Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Referred: Martin C Carlson
Case #: 1:17-cv-01541
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 28, 2017
Terminated:Aug 15, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Feb 24, 2018 4:20 AM EST
Defendant
Caldwell, Jones, Carlson, Blewit, Welsh
Defendant
Commonwealth Court Clerk
Defendant
Christopher Conner
Defendant
Jared Dupes
Represented By
Caleb Curtis Enerson
Pa Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
PA Unified Judiciary
Defendant
David M Ragonese
Defendant
Jerome B. Simandle
Plaintiff
R. Michael Best
Plaintiff
Keith Dougherty
Keith Dougherty Investments & Consulting LLC 8075 Manada View Drive
Harrisburg, PA 17112
Plaintiff
Brent Frey
Plaintiff
Erica Frey

GPO Apr 06 2018
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 4/6/2018. (jw)
GPO Aug 15 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 08/15/2018. (jw)
GPO Aug 15 2018
Suppress filed by Keith Dougherty.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 08/15/2018. (jw)ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), in consideration of the motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 72) and the motion to strike (ECF No. 74) filed by plaintiff Keith Dougherty, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions ARE DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in accordance with the courts prior order on March 2, 2018, the document filed at ECF No. 77 is STRICKEN. Motions terminated: 72 MOTION for Reconsideration by Keith Dougherty, 74 MOTION to Strike and to
GPO Aug 15 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 08/15/2018. (jw)
GPO Aug 15 2018
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)- in consideration of the motion of the Commonwealth Court Clerk and the Pennsylvania Unified Judiciary to dismiss the complaint of Keith Dougherty, (ECF No. 78), the accompanying brief in support of the motion to dismiss, (ECF No. 79), and the response of plaintiff thereto, (ECF No. 81), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to dismiss the plaintiffs complaint is GRANTED.The complaint of plaintiff Keith Dougherty is DISMISSED with prejuurt Clerk (In its executive and official capacity) and PA Unified Judiciary (in their official capacity) terminated.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 08/15/2018. (jw)dice as against defendants the Commonwealth Court Clerk and the Pennsylvania Unified Judiciary. Motions terminated: 78 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by PA Unified Judiciary, Commonwealth Court Clerk., Commonwealth Co
GPO Aug 15 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 08/15/2018. (jw)
GPO Aug 15 2018
ce of original process upon these defendants. Motions terminated: 94 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Keith Dougherty. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 08/15/2018. (jw)ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - the motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 94) IS DENIED; and,IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action as against defendants, as identified in the caption of the complaint, Jared Dupes sued in his official and supervisory capacity, Christopher Conner, IN his Executive Function; and Caldwell, Jones, Carlson, Blewit, Welsh in their official capacity, IS DISMISSED without prejudice for the failure of plaintiff Keith Dougherty to effect servi
GPO Aug 15 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 08/15/2018. (jw)
GPO Aug 15 2018
Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 08/15/2018. (jw)ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - all defendants having been dismissed from this action, all remaining pending motions are denied as moot and the clerk is ordered to mark this case closed. (See order for details)Signed by
GPO Dec 04 2018
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 160 MOTION for Hearing Rule 55 "declaratory judgment" Unoposed filed by Keith Dougherty, 154 MOTION for Reconsideration 1682 Colonial Law filed by Keith Dougherty, 152 MOTION for Reconsideration Default under Hamer filed by Keith Dougherty, 150 First MOTION for Reconsideration "Appointments Clause Violation" filed by Keith Dougherty, 156 MOTION for Reconsideration will be DENIED. Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/4/2018. (jw)
GPO Dec 04 2018
aw filed by Keith Dougherty are DENIED.Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 12/4/2018. (jw)ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), Motions terminated: 152 MOTION for Reconsideration Default under Hamer filed by Keith Dougherty, 156 MOTION for Reconsideration, 150 First MOTION for Reconsideration "Appointments Clause Violation" filed by Keith Dougherty, 160 MOTION for Hearing Rule 55 "declaratory judgment" Unoposed filed by Keith Dougherty, 154 MOTION for Reconsideration 1682 Colonial L
GPO Mar 13 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 188 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Signed by Honorable Joy Flowers Conti on 3/13/19 (Conti, Joy)
GPO Sep 15 2020
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/15/20. (ao)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
216 216 appeal USCA Certified Order In Lieu of Formal Mandate (Terminates Appeal) Tue 01/23 11:49 AM
CERTIFIED ORDER of USCA in lieu of formal MANDATE as to213 Notice of Appeal, filed by Keith Dougherty, dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 3(a) and LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1(a), for failure to pay the filing fee for the notice of appeal. Related [+]
Related: [-] nwrick, Aina