Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-42726

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Ridgway
Case #: 3:17-bk-32864
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2017
Converted:Jan 17, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
WD Navarre Holdings LLC
700 W 76th Street Suite 116
Eden Prairie, MN 55344
Represented By
Robert T. Kugler
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Debtor
WD Navarre Holdings, LLC
9700 W 76th Street Suite 116
Eden Prairie, MN 55344
Represented By
Phillip J. Ashfield
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Robert T. Kugler
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Edwin H. Caldie
Stinson LLP
contact info
Andrew J. Glasnovich
Stinson LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Randall L. Seaver
Randall L. Seaver, Chapter 7 Trustee P.O. Box 1167
Burnsville, MN 55337
Trustee
Nauni Jo Manty
Manty & Associates PA 150 South Fifth Street Suite 3125
Minneapolis, MN 55402
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415
Represented By
Michael R Fadlovich
Us Trustee Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/12/2024 1:18 PM CST
Friday, September 08, 2017
misc MNB Add creditor to matrix Fri 09/08 1:45 PM
List of Creditors load 18236 creditors added (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 09/08 2:31 PM
Receipt of Voluntary chapter 11 petition 17-32864 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10260496. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court MNB Case reassigned - Judge Fri 09/08 2:50 PM
Judge Kathleen H Sanberg added to case. Involvement of Judge William J Fisher terminated. (Jamie MNBS)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs misc MNB Voluntary chapter 11 petition (fee) Fri 09/08 10:23 AM
Chapter 11 voluntary petition for non-individuals re: WD Navarre Holdings LLC. List of creditors who have the 20 largest unsecured claims (Form 204), Declaration under penalty of perjury for non-individual debtors (Form 202), Proof of authority to sign and file petition (Local Form 1008-1), List of equity security holders (if less than 101 holders). Fee Amount $1717.00. Debtor's exclusivity period for filing plan and disclosure statement ends 01/8/2018. (Kugler, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 court MNB Document Fri 09/08 11:44 AM
DECLARATION OF RELATEDNESS OF CHAPTER 11 CASES filed by Debtor WD Navarre Holdings LLC. (Lori QC)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc MNB Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing (Ch 11 only) Fri 09/08 2:26 PM
Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing filed by WD Navarre Holdings LLC (Kugler, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 order MNB Order (Generic) Fri 09/08 2:49 PM
Order to Reassign Chapter 11 Case. (Jamie MNBS)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc MNB Signature declaration Fri 09/08 4:50 PM
Signature declaration filed by WD Navarre Holdings LLC. (Kugler, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion MNB Motion for use of cash collateral (preliminary and final hearings) Fri 09/08 5:58 PM
Motion for use of cash collateral filed by Debtor 1 WD Navarre Holdings LLC. Memorandum of law, Proposed order, Verified statement of debtor. Preliminary Hearing scheduled 9/14/2017 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Kugler, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only) Mon 09/11 8:11 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING AND MOTION FOR AN EXPEDITED HEARING AND FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO PAY PRE-PETITION WAGES, PAYROLL TAXES, AND EMPLOYEE BENEFITS AND AUTHORIZING PAYROLL PROVIDER AND FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS TO HONOR AND PROCESS CHECKS AND TRANSFERS RELATED TO SUCH RELIEF WD Navarre Holdings LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/13/2017 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only) Mon 09/11 8:38 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER (I) GRANTING AN EXPEDITED HEARING AND (II) AUTHORIZING DEBTOR TO ACT AS FOREIGN REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 1505 filed by WD Navarre Holdings LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/14/2017 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Kristin MNBM)
Related: [-]