Model Reorg Acquisition, LLC
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11794 |
Case Filed: | Aug 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Model Reorg Acquisition, LLC
35 Sawgrass Drive Suite 2
Bellport, NY 11713 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:02 PM EST |
Claims Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC
www.epiqsystems.com 777 Third Avenue, 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
|
Creditor
Plaza del Caribe, S.E. and Plaza las Americas, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gregory Greenfield & Associates Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hays County, Williamson County
P.O. Box 1269
Round Rock, TX 78680 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hidalgo County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Turnberry Associates
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KIR Pasadena II, L.P. and Hollywood Plaza Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kaufman County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Travis County
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Montgomery County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
North Riverside Park Associates LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Northpark Mall Limited Partnership
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oklahoma County Treasurer
320 Robert S Kerr Ave Rm 307
Oklahoma City, OK 73102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pinellas County Tax Collector
Post Office Box 6340
Clearwater, FL 33758 |
|
Creditor
Gregg County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Shops at Summerlin North, LP
Spector & Johnson, PLLC 12770 Coit Road Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Regency Centers Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Riverwalk Marketplace (New Orleans) LP
Spector & Johnson, PLLC 12770 Coit Road Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75251 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Roseville Shoppingtown LLC
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rouse Properties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
S.F. Centre Limited Partnership
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
San Marcos CISD
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Simon Property Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Starwood Retail Partners LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Starwood Retail Partners, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tarrant County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Taubman Landlords
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comproller of Public Accounts
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Macerich Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Galveston County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wheaton Plaza Regional Shopping Center LLC
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
1-27 East Fordham Road Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Allen ISD
Linebarge Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Westfield, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bexar County
711 Navarro Suite 300
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brandon Shopping Center Partners Ltd.
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CBL & Associates Management, Inc.
1311 Delaware Avenue
Wilmington, DE 19806 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
1201 North Orange Street Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cameron County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Centennial Real Estate Company, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CenterCal Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Weingarten Realty Investors
2600 Citadel Plaza Drive Suite 125 Attn: Jenny J. Hyun, Esq.
Houston, TX 77008 |
|
Creditor
Citrus Park Mall Owner LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Frisco
Linebarger Goggan Blair &Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Washington Prime Group Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of McAllen
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Mercedes
City of Mercedes c/o John T. Banks Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott 3301 Northland Dr., Ste. 505
Austin, TX 78731 |
|
Creditor
WEA Palm Desert LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Revenue
Bureau of Compliance Department 280946
Harrisburg, PA 17128 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cypress-Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
DDR Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson,LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Victoria County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dimond Center Holdings, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dimond Center LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fort Bend County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
GGP Limited Partnership
Kristen N. Pate 110 North Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gainesville isd
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Taubman Landlords
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jennifer Wyman
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Questar Gas Company
1140 W 200 S P O Box 3194
Salt Lake City, UT 84110 |
|
Interested Party
Municipality of Bayamon, Puerto Rico
Aldarondo & Lopez Bras ALB Plaza #16 Carr.199 Suite 400
Guaynabo, PR 00969 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
MJA Beauty, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Imperial County Treasurer-Tax Collector
940 West Main Street Suite 106
El Centro, CA 92243 |
|
Interested Party
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Labor and Industry
Collections Support Unit 651 Boas Street Room 702
Harrisburg, PA 17121 |
|
Interested Party
City of Laredo
Flores, Flores & Canales, PLLC 5517 McPherson, Ste. 14
Laredo, TX 78041 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Chatham County Tax Commissioner
P.O. Box 8324
Savannah, GA 31412 |
|
Interested Party
CIII Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
BMC Group
|
Represented By
|
Stockholder
Dendera Capital LP
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
1. | Men's and women's fragrance retailer Perfumania Files For Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (pymnts.com) |
Submitted Mon 08/28/2017 | |