Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Ridgway
Case #: 4:17-bk-42726
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2017
Creditor Meeting:Mar 13, 2018
Claims Deadline:Mar 28, 2018
Converted:Jan 17, 2018
Discharge Objection Deadline:May 14, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
WYNIT Distribution LLC
PO Box 17555
Greenville, SC 29606
Represented By
Andrew J. Glasnovich
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Phillip J. Ashfield
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Robert T. Kugler
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Edwin H. Caldie
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
John D. Lamey, III
Lamey Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Paul M Hoffmann
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Bryant D. Tchida
Stinson Leonard Street LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:10 PM CST
Agent
JND Corporate Restructuring
JND Corporate Restructuring 8269 E 23rd Avenue Suite 275
Denver, CO 80238
Agent
PATRICK LAWTON
Attorney
Paul Ratelle
Creditor
ACAR Leasing Ltd. dba GM Financial Leasing
2860 Patton Road
Roseville, MN 55113
Represented By
Bradley J. Halberstadt
Stewart Zlimen & Jungers Ltd
contact info
Creditor
Peggy Ansbro
6001 SE Landing Way #12
Stuart, FL 34997
Creditor
Asian Express Holdings Limited
Represented By
Steven R. Kinsella
Fredrikson & Byron , P.A.
contact info
Creditor
BB&T Commercial Equipment Captial Corp.
Represented By
Eugene D Hummel
Best & Flanagan LLP
contact info
Norman I. Taple
Best & Flanagan LLP
contact info
Edward P. Sheu
Best & Flanagan LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bluff City Dockhopper, LLC
Represented By
Steven R. Kinsella
Fredrikson & Byron , P.A.
contact info
Creditor
CAMERON COUNTY
BROWNSVILLE I & DD C/O LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON PO BOX 17428
AUSTIN, TX 78760
Represented By
Joel D. Nesset
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Creditor
City of Frisco
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Joel D. Nesset
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Creditor
Deuce Entertainment, LLC
Represented By
Daniel C. Beck
Winthrop & Weinstine PA
contact info
Creditor
El Paso, Texas
Cozen O'Connor 33 South Sixth Street, Suite 3800
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Joel D. Nesset
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Creditor
Grayson County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Joel D. Nesset
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Creditor
National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh
Attn Adam Rosen 489 5th Ave, 21st Fl
New York, NY 10017
Creditor
Nero, Inc.
Attn: Howard J .Weg 2049 Century Park East Suite 3400
Los Angeles, CA 90067
Represented By
Scott F Gautier
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Howard J Weg
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Creditor
Nuance Communications Inc.
Represented By
MELISSA SIEGEL
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
BENJAMIN HOCH
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Richard J. Reding
Ask LLP
contact info
Creditor
Primera Technology, Inc.
333 South Seventh Street Suite 2600
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Creditor
KEN ROBERTSON
1877 S MEMPHIS ST
AURORA, CO 80017
Creditor
HARRY F SPITZER
27740 QUAIL RIDGE DR
LAMAR, CO 81052
Creditor
South Carolina Department of Employment and Workforce
R.E. David Building 1550 Gadsden Street P.O Box 8597
Columbia, SC 29202
Represented By
Trey EB McLeod
Sc Dept Of Employment & Workforce
contact info
Creditor
TANGRAM FACTORY AMERICA INC
Represented By
Steven R. Kinsella
Fredrikson & Byron , P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Yuneec USA, Inc.
Represented By
Richard J. Reding
Ask LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Canon USA Inc.
One Canon Park
Melville, NY 11747
Creditor Committee
LifePrint Products, Inc.
4667 Golden Foothill Parkway, Suite 102
El Dorado Hills, CA 95762
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Crediitors
Represented By
Jeffrey D Prol
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Christopher J. Knapp
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Connie A. Lahn
Barnes & Thornburg LLP
contact info
Jeffrey L. Cohen
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
ERIC S CHAFETZ
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Symantec Corporation
501 E. Middlefield Road Office #L1124
Mountain View, CA 94043
Represented By
James M. Jorissen
Leonard O'Brien Et Al
contact info
Creditor Committee Chair
Quicken, Inc.
3760 Haven Avenue
Menlo Park, CA 94025
Financial Advisor
Conway Mackenzie, Inc.
Interested Party
AVG Technologies USA, Inc.
Represented By
Marcy J McLaughlin
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Allan A Thoen
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
DONALD J DETWEILER
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Avanquest North America, LLC
Represented By
David E. Runck
Fafinski Mark & Johnson P. A.
contact info
Sharon Z. Weiss
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Bitdefender, Inc.
Represented By
James M. Jorissen
Leonard O'Brien Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
City of Frisco
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair Sampson LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Continental Casualty Company
Moss & Barnett 150 South Fifth Street Suite 1200
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Sarah E. Doerr
Moss & Barnett
contact info
MICHAEL B KIND
contact info
JONATHAN W YOUNG
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Core SWX, LLC
Attn: Andrew Cooper, Esq. 135 Crossways Park Drive Suite 402
Woodbury, NY 11797
Represented By
Ralph E. Preite
Sichenzia Ross Ference Kesner LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Corel, Inc.
Represented By
Steven R. Kinsella
Fredrikson & Byron , P.A.
contact info
IRA L HERMAN
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
EVAN J ZUCKER
contact info
Interested Party
DJI Europe BV
Represented By
Richard J. Reding
Ask LLP
contact info
Interested Party
DayMen Holdings (Luxembourg), DayMen Canada Acquisition ULC, DayMen US Holdings, Inc., DayMen U.S. Inc.
Fox Swibel Levin & Carroll LLP c/o N. Neville Reid 200 W. Madison Street Suite 3000
Chicago, IL 60606
Represented By
Jennifer G. Lurken
Gislason & Hunter
contact info
Interested Party
Elgato Systems, LLC
Moss & Barnett 150 South Fifth Street Suite 1200
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Terese A. West
Moss And Barnett
contact info
Interested Party
Esquel Enterprises Limited
Represented By
Matthew M. Tande
Prescott Pearson & Tande, PA
contact info
Interested Party
First Industrial Trust d/b/a FR National Life, LLC
Moss & Barnett 150 South Fifth Street Suite 150
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Sarah E. Doerr
Moss & Barnett
contact info
Interested Party
Fitbit, Inc.
Represented By
ERIK Y PREIS
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
KEVIN ZUZOLO
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
DEBORAH J NEWMAN
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Jason M Reed
Maslon LLP
contact info
Interested Party
FixMeStick Technologies, Inc. (successor-in-interest to SteamTree Systems, Inc. d/b/a FixMeStick Technologies, Inc.)
Represented By
James M. Jorissen
Leonard O'Brien Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Future Motion, Inc.
Hellmuth & Johnson PLLC 8050 West 78th Street
Edina, MN 55439
Represented By
Karl J. Johnson
Hellmuth & Johnson PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
G&I Southpoint I & II LLC
Lommen Abdo, P.A. 920 South Second Ave., Suite 1000
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Deborah C. Swenson
Lommen Abdo, PA
contact info
Interested Party
GBH WYNIT, LLC
Represented By
KENNETH J OTTAVIANO
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
PAIGE E BARR
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Christopher J Harayda
Faegre & Benson
contact info
Dennis M Ryan
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Google LLC
1600 Ampitheatre Pkwy
Mountain View, CA 94043
Represented By
Gregory A Bromen
Nilan Johnson Lewis PA
contact info
Interested Party
Graphic Finishing Partners, LLC
Moss & Barnett 150 South Fifth Street Suite 1200
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Sarah E. Doerr
Moss & Barnett
contact info
Interested Party
Grayson County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Elizabeth Weller
Linebarger Goggan Blair Sampson LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Greenville 1.1., LLC
Represented By
Abigail M McGibbon
Gray Plant Mooty Mooty & Bennett PA
contact info
Phillip Kunkel
Gray Plant Mooty
contact info
Interested Party
HAYNSWORTH SINKLER BOYD PA
STANLEY H MCGUFFIN PO BOX 11889
COLUMBIA, SC 29211
Represented By
STANLEY H MCGUFFIN
Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd PA
contact info
Interested Party
HK DJI Ronin Technology Company Limited
Represented By
Richard J. Reding
Ask LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Harman Technology, Limited
Represented By
Abigail M McGibbon
Gray Plant Mooty Mooty & Bennett PA
contact info
Phillip Bohl
Gray Plant Mooty Mooty & Bennett
contact info
Matthew G. Roseman
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Travis Powers
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Elizabeth M. Aboulafia
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Houghton Mifflin Harcourt Publishing Co.
Represented By
Benjamin Gurstelle
Briggs And Morgan P A
contact info
KENNETH S LEONETTI
Foley Hoag LLP
contact info
John R. McDonald
Briggs And Morgan, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
IC Real Tech, Inc.
100 South Fifth Street, Suite 1500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Jeffrey D. Klobucar
Bassford Remele, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
Individual Software, Incorporated
Represented By
James M. Jorissen
Leonard O'Brien Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Innovelis, Inc.
4713 231st Place SE
Sammamish, WA 98075
Represented By
Chad A. Kelsch
Fuller, Seaver, Swanson & Kelsch PA
contact info
Interested Party
International Business Machines Corp
Interested Party
Internet Brands, Inc.
150 South Fifth Street, Suite 3450
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Will R. Tansey
Ravich Meyer Kirkman Mcgrath Nauman & Ta
contact info
Interested Party
JK Imaging, Ltd.
Represented By
Jacob B. Sellers
Bernick Lifson PA
contact info
Interested Party
Jetson Electric Bikes, LLC
Moss & Barnett 150 South Fifth Street Suite 1200
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Terese A. West
Moss And Barnett
contact info
Interested Party
Kaijet Technology International Limited, Inc.
100 South Fifth Street, Suite 1500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Jeffrey D. Klobucar
Bassford Remele, P.A.
contact info
Patrick D. Newman
Bassford Remele
contact info
Interested Party
LAMEY LAW FIRM PA
980 INWOOD AVE N
OAKDALE, MN 55128
Represented By
John D. Lamey, III
Lamey Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
Level 3 Communications, LLC
Represented By
Amanda K. Schlitz
Eckberg Lammers, P.C.
contact info
Eric J. Sherburne
Eckberg Lammers PC
contact info
Interested Party
Manty & Associates PA
401 2nd Ave N Ste 400
Minneapolis, MN 55401
Represented By
Christopher A. Camardello
Manty & Associates, P.A.
contact info
Dennis O'Brien
Manty And Associates
contact info
Interested Party
McAfee, Inc.
Represented By
Michael T Gustafson
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
James M. Jorissen
Leonard O'Brien Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P.
33 South Sixth Street Suite 4400
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Joseph P. Bottrell
Meagher & Geer, P.L.L.P
contact info
Interested Party
Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc.
590 Adler Drive
Milpitas, CA 95035
Represented By
Katherine A. Preston
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Melanie Gray
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Misfit Holdings (US), Inc.
901 S Central Expressway
Richardson, TX 75080
Represented By
Jason B. Binford
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Missouri Department of Revenue
Steven A. Ginther PO Box 475 301 W. High Street, Room 670
Jefferson City, MO 65105
Represented By
Steven A. Ginther
Missouri Department Of Revenue
contact info
Interested Party
Naim Audio Ltd.
Represented By
Steven R. Kinsella
Fredrikson & Byron , P.A.
contact info
Ryan Murphy
Fredrikson & Byron PA
contact info
Interested Party
NanoGrid Limited
Represented By
Merle C. Meyers
Meyers Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Office Depot, Inc.
6600 North Military Trail
Boca Raton, FL 33496
Represented By
Abigail M McGibbon
Gray Plant Mooty Mooty & Bennett PA
contact info
Phillip Bohl
Gray Plant Mooty Mooty & Bennett
contact info
BRADLEY S SHRAIBERG
Shraiberg Landau & Page
contact info
BERNICE C LEE
contact info
Interested Party
Oracle America, Inc.
4304 34th Ave S.
Minneapolis, MN 55406
Represented By
Kesha L. Tanabe
Tanabe Law
contact info
Interested Party
Quicken, Inc.
Represented By
WILLIAM P WEINTRAUB
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Barry Bazian
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
James M. Jorissen
Leonard O'Brien Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Razer USA Ltd.
Interested Party
Relaunch Aggregator
Represented By
George E. Warner, Jr.
Warner Law, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Rosetta Stone Ltd.
Represented By
Jeffrey D. Klobucar
Bassford Remele, P.A.
contact info
Travis G. Buchanan
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Sage Software, Inc.; Sage Software Canada, Ltd.
Represented By
Thomas Hemmendinger
Brennan Recupero Cascione Scungio...
contact info
Kesha L. Tanabe
Tanabe Law
contact info
George E. Warner, Jr.
Warner Law, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Sphero, Inc.
Represented By
Steven R. Kinsella
Fredrikson & Byron , P.A.
contact info
Robert L. Eisenbach, III
Cooley Godward Kronish LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Square, Inc.
1455 Market Street Suite 600
San Francisco, CA 94103
Represented By
Thomas J. Hainje
Winthrop And Weinstine PA
contact info
Kevin D. Hofman
Messerli & Kramer
contact info
Interested Party
Sterling National Bank
500 Seventh Avenue 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Michael B Fisco
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Interested Party
TN DEPT OF REVENUE (JOINER)
Represented By
Michael B. Willey
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Interested Party
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Office of Attorney General Jay Hurst c/o Sherri Simpson, Paralegal P O Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711
Represented By
Jay W Hurst
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Interested Party
The Software Mackiev Company
Represented By
MICHAEL R LASTOWSKI
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
James C. Brand
Fredrikson & Byron PA
contact info
JARRET P HITCHINGS
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Transcend Information, Inc.
1645 North Brian Street
Orange, CA 92867
Represented By
Cynthia L. Hegarty
Morrison Sund PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
VIDBOX, Inc.
100 South Fifth Street, Suite 1500
Minneapolis, MN 55402
Represented By
Jeffrey D. Klobucar
Bassford Remele, P.A.
contact info
Patrick D. Newman
Bassford Remele
contact info
Interested Party
Vivotek USA, Inc.
70 S. First STreet
San Jose, CA 95113
Represented By
Breck E. Milde
Hopkins & Carley, Alc
contact info
Interested Party
Webroot, Inc.
Represented By
Steven R. Kinsella
Fredrikson & Byron , P.A.
contact info
Cynthia A. Moyer
Fredrikson & Byron, PA
contact info
ROBERT D LANTZ
Coan Payton & Payne LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By
DeWitt P. Perkins
Greenbergtraurig,llp
contact info
John J. Dyer
Greenbergtraurig,llp
contact info
Charles E. Nelson
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
David B. Kurzweil
Greenbergtraurig,llp
contact info
William P. Wassweiler
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Nancy A. Peterman
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC
Represented By
Kristine Kroenke
Fabyanske, Westra, Hart & Thomson PA
contact info
MARSHALL TURNER
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Paul L. Ratelle
Fabyanske Westra Hart & Thomson
contact info
Interested Party
Winthrop Resources Corp
11100 Wayzata Blvd
Minnetonka, MN 55305
Represented By
Michael B Fisco
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Other Party
Sereno Ventures, LLC
384 Bel Marin Keys Blvd. Suite 150
Novato, CA 94949
Represented By
Mark J Kalla
Dewitt Mackall Crounse And Moore Sc
contact info
Other Professional
JND Corporate Restructuring
JND Corporate Restructuring 8269 E 23rd Avenue Suite 275
Denver, CO 80238
Special Counsel
Mario Forte
Trustee
Nauni Jo Manty
Manty & Associates PA 401 Second Avenue North Suite 400
Minneapolis, MN 55401
Represented By
Mary F. Sieling
Manty & Associates P A
contact info
BUNTING, DRAYTON & ALWARD LLC
contact info
Christopher A. Camardello
Manty & Associates, P.A.
contact info
Jacqueline J. Williams
Manty & Associates PA
contact info
Nauni Jo Manty
contact info
Manty & Associates PA
contact info
GOLDMAN SLOAN NASH & HABER LLP
contact info
David B. Kurzweil
Greenbergtraurig,llp
contact info
Shoosmiths LLP
contact info
Nauni J. Manty
Manty & Associates PA
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415
Represented By
Michael R Fadlovich
Us Trustee Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Creditor Committee
DayMen Asia LImited, DayMen US Inc. DayMen Canada Acquisition
Terminated: 10/20/2017
1435 North MCDowell Blvd Suite 200
Petaluma, CA 94954
Represented By
Jennifer G. Lurken
Gislason & Hunter
contact info
Trustee
Randall L. Seaver
Terminated: 01/19/2018
12400 Portland Avenue South Suite 132
Burnsville, MN 55337

Docket last updated: 03/19/2025 9:27 AM CDT
Friday, September 08, 2017
crditcrd none Fri 09/08 10:12 AM
Receipt of Voluntary chapter 11 petition 17-42726 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10259613. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
misc MNB Add creditor to matrix Fri 09/08 1:45 PM
List of Creditors load 18236 creditors added (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
court MNB Case reassigned - Judge Fri 09/08 2:48 PM
Judge Kathleen H Sanberg added to case. Involvement of Judge William J Fisher terminated. (Jamie MNBS)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs misc MNB Voluntary chapter 11 petition (fee) Fri 09/08 10:10 AM
Chapter 11 voluntary petition for non-individuals re: WYNIT Distribution LLC. List of creditors who have the 20 largest unsecured claims (Form 204), Declaration under penalty of perjury for non-individual debtors (Form 202), Proof of authority to sign and file petition (Local Form 1008-1), List of equity security holders (if less than 101 holders). Fee Amount $1717.00. Debtor's exclusivity period for filing plan and disclosure statement ends 01/8/2018. (Kugler, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 4 pgs court MNB Document Fri 09/08 11:34 AM
DECLARATION OF RELATEDNESS OF CHAPTER 11 CASES filed by Debtor WYNIT Distribution LLC. (Lori QC)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc MNB Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing (Ch 11 only) Fri 09/08 2:25 PM
Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing filed by WYNIT Distribution LLC (Kugler, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order MNB Order (Generic) Fri 09/08 2:46 PM
Order to Reassign Chapter 11 Case. (Jamie MNBS)
Related: [-]
5 5 20 pgs misc MNB Signature declaration Fri 09/08 4:48 PM
Signature declaration filed by WYNIT Distribution LLC. (Kugler, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 300 pgs motion MNB Motion for use of cash collateral (preliminary and final hearings) Fri 09/08 5:55 PM
Motion for use of cash collateral filed by Debtor 1 WYNIT Distribution LLC. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order, Verified statement of debtor. Preliminary Hearing scheduled 9/14/2017 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Kugler, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc MNB Exhibits Fri 09/08 6:08 PM
Exhibits Local Rule 9013-2(e) Summary Related [+] filed by WYNIT Distribution LLC. (Kugler, Robert)
Related: [-] 6 Motion for use of cash collateral
8 8 3 pgs misc MNB Notice of appearance and request for notice Fri 09/08 8:21 PM
Notice of appearance and request for notice filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and Charles E. Nelson. (Nelson, Charles)
Related: [-]
9 9 aplcn MNB Application for admission pro hac vice - (FILE TO BKY CASE ONLY) (fee) Fri 09/08 8:27 PM
Application for admission pro hac vice of David B. Kurzweil filed by Charles E. Nelson for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Fee Amount $100, (Nelson, Charles)
Related: [-]
10 10 aplcn MNB Application for admission pro hac vice - (FILE TO BKY CASE ONLY) (fee) Fri 09/08 8:35 PM
Application for admission pro hac vice of John J. Dyer filed by Charles E. Nelson for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Fee Amount $100, (Nelson, Charles)
Related: [-]
11 11 aplcn MNB Application for admission pro hac vice - (FILE TO BKY CASE ONLY) (fee) Fri 09/08 8:36 PM
Application for admission pro hac vice of DeWitt P. Perkins filed by Charles E. Nelson for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Fee Amount $100, (Nelson, Charles)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc MNB Certificate of service Fri 09/08 11:47 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by JND Corporate Restructuring Hill. (Hill, JND Corporate Restructuring)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing
14 14 12 pgs motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only) Mon 09/11 9:16 AM
Motion (first day)JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER (I) GRANTING AN EXPEDITED HEARING AND (II) AUTHORIZING JOINT ADMINISTRATION OF CHAPTER 11 CASES PURSUANT TOBANKRUPTCY RULE 1015(B) filed by WYNIT Distribution LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/13/2017 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Lynne MNBM)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only) Mon 09/11 9:25 AM
Motion (first day)NOTICE OF HEARING AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER (I) GRANTING ANEXPEDITED HEARING AND (II) AUTHORIZING DEBTOR TO ACT AS FOREIGNREPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 1505 filed by WYNIT Distribution LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/14/2017 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Lynne MNBM)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only) Mon 09/11 9:34 AM
Motion (first day)NOTICE OF HEARING AND JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER(I) GRANTING AN EXPEDITED HEARING, (II) AUTHORIZING DEBTORS TOCONTINUE AND RENEW THEIR LIABILITY, PROPERTY, CASUALTY, AND OTHERINSURANCE PROGRAMS AND HONOR ALL OBLIGATIONS IN RESPECT THEREOF, AND (III) AUTHORIZING FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS TO HONOR ANDPROCESS RELATED CHECKS AND TRANSFERS filed by WYNIT Distribution LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/14/2017 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Lynne MNBM)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only) Mon 09/11 9:40 AM
Motion (first day) filed by NOTICE OF HEARING AND JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER(I) GRANTING AN EXPEDITED HEARING, (II) PROHIBITING UTILITIES FROMALTERING, REFUSING OR DISCONTINUING SERVICE, (III) DEEMING UTILITYCOMPANIES ADEQUATELY ASSURED OF FUTURE PERFORMANCE, AND (IV) ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR DETERMINING REQUESTS FOR ADDITIONAL ASSURANCE WYNIT Distribution LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/14/2017 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Lynne MNBM)
Related: [-]
18 18 21 pgs motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only) Mon 09/11 9:46 AM
Motion (first day) filed by NOTICE OF HEARING AND MOTION FOR AN EXPEDITED HEARING AND FOR AN ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO PAYPRE-PETITION WAGES, PAYROLL TAXES, AND EMPLOYEE BENEFITS; AND(II) AUTHORIZING PAYROLL PROVIDER AND FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS TOHONOR AND PROCESS CHECKS AND TRANSFERS RELATED TO SUCH RELIEF WYNIT Distribution LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/13/2017 at 2:30 PM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Lynne MNBM)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only) Mon 09/11 9:54 AM
EDITED ENTRY: FILING DATE 9/8/17, NOT 9/11/17 AS ORIGINALLY ENTERED. Motion (first day) filed by NOTICE OF HEARING AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER(I) GRANTING AN EXPEDITED HEARING, (II) AUTHORIZING MAINTENANCE OFTHE DEBTORS EXISTING CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, (III) AUTHORIZINGTHE CONTINUED USE OF EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND BUSINESS FORMSAND THE PAYMENT OF RELATED BANK FEES, AND (IV) AUTHORIZINGFINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS TO HONOR AND PROCESS RELATED CHECKS AND TRANSFERS WYNIT Distribution LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/13/2017 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Lynne MNBM) Modified on 9/11/2017 (MaryB MNBM QC)
Related: [-]