In Re Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:18-ml-02814 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Feb 06, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Ninth CCA, 20-55097 MDL Panel, 2814 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 21, 2018 9:53 AM PST |
Defendant
Liaison Counsel for Defendants
|
Represented By
|
In Re:
Ford Motor Co. DPS6 Powershift Transmission Products Liability Litigation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Josie Hollowell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Zebrowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Josh Lazette
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lloyd Lister, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Lopez-Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Soledad Monjarez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachary Pemberton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Knight Law Plaintiffs
Knight Law Group LLP 1801 Century Park E Ste 2300 Los Angeles
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Pope
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dolores B. Ramos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mike Reneau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Megan Rice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ivy Rosenberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juanita Sanches
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julian Santana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bill Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Tamez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kandis Tippett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Utsey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clayton Walley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Staci Wyatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark J. Hemza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Ascensio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BLF Plaintiffs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clarene Banks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Caleb Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dora Bell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brandy Benavides
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Bourland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terrie Bumpus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Felton Burton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Byrd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CLR Plaintiffs
Consumer Legal Remedies APC 153 1/2 North Arnaz Drive
Los Angeles, CA 90211 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monica Castro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alvin Cearley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Childs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alice Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Duran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Florinda Esparza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neal Estes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Finamore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Floerke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ruby Granados
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Taylor Harrell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Head
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joel Hinojosa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
1580 | 1580
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 05/07 3:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO LIFT STAY FOR LIMITED PURPOSE OF SEEKING SEEK SUMMARY JUDGMENT RULINGS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court approves the parties' Stipulation1574 . The stay is hereby lifted as to cases 2:22-cv-04999-AB-PVC, 2:22-cv-05000-AB-PVC, and 2:22-cv-05001-AB-PVC for the limited purpose of seeking rulings on the following legal issues: (1) Whether some or all of the HOP Georgia Plaintiffs' FBPA claims are barred by the HOP Georgia Plaintiffs' alleged failure to provide Ford with notice under OCGA Section 101399(b); and (2) Whether the HOP Georgia Plaintiffs' Magnuson Moss claims are barred because they did not first follow the optional informal dispute resolution procedures set forth in the applicable Ford warranty booklet. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Ford must product copies of any and all notice letters in its possession, custody or control served on Ford by counsel for proposed class action plaintiffs in other Ford DPS6 cases. The Court sets the following briefing schedule for Ford's summary judgment motion: Ford's Motion for Summary Judgment on the above issues is due by 6/21/2024. The HOP Georgia Plaintiffs Response is due by 7/19/2024. Ford's Reply is due by 8/2/2024. A hearing is set for 8/30/2024. (gk) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
1579 | 1579
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 05/06 3:43 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL SCHEDULING (KNIGHT LAW GROUP CASES) by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby APPROVES the Joint Stipulation1573 , lifts the stay on these eleven cases (2:18-cv-02592-AB-FFM, 2:18-cv-07791-AB-FFM, 2:18-cv-05617-AB-FFM, 2:18-cv-05310-AB-FFM, 2:18-cv-08830-AB-FFM, 18-cv-10327-AB-FFM, 2:18-cv-07657-AB-FFM, 2:18-cv-00998-AB-FFM, 5:17-cv-02047-AB-FFM, 2:18-cv-02378-AB-FFM) and orders the following schedule in these cases: Rule 26(f) conference of counsel (21 days prior to ISC) 7/24/2024. Filing of Rule 26 Joint Report (14 days prior to ISC) 7/31/2024. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/16/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. [This document only relates to Case No. 2:18-cv-05617-AB-FFMx] (gk) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
1574 | 1574
stip
Stay Case (to Lift)
Thu 05/02 10:20 AM
STIPULATION to Lift Stay to Seek Summary Judgment Rulings filed by Plaintiffs HOP Georgia Plaintiffs.(Attorney Charles W Miller added to party HOP Georgia Plaintiffs(pty:pla))(Miller, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix to Joint Stipulation - 470 Georgia Plaintiffs, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Lift Stay to Seek Summary Judgment Rulings | ||
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
1578 | 1578
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 05/03 6:16 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Meehan Rasch, Greines Martin Stein and Richland LLP, re Minutes of Status Conference1572 . (gk) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
1577 | 1577
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 05/03 11:54 AM
Mail Returned addressed to Jong-Ju Chang, Dykema Gossett PLLC, re Minutes of Status Conference1572 . (gk) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
1576 | 1576
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 05/02 4:27 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Meehan Rasch, Greines Martin Stein and Richland LLP, re ORDER ON REQUESTS FOR APPROVAL OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL AT KAZEROUNI LAW GROUP, APC, and ATTORNEY EARL P. UNDERWOOD OF UNDERWOOD & RIEMER, P.C. by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.1571 . (gk) |
|
1575 | 1575
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 05/02 4:26 PM
Mail Returned addressed to Jong-Ju Chang, Dykema Gossett PLLC, re ORDER ON REQUESTS FOR APPROVAL OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL AT KAZEROUNI LAW GROUP, APC, and ATTORNEY EARL P. UNDERWOOD OF UNDERWOOD & RIEMER, P.C. by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.1571 . (gk) |