Modest Needs Foundation v. Bianco
Original Case: 1:16-cv-03144
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02605 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 26, 2018 3:39 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Maria Bianco
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Joan M. Casali
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Cesar Sabando
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Anthony S. Wetmore
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kathleen Barker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Modest Needs Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Keith P. Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/26/2018 3:28 AM EST |
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Modest Needs Foundation and Keith P. Taylor, FILED. [2107756] 17-2605 [Entered: 08/22/2017 04:39 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 07/21/2017, RECEIVED.[2107760] 17-2605 [Entered: 08/22/2017 04:41 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 07/21/2017, RECEIVED.[2107762] 17-2605 [Entered: 08/22/2017 04:42 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2107764] 17-2605 [Entered: 08/22/2017 04:42 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |