Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-10759

Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dale L Somers
Case #: 6:17-ap-05110
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2017
Terminated:Jan 05, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kenny Pipe & Supply, Inc.
811 Cowan Street
Nashville, TN 37207
Represented By
Kenneth H. Jack
Davis & Jack LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carl B. Davis
Davis & Jack, L.L.C. 2121 W Maple PO Box 12686
Wichita, KS 67277
Represented By
Kenneth H. Jack
Davis & Jack LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, October 14, 2021
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Thu 10/14 9:45 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint. Receipt number 147203, Fee Amount $350.00. (adiuser)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 07, 2018
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/07 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/07/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Friday, January 05, 2018
7 7 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/05 3:14 PM
Order Sustaining Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Complaint and Journal Entry of Dismissal. Related [+] Signed on 1/5/2018. (wed)
Related: [-] 6
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/05 3:16 PM
Adversary Case 17-05110 Closed . (wed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2018
6 6 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 01/03 3:27 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 08/14 2:23 PM
Summons Service Executed on Kenny Pipe & Supply, Inc. 8/14/2017 (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2017
4 4 court Summons Issued Mon 08/14 9:50 AM
Summons Issued on Kenny Pipe & Supply, Inc. Date Issued 8/11/2017, Answer Due 9/11/2017 . (wed)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 08/11 11:18 AM
Summons Issued on Kenny Pipe & Supply, Inc. Date Issued 8/11/2017, Answer Due 9/11/2017 . (wed)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2017
2 2 cmp Summons Request Thu 08/10 3:08 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Kenny Pipe & Supply, Inc. - summons(es) requested on Kenny Pipe & Supply, Inc. (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/10 3:05 PM
Adversary case 17-05110 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against Kenny Pipe & Supply, Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet