Indiana Corn Marketing Council v. Cline et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-00013
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-00013
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50210 |
Nature of Suit | 62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Michael B. Cline
10796 S. County Road 875 E
Ladoga, IN 47954 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kimberly A. Cline
10796 S. County Road 875 E
Ladoga, IN 47954 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Indiana Corn Marketing Council
Ice Miller LLP One American Square, Suite 2900
Indianapolis, IN 46282 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 12/13 11:13 AM
Minute Entry/Order re: Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Except Debt From Bankruptcy Discharge. Vacated: Agreed Consent to Judgment filed 11/10/2017 and Judgment entered 11/16/2017 . (lat) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 12/04 4:13 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50210] Closed. (lak) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment Order
Thu 11/16 10:53 AM
Judgment Order . Notice of entry of this order/judgment is hereby provided to parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9022(a) The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (jam) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Agreed Consent to Judgment (Resolves an Adversary Proceeding)
Fri 11/10 11:09 AM
Agreed Consent to Judgment filed by Jeffrey M. Hester, Jeffrey A Hokanson on behalf of Defendants Kimberly A. Cline, Michael B. Cline, Plaintiff Indiana Corn Marketing Council. (Hokanson, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Wed 10/25 4:22 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 12/5/2017. Pretrial Conference set on 12/12/2017 at 09:45 AM EST in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (jam) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 10/20 11:53 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Defendants Kimberly A. Cline, Michael B. Cline . (Hester, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Wed 10/11 10:57 AM
Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to File Answer . Time to file extended to 10/20/2017. Attorney for the defendants must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Fri 10/06 1:26 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Defendants Kimberly A. Cline, Michael B. Cline. (Hester, Jeffrey) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Appearance
Fri 10/06 12:58 PM
Appearance filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Defendants Kimberly A. Cline, Michael B. Cline. (Hester, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 08/23 3:06 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Michael B. Cline, Kimberly A. Cline . (Fowler, Sarah) |
|
7 | 7
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Wed 08/23 2:09 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 09/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 9/22/2017. (cmd) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 08/23 10:43 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Sarah Lynn Fowler on behalf of Plaintiff Indiana Corn Marketing Council. (Fowler, Sarah) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
court
Deficiency Notice - Adversary Proceeding
Fri 08/11 10:02 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Complaint . Corporate Ownership Statement due by 08/23/2017 (cmd) CORRECTION: Duplicate of Doc #4. Modified on 8/11/2017 (cmd) |
|
4 | 4
court
Deficiency Notice - Adversary Proceeding
Fri 08/11 10:01 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Complaint . Corporate Ownership Statement due by 08/23/2017. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Appearance
Wed 08/09 4:38 PM
Appearance filed by Sarah Lynn Fowler on behalf of Plaintiff Indiana Corn Marketing Council. (Fowler, Sarah) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Wed 08/09 4:32 PM
Appearance filed by Jeffrey A Hokanson on behalf of Plaintiff Indiana Corn Marketing Council. (Hokanson, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/09 4:21 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50210 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Indiana Corn Marketing Council against Defendant(s) Michael B. Cline, Kimberly A. Cline [62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)]. (Hokanson, Jeffrey) |