Original Case: 1:17-cv-01541

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-02731
Typecivil / united states as party / civil rights
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:Jan 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 24, 2024 3:25 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID M. RAGONESE
Defendant - Appellee
JEROME B. SIMANDLE
Defendant - Appellee
JARED DUPES, PA Department of Revenue Bureau of Compliance In his individual and supervisory capacity
Represented By
Caleb C. Enerson
Pennsylvania Department of Labor & Industry
contact info
Sean A. Kirkpatrick
Office of Attorney General of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
COMMONWEALTH COURT CLERK, In its executive and official capacity
Represented By
Martha Gale
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHRISTOPHER CONNER, In his executive function
Defendant - Appellee
CALDWELL, In their offical capacity
Defendant - Appellee
JONES, In their official capacity
Defendant - Appellee
CARLSON, In their official capacity
Defendant - Appellee
BLEWIT, In their official capacity
Defendant - Appellee
WELSH
Defendant - Appellee
PA UNIFIED JUDICIARY, In their official capacity
Represented By
Martha Gale
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
KEITH DOUGHERTY
Represented By
Keith Dougherty
Philadelphia FDC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
BRENT FREY
Represented By
Brent Frey
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
R. MICHAEL BEST, and all "others similarly sitauated"
Represented By
R. Michael Best
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ERICA FREY
Represented By
Erica Frey
contact info
Plaintiff - Pro Se Appellee
BRENT FREY
Represented By
Brent Frey
contact info
Plaintiff - Pro Se Appellee
ERICA FREY
Represented By
Erica Frey
contact info
Plaintiff - Pro Se Appellee
R. MICHAEL BEST, and all "others similarly sitauated"
Represented By
R. Michael Best
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/24/2024 3:25 AM EST
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Mr. Keith Dougherty in District Court No. 1-17-cv-01541. (CLW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 2 pgs District Court Memorandum Order
Att: 3 1 pgs Caption
Att: 4 3 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (CLW)
Related: [-]