Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-42726

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael E Ridgway
Case #: 3:17-bk-32865
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2017
Converted:Jan 17, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
WD Navarre Digital Services LLC
700 W 76th Street Suite 116
Eden Prairie, MN 55344
Represented By
Robert T. Kugler
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Debtor
WD Navarre Digital Services, LLC
9700 W 76th Street Suite 116
Eden Prairie, MN 55344
Represented By
Robert T. Kugler
Stinson Leonard Street
contact info
Edwin H. Caldie
Stinson LLP
contact info
Phillip J. Ashfield
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Andrew J. Glasnovich
Stinson LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Randall L. Seaver
Randall L. Seaver, Chapter 7 Trustee P.O. Box 1167
Burnsville, MN 55337
Trustee
Nauni Jo Manty
Manty & Associates PA 150 South Fifth Street Suite 3125
Minneapolis, MN 55402
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
1015 US Courthouse 300 S 4th St
Minneapolis, MN 55415
Represented By
Michael R Fadlovich
Us Trustee Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/12/2024 1:18 PM CST
Friday, September 08, 2017
misc MNB Add creditor to matrix Fri 09/08 1:45 PM
List of Creditors load 18236 creditors added (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 09/08 2:31 PM
Receipt of Voluntary chapter 11 petition 17-32865 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10260496. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs misc MNB Voluntary chapter 11 petition (fee) Fri 09/08 10:27 AM
Chapter 11 voluntary petition for non-individuals re: WD Navarre Digital Services LLC. List of creditors who have the 20 largest unsecured claims (Form 204), Declaration under penalty of perjury for non-individual debtors (Form 202), Proof of authority to sign and file petition (Local Form 1008-1), List of equity security holders (if less than 101 holders). Fee Amount $1717.00. Debtor's exclusivity period for filing plan and disclosure statement ends 01/8/2018. (Kugler, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 court MNB Document Fri 09/08 11:23 AM
DECLARATION OF RELATEDNESS OF CHAPTER 11 CASES filed by Debtor 1 WD Navarre Digital Services LLC . (Barbie MNBS)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc MNB Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing (Ch 11 only) Fri 09/08 2:27 PM
Notice of intention to seek expedited hearing filed by WD Navarre Digital Services LLC (Kugler, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 aplcn MNB Application to employ professional Fri 09/08 4:38 PM
Application to employ Stinson Leonard Street as Chapter 11 Counsel filed by WD Navarre Digital Services LLC. Supporting affidavit or verified statement of professional person, Proposed order. (Kugler, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc MNB Signature declaration Fri 09/08 4:51 PM
Signature declaration filed by WD Navarre Digital Services LLC. (Kugler, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion MNB Motion for use of cash collateral (preliminary and final hearings) Fri 09/08 5:59 PM
Motion for use of cash collateral filed by Debtor 1 WD Navarre Digital Services LLC. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order, Verified statement of debtor. Preliminary Hearing scheduled 9/14/2017 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Kugler, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only) Mon 09/11 7:56 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING AND JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER (I) GRANTING AN EXPEDITED HEARING AND (II) AUTHORIZING JOINT ADMINISTRATION OF CHAPTER 11 CASES PURSUANT TO BANKRUPTCY RULE 1015(B) filed by WD Navarre Digital Services LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/13/2017 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Barbie MNBS)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only) Mon 09/11 8:01 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER (I) GRANTING AN EXPEDITED HEARING AND (II) AUTHORIZING DEBTOR TO ACT AS FOREIGN REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. ss 1505. filed by WD Navarre Digital Services LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/14/2017 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Barbie MNBS)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only) Mon 09/11 8:05 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING AND MOTION FOR AN EXPEDITED HEARING AND FOR AN ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING THE DEBTORS TO PAY PRE-PETITION WAGES, PAYROLL TAXES, AND EMPLOYEE BENEFITS; AND (II) AUTHORIZING PAYROLL PROVIDER AND FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS TO HONOR AND PROCESS CHECKS AND TRANSFERS RELATED TO SUCH RELIEF. filed by WD Navarre Digital Services LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/13/2017 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Barbie MNBS)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only) Mon 09/11 8:09 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING AND JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER (I) GRANTING AN EXPEDITED HEARING, (II) AUTHORIZING DEBTORS TO CONTINUE AND RENEW THEIR LIABILITY, PROPERTY, CASUALTY, AND OTHER INSURANCE PROGRAMS AND HONOR ALL OBLIGATIONS IN RESPECT THEREOF, AND (III) AUTHORIZING FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS TO HONOR AND PROCESS RELATED CHECKS AND TRANSFERS. filed by WD Navarre Digital Services LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/14/2017 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Barbie MNBS)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only) Mon 09/11 8:17 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING AND JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER (I) GRANTING AN EXPEDITED HEARING, (II) PROHIBITING UTILITIES FROM ALTERING, REFUSING OR DISCONTINUING SERVICE, (III) DEEMING UTILITY COMPANIES ADEQUATELY ASSURED OF FUTURE PERFORMANCE, AND (IV) ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR DETERMINING REQUESTS FOR ADDITIONAL ASSURANCE. filed by WD Navarre Digital Services LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/14/2017 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Barbie MNBS)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion MNB Miscellaneous motion (first day motions only) Mon 09/11 8:22 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER (I) GRANTING AN EXPEDITED HEARING, (II) AUTHORIZING MAINTENANCE OF THE DEBTORS' EXISTING CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, (III) AUTHORIZING THE CONTINUED USE OF EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND BUSINESS FORMS AND THE PAYMENT OF RELATED BANK FEES, AND (IV) AUTHORIZING FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS TO HONOR AND PROCESS RELATED CHECKS AND TRANSFERS. filed by WD Navarre Digital Services LLC . An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/13/2017 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. (Barbie MNBS)
Related: [-]