Cruickshank v. Bank of America, N.A
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12574
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12574
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Melvin S Hoffman |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-01112 |
Nature of Suit | 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary W. Cruickshank
21 Custom House Street Suite 920
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 05/25 2:54 PM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 17-0112 Dismissed. (lkaine, Usbc) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 05/25 2:54 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-1112 Closed. (lkaine, Usbc) |
||
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation
Wed 05/09 4:16 PM
Stipulation By Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank and Bank of America, N.A. of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 03/28 4:59 PM
Settlement Agreement approved in main case 16-12574 (lkaine, Usbc) |
||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Mon 03/12 11:41 AM
Endorsed Order dated 3/12/2018 Re:20 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents . ALLOWED. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extend Time
Fri 03/09 4:10 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:10 Scheduling Order]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/01 11:23 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Approve
Thu 03/01 11:22 AM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Approve [Re:17 Settlement Agreement]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Settlement Agreement
Thu 03/01 11:21 AM
Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank and Bank of America, N.A. and Release filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Tue 02/20 10:37 AM
Endorsed Order dated 2/20/2018 Re:15 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents . ALLOWED. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extend Time
Fri 02/16 2:30 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:10 Scheduling Order] with certificate of service. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Fri 01/26 4:22 PM
Endorsed Order dated 1/26/2018 Re:13 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents Re:10 Scheduling Order. MOTION ALLOWED. (Zazeini, Usbc) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Extend Time
Fri 01/26 2:54 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:10 Scheduling Order] with certificate of service. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Fri 01/05 4:46 PM
Endorsed Order dated 1/5/2018 Re:11 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents . ALLOWED. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extend Time
Fri 01/05 12:28 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:10 Scheduling Order] with certificate of service. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 11/14 9:34 AM
Scheduling Order dated 11/14/17. Discovery due by 2/9/2018. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 4/13/2018. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/13 3:09 PM
Answer to Complaint with certificate of service filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Thorvaldsen, Kara) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 11/03 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 11/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 10/31 10:21 AM
Order dated 10/31/2017. I HEREBY REASSIGN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING TO JUDGE JOAN N. FEENEY. (Telam, Usbc) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Mon 10/23 12:06 PM
Endorsed Order dated 10/23/2017 Re:5 Assented to Motion filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Re:1 Complaint. ALLOWED. (Telam, Usbc) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extend Time
Mon 10/23 9:01 AM
Assented to Motion filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint [Re:1 Complaint] with certificate of service. (Thorvaldsen, Kara) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 09/19 4:35 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bank of America, N.A 9/18/2017 (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/18 10:53 AM
Summons Service Executed on Bank of America, N.A 9/18/2017 (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/14 11:51 AM
Summons Issued on Bank of America, N.A Answer Due 10/16/2017. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (Telam, Usbc) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/13 4:31 PM
Adversary case 17-01112 Complaint by Gary W. Cruickshank against Bank of America, N.A. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(Cruickshank, Kathleen) |