's Food Market, Inc.
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00359 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Mack Investments I, LLC
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00360 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Mack Services, LLC
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00361 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Manganiello
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00362 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Matariyeh
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00363 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Mayfield
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00364 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Metropolitan Capital Bank & Trust f/k/a Metropolit
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00365 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Midland States Bank
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00366 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Impressive Homes Realty Inc.
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00367 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Jimenez
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00368 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Synchrony Bank et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00369 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Maya
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00370 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. AT&T Corp.
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00371 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. City of Oak Forest
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00372 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Capital One N.A. et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00373 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Old Republic Exchange Company
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00374 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Chase Bank USA N.A. et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00375 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Patterson et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00376 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. City of Chicago
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00377 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Perez
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00378 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Cook County, Illinois
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00379 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ramirez
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00380 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. First Community Bank & Trust
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00381 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. WB Real Estate Investment Mangement, LLC
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00382 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. First Secure Bank and Trust Co., successor to Amer
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00383 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Winsupply of Mokena IL d/b/a M. Cooper Winsupply C
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00384 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. First Secure Community Bank
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00385 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ganguly et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00386 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Truckenbrodt et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00387 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Glinianski
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00388 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Grant et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00389 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Hendricks et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00390 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Bitelman
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00391 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Bradley et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00392 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Busey Bank, successor by merger with First Communi
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00393 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Chappell et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00394 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Choate Family Trust et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00395 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Town of Cicero
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00396 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Equity Trust Company, Custodian FBO Nicholas Corda
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00397 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Corrado et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00398 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Cushing et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00399 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ray et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00400 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Delman et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00401 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Mack Developers Inc.
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00402 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Doherty et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00403 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Dudkiewicz et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00404 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Mahajan et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00405 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Espana et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00406 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Flynn et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00407 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Gabrione et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00408 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Morales et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00409 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Health Care Service Corporation
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00410 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Hernandez
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00411 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Jimenez
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00412 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Kansagra
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00413 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Kautz et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00414 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Lanuza et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00415 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Lewis et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00416 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. O'Loughlin et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00417 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Mannello et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00418 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Mills et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00419 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Moonjely et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00420 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. New Direction Trust Company FBO Jeffery Morris et
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00421 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Moy et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00422 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Peoples Energy Corporation
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00423 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Reilly et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00424 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Sharma et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00425 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Tiernan et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00426 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Tieu et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00427 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Joshua Robbins, Gecko Mack LLC et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00428 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Stein et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00429 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Tomes
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00430 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Willig et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00431 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ager et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00432 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Beckerman et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00433 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. McLean et al
|
03/21/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00434 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. APIA Inc. d/b/a CIS Services
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00435 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Commonwealth Edison Company, d/b/a ComEd
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00436 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ferguson Enterprises Inc. d/b/a Ferguson Heating &
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00437 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. American Builders & Contractors Supply Co. Inc. d/
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00438 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. ABC Tile et al
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00439 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. AFG Properties LLC et al
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00440 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Alt Luck Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00441 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Amari & Locallo
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00442 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Anyone Home Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00443 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Argent LLC
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00444 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Uribe
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00445 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Home Designs Warehouse Inc. d/b/a HDW Commercial I
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00446 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Balladares Construction et al
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00447 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Bell
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00448 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Hinsdale Bank & Trust Co., successor to Suburban B
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00449 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. HomeUnion Inc. d/b/a Home Union Services
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00450 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ideal Custom Designs Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00452 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Imperial Roofing Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00453 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Innovative Surfaces LLC
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00454 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Benchmark Management Group Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00455 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Bertrand Landscape Design Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00456 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. International Autos Inc. d/b/a International Autos
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00457 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. City of Berwyn
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00458 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Irmen
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00459 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Bestway Heating Company Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00460 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. JDB Electrical & General Contracting Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00461 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Bounds and Family
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00462 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. J. Briseno Landscaping
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00463 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. J.L.D.C. Construction Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00464 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. C & J Contractors
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00465 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. J.P. Plumbing Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00466 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack and City of Calumet City
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00467 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Cardenas
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00468 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. G Konley Services Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00469 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Chesterfield Insurance Services LLC
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00470 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. CHI 2 SF LLC et al
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00471 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. City Electric Supply Co.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00472 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Kuta
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00473 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ken's Water Systems, Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00474 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Cobbin
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00475 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Village Of Lansing
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00476 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Complete Voltage Solutions, LLC
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00477 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Consola Construction Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00478 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Leading Edge Corp.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00479 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Construction Development Strategies Corp.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00480 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. City of Country Club Hills
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00481 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Toyota Motor Credit Corp. d/b/a Lexus Financial Se
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00482 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Covenant Construction and Consulting Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00483 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. #1 M & J Construction Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00484 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. M & R Delivery et al
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00485 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Cray Huber Horstman Heil & VanAusdal LLC
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00486 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. M.J. Lane Incorporated
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00487 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. CSK Partners Inc. et al
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00488 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Lenox Hill Construction Inc. d/b/a Mack Constructi
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00489 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. CTT Electric Plus Corp.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00490 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Marcordes et al
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00491 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Midwest Country Construction Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00492 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Montak Properties Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00493 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Novotny & Son Seal Coating & Striping Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00494 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00495 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Old Plank Trail Community Bank, N.A. f/k/a First N
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00496 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. OLD SECOND NATIONAL BANK
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00497 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Only Plumbing Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00498 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. The PJC Group LLC et al
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00499 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Platinum Properties Investor Network Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00500 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. PoleRe LLC
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00501 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Pride One Exteriors
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00502 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. R & S Garage Door Service Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00503 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Raz Masonry Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00504 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Real Wealth Network Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00505 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Republic Services Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00506 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Rico
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00507 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Riordan, Fulkerson, Hupert LLC
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00508 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. River West Realty Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00509 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Riverton Cabinet Company
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00510 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. M. Scott Services Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00511 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. SFR-CHI I LLC
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00512 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Village Of South Holland
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00513 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Speedway LLC f/k/a Speedway SuperAmerica LLC
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00514 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Statements in Stone Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00515 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Strimel Construction and Project Management Servic
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00516 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Strimel
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00517 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Superior Stairs Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00518 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Surface Solutions of Illinois Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00519 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Tex-Mex Construction
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00520 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. The Skys the Limit Electrical Contractor Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00521 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Torres Remodeling Inc. f/k/a Torres Hardwood Floor
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00522 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. TTS Granite Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00523 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Village Of University Park
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00524 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Workman Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00525 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. DDT Home Transformations LLC
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00526 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Deja
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00527 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Village of Dolton
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00528 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Dream Home Estates Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00529 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. DWC Chicago Ltd.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00530 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. E & J Electrical Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00531 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. ECO Improvement Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00532 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Eduardo Construction Service Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00533 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Emerald Bloom Landscaping Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00534 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Engineered Tax Services Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00535 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Village of Evergreen Park
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00536 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Federal National Mortgage Association
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00537 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Fay's Point Town Home Condominium Association
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00538 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Fernandez
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00539 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Firm Investments Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00540 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Five Star Heating & Colling of Ill Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00541 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Fridrych Construction Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00542 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Furlong, III
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00543 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Gall
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00544 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Village of Glenwood
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00545 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Gonzalez
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00546 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Gonzalez Flooring
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00547 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. The Granite & Marble Depot Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00548 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Gregory Enterprises Ltd.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00549 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Convery
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00550 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Chicago Property Management & Investment Inc. d/b/
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00551 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. GT Plumbing Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00552 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Internal Revenue Service
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00553 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Gutman
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00554 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Morley
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00555 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Village of Hazel Crest
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00556 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Patriot Property Restoration
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00557 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Dan Mosca Ins. Agency, Inc.
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00558 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Reilly et al
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00559 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00560 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. West Coast Life Insurance Company
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00561 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Will County
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00562 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Citibank N.A. et al
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00563 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Huang
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00564 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Illinois Department of Revenue
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00565 - Peterson v. Wheelhouse Investments, LLC
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00566 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. LaScola et al
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00567 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. McInerney
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00568 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Miranda Carpenter Service
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00569 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. Tzanetakos
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00570 - Peterson v. McClelland et al
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00571 - Peterson v. McClelland et al
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00572 - Peterson v. McClelland et al
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00573 - Peterson v. Kotecki
|
03/22/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00574 - Ronald R. Peterson, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Mack v. BlueTarp Financial Inc.
|
03/23/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00575 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Oak P v. Busey Bank
|
03/23/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00576 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Mack v. Colony American Finance Lender LLC et al
|
03/23/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00577 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Mack v. Amalgamated Bank of Chicago
|
03/23/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00578 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Mack v. Advanced Home Remodeling Inc.
|
03/23/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00579 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Mack v. Mack Investments I LLC et al
|
03/23/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00580 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Mack v. Mack Investments II LLC et al
|
03/23/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00581 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Mack v. Mack Services LLC
|
03/23/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:19-ap-00582 - Ronald R. Peterson, as chapter 7 trustee for Mack v. Lim et al
|
03/24/2019
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-00115 - Sudduth v. Holtschlag, as Trustee in the Chapter 7 Bankruptcy
|
07/19/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-00116 - Thompson et al v. Holtschlag, as Trustee in the Chapter 7 Bankruptcy
|
07/19/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-00117 - Panozzo et al v. Holtschlag, as Trustee in the Chapter 7 Bankruptcy
|
07/19/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-00118 - FKH SFR Propco B-HLD, LP v. Holtschlag, as Trustee in the Chapter 7 Bankruptcy
|
07/19/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-00119 - FKH SFR Propco B-HLD, LP v. Holtschlag, as Trustee in the Chapter 7 Bankruptcy
|
07/19/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-00120 - Fernandez et al v. Holtschlag, as Trustee in the Chapter 7 Bankruptcy
|
07/19/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-00170 - Chatwani v. Holtschlag
|
10/26/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:22-ap-00171 - Sims v. Holtschlag
|
10/26/2022
|
Adversary
|
1:23-ap-00301 - Holtschlag, Trustee v. Frerichs
|
10/03/2023
|