Quality King Fragrance, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11794
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11794
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11802 |
Case Filed: | Aug 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Quality King Fragrance, Inc.
35 Sawgrass Dr Ste 2
Bellport, NY 11713-1577 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago |
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 03/26 3:49 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Murin, Leslie) |
||
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Order Granting Reorganized Debtors' Motion For Entry of An Order and Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases. Signed on 3/23/2018 (DMC) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Model Reorg Acquisition, LLC, Case No. 17-11794 for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 17-11794 (CSS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 8/29/2017 (DMC) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Mon 08/28 8:19 AM
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case (BA) |
||
Saturday, August 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed By Quality King Fragrance, Inc. (Clark, Anthony) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Sat 08/26 10:32 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11802 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8561490, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Quality King Fragrance, Inc.. (Clark, Anthony) |