Sharon Fort v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-06631 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Sep 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 07, 2018 1:16 AM PST |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Fort
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 01, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 02/01 11:04 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Sharon Fort.(Kirnos, Radomir) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 02/01 11:01 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Radomir Roger Kirnos counsel for Plaintiff Sharon Fort. Adding Roger Kirnos as counsel of record for Sharon Fort for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sharon Fort. (Attorney Radomir Roger Kirnos added to party Sharon Fort(pty:pla))(Kirnos, Radomir) |
|
Thursday, December 09, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order Attorney Fees
Fri 12/10 1:41 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING ATTORNEYS' COSTS AND EXPENSES IN BAGWELL V. FORD AND FORT V. FORD by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has reviewed the parties' Stipulation (filed in 2:18-ml-02814, dkt no. 1207) concerning their dispute over the application of the portion of the Court's Order awarding Plaintiffs costs for their attorneys' fees expert, Jerome Studer (filed in 2:18-ml-02814, dkt no. 1187). Mr. Studer opined about both case-specific and common work fees, so his expert fee should be apportioned among the IDP cases. Plaintiffs have also not proposed an alternative method of apportioning Studer's fee, so his fee shall be prorated by 1/30. Therefore, in the matter of Fort v. Ford (Case No. 2:17-cv-06631-AB-FFMx), Plaintiff shall receive $15,147.69 (comprised of $4,894.81 for "case-specific" costs and expenses, $90.67 in IDP "common work" attorney's fees, and $10,162.21 for IDP "common-work" costs and expenses) in costs and expenses. And, in the matter of Bagwell v. Ford (Case No. 2:17-cv-06632-AB-FFMx), Plaintiff shall receive $14,950.60 (comprised of $4,697.72 for "case-specific" costs and expenses, $90.67 in IDP "common work" attorney's fees, and $10,162.21 for IDP "commonwork" costs and expenses) in costs and expenses. (gk) |
|
Monday, January 11, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Appearance
Mon 01/11 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Raymond Paul Boucher on behalf of Plaintiff Sharon Fort (Attorney Raymond Paul Boucher added to party Sharon Fort(pty:pla))(Boucher, Raymond) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 01/11 9:31 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bryan C Altman counsel for Plaintiff Sharon Fort. Adding Bryan C. Altman as counsel of record for Sharon Fort for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sharon Fort. (Attorney Bryan C Altman added to party Sharon Fort(pty:pla))(Altman, Bryan) |
|
Tuesday, June 30, 2020 | ||
20 | 20
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 07/01 1:02 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: THE COURT has been advised that the action has been settled, Dkt. No. 814, filed in ML 18-02814 The Court therefore ORDERS that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 45 days, to re-open the action if settlement is not consummated. Any Motion for Attorneys' fees must be filed within 45 days of this Order. Dkt. No. 745, filed in ML 18-02814 is DENIED AS MOOT. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
attorney
Change of Address
Tue 07/03 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Change of address by Steve Borislav Mikhov attorney for Plaintiff Sharon Fort. Changing attorneys address to 10250 Constellation Blvd., Suite 2500, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Sharon Fort. (Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 04/06 3:43 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey A Koncius counsel for Plaintiff Sharon Fort. Adding Jeffrey A. Koncius as counsel of record for Sharon Fort for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sharon Fort. (Attorney Jeffrey A Koncius added to party Sharon Fort(pty:pla))(Koncius, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
attorney
Association of Counsel
Tue 03/27 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Paul R. Kiesel on behalf of Plaintiff Sharon Fort. Filed by Plaintiff Sharon Fort (Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
8
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 03/09 1:12 PM
ORDER NO. 1: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Initial Conference set for 4/18/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Counsel will file a Preliminary Report by 4/3/2018. Applications for Lead and Liaison Counsel Appointments must be filed by 4/3/2018. See document for further details. Associated Cases: 2:18-ml-02814-AB-FFM et al. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
7
pgs
mdlcmp
Order consolidating cases (existing member cases)
Thu 02/15 6:03 AM
Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation creating MDL 2:18-ml-02814-AB (FFMx). See MDL docket for any documents common to two or more actions.Copy of Certified Order from MDL Panel creating MDL 2:18-ml-02814-AB (FFMx) See MDL docket for any documents common to two or more actions. (et) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 11/09 4:07 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court hereby STAYS this action pending the decision of the Panel in In Re: Ford Motor Co. DPS6 PowerShift Transmission Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 2814. Any hearings or deadlines set in this case are hereby VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iv) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
23
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Fri 10/27 4:22 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles11 filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Bush, Tamara) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret ISO, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-C, ISO Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 10/10 6:46 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Sharon Fort, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles11 served on 10.10.17. (Mikhov, Steve) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Tue 10/10 6:44 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles filed by Plaintiff Sharon Fort. Motion set for hearing on 11/17/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Russell Higgins in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Remand, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 10/10 6:38 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Steve Borislav Mikhov counsel for Plaintiff Sharon Fort. Adding Russell Higgins as counsel of record for Sharon Fort for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Sharon Fort. (Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 09/25 1:23 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 2/16/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Thu 09/21 2:43 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:12-cv-08388 AB(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg to Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-06631 AB(FFMx). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr (rn) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
trial
Jury Demand
Fri 09/15 4:41 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.. (Mrowka, Molly) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Appearance
Fri 09/15 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Molly J Mrowka on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Molly J Mrowka added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Mrowka, Molly) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 09/12 12:01 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 09/12 12:01 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Beverly Reid OConnell and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 09/08 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY, identifying State Street Corporation; Evercore Trust Company, N.A.; BlackRock, Inc.; and The Vanguard Group. (Bush, Tamara) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 09/08 2:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Bush, Tamara) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 09/08 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC670958 Receipt No: 0973-20476117 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (Attorney Tamara A Bush added to party FORD MOTOR COMPANY(pty:dft))(Bush, Tamara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Demand for Jury Trial, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Notice of Assignment, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Voluntary Lit Stipulations, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - ADR Packet, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Ford Answer to Complaint, | ||
Att: 9 Proof of Service Re Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 10 Declaration of Tamara A. Bush In Support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit A to Declaration of Tamara A. Bush, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit B to Declaration of Tamara A. Bush, | ||
Att: 13 Proof of Service Re Declaration of Tamara A. Bush, | ||
Att: 14 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret In Support of Notice of Removal | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 09/12 11:51 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Sharon Fort in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/3/2017, and attached to Notice of Removal as Exhibit B. (jtil) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Tue 09/12 11:54 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company in Los Angeles Superior Court on 9/7/2017, attached to Notice of Removal as Exhibit H.(jtil) |