Cruickshank v. Party By Design Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12574
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12574
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Melvin S Hoffman |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-01111 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Party By Design Inc.
61 Strafello Drive
Avon, MA 02122 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary W. Cruickshank
21 Custom House Street Suite 920
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, April 24, 2020 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 04/24 7:36 AM
Disposition of Adversary; Adversary Number 17-1111 (lb) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/24 7:36 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-1111 Closed (lb) |
||
Thursday, April 09, 2020 | ||
49 | 49
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Thu 04/09 1:15 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
48 | 48
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 04/09 12:50 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/08/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 06, 2020 | ||
47 | 47
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/06 4:21 PM
Order dated 04/06/2020 RE:1 Complaint by Gary W. Cruickshank against Party By Design Inc.. PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT BETWEEN THE PARTIES IN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING: "WITHIN TWO WEEKS FOLLOWING THE ENTRY OF A FINAL ORDER AND THE COURT'S ENTRY OF THE JUDGMENT, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL." THE COURT ENTERED JUDGMENT IN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING ON MARCH 4, 2020. TO DATE, THE PARTIES HAVE NOT FILED A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. THE PARTIES ARE HEREBY DIRECTED TO FILED A JOINT REPORT REGARDING THE STATUS OF THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING ON OR BEFORE APRIL 20, 2020 AT 4:30 PM. (nc) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
46 | 46
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 03/07 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/06/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, March 04, 2020 | ||
45 | 45
order
Judgment
Wed 03/04 10:57 AM
Judgment dated 03/04/2020. (nc) |
|
Saturday, February 15, 2020 | ||
44 | 44
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 02/17 8:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 02/15/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, February 13, 2020 | ||
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order/Authority
Thu 02/13 12:58 PM
Order dated 2/13/2020 Re:36 Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank For Order Approving Re:35 Stipulation of Settlement by and Between Chapter 7 Trustee and Party by Design, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. A COPY OF THIS MOTION WAS FILED AND AN ORDER WAS ENTERED IN THE MAIN CHAPTER 7 CASE # 16-12574 THAT ORDER SHALL GOVERN AND NO FURTHER ACTION ON THIS MOTION IS NECESSARY. THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 19, 2020 AT 10:00 AM IS CANCELED. (lb) |
|
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing
Tue 01/21 4:35 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Tue 01/21 9:26 AM
Endorsed Order dated 1/21/2020 RE:38 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Joint Pretrial Memorandum [RE:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR FILING THE JOINT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM IS EXTENDED TO MARCH 3, 2020. (nc) |
|
Sunday, January 19, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
Mon 01/20 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Notice Date 01/19/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, January 17, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
court
Hearing Scheduled (Forms Attached)
Fri 01/17 3:41 PM
Hearing Scheduled for 2/19/2020 at 10:00 A.M at Boston Courtroom 1, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 Re:36 Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank For Order Approving Re: 35 Stipulation of Settlement by and Between Chapter 7 Trustee and Party by Design, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. Objections due by 2/11/2020 at 04:30 P.M. (mem) |
|
38 | 38
motion
Extend Time
Fri 01/17 3:23 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
37 | 37
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 01/17 2:49 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
36 | 36
motion
For Order/Authority
Fri 01/17 2:46 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank For Order Approving Re: 35 Stipulation of Settlement by and Between Chapter 7 Trustee and Party by Design, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure . (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation
Fri 01/17 2:44 PM
Stipulation of Settlement By Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank and Party by Design, Inc. Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, January 02, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Thu 01/02 1:10 PM
Endorsed Order dated 1/2/2020 RE:33 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents [RE:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR FILING THE JOINT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM IS EXTENDED TO JANUARY 17, 2020. (nc) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Extend Time
Thu 01/02 11:34 AM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Tue 12/17 11:20 AM
Endorsed Order dated 12/17/2019 Re:31 Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Deadline for Filing Joint Pretrial Memorandum. GRANTED. THE TIME IS EXTENDED TO JANUARY 3, 2020. (jreg) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Extend Time
Tue 12/17 10:10 AM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Deadline for Filing Joint Pretrial Memorandum [Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Fri 10/04 10:29 AM
Endorsed Order dated 10/4/2019 Re:28 Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Deadline for Filing Joint Pretrial Memorandum Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference. GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR THE FILING OF THE JOINT PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM IS EXTENDED TO DECEMBER 17, 2019. (jpessimato, usbc) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 09/16 4:46 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Extend Time
Mon 09/16 4:18 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Deadline for Filing Joint Pretrial Memorandum [Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Mon 06/17 9:45 AM
Endorsed Order dated 6/17/2019 Re:26 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Deadline for Filing Joint Pretrial Memorandum. MOTION ALLOWED. (rcontompasis, usbc) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extend Time
Fri 06/14 3:57 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Deadline for Filing Joint Pretrial Memorandum [Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
court
Case Reassigned
Fri 05/17 8:01 PM
By Order of Chief Judge Christopher J. Panos this case is reassigned to Bankruptcy Judge Frank J. Bailey. (ADI) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Mon 04/08 2:28 PM
Endorsed Order dated 4/8/2019 Re:24 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Deadline for Filing Joint Pretrial Memorandum Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference. MOTION ALLOWED. THE TIME IS EXTENDED UNTIL JUNE 14, 2019. (rcontompasis, usbc) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Extend Time
Mon 04/08 1:01 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Deadline for Filing Joint Pretrial Memorandum [Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Thu 02/07 4:11 PM
Endorsed Order dated 2/7/2019 Re:22 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference. MOTION ALLOWED. (rcontompasis, usbc) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Extend Time
Thu 02/07 3:12 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Fri 12/07 12:08 PM
Endorsed Order dated 12/7/2018 Re:20 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference. MOTION ALLOWED. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 2/8/2019 (rcontompasis, usbc) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Extend Time
Fri 12/07 10:52 AM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Fri 10/05 1:38 PM
Endorsed Order dated 10/5/2018 Re:18 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference. MOTION ALLOWED. (rcontompasis, usbc) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extend Time
Fri 10/05 10:01 AM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Fri 08/03 8:49 AM
Endorsed Order dated 8/2/2018 Re:16 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Pre-Trial Memorandum. ALLOWED. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 10/5/2018. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extend Time
Wed 08/01 2:48 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Pre-Trial Memorandum Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Fri 06/01 4:41 PM
Endorsed Order dated 6/1/2018 Re:14 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum . ALLOWED. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 8/1/2018. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extend Time
Fri 06/01 2:40 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 12/07 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 12/06/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Approval
Mon 12/04 10:05 AM
Endorsed Order dated 12/4/2017 Re:10 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Approve . MOTION ALLOWED. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 12/01 4:08 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Approve
Fri 12/01 4:07 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Approve [Re:9 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference
Fri 12/01 4:06 PM
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 11/03 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 11/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 10/31 2:22 PM
Order dated 10/31/2017. I HEREBY REASSIGN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING TO JUDGE JOAN N. FEENEY. (Telam, Usbc) |
|
Saturday, October 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 10/22 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 10/21/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Pre-Trial Order
Thu 10/19 10:47 AM
Pre-Trial Order dated 10/19/2017 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank. Discovery due by 1/17/2018. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 3/19/2018. See Order for Full Text. (Telam, Usbc) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 10/18 3:45 PM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by Party By Design Inc.. (Conti, David) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/18 12:57 PM
Summons Service Executed on Party By Design Inc. 9/14/2017 (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/14 11:49 AM
Summons Issued on Party By Design Inc. Answer Due 10/16/2017. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (Telam, Usbc) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/13 4:18 PM
Adversary case 17-01111 Complaint by Gary W. Cruickshank against Party By Design Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Cruickshank, Kathleen) |