Cruickshank v. JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12574
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-12574
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Melvin S Hoffman |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-01113 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Sep 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
JPMorgan Chase & Co.
270 Park Avenue Floor 35
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary W. Cruickshank
21 Custom House Street Suite 920
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 12/18 11:26 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 17-01113 Dismissed Complaint (nc) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 12/18 11:26 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-1113 Closed (nc) |
||
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
49 | 49
misc
Stipulation
Mon 12/02 1:59 PM
Stipulation By Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, November 28, 2019 | ||
48 | 48
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 11/29 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 11/28/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
47 | 47
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/26 9:07 AM
Order dated 11/26/2019 RE:41 Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank and Chase Bank USA, N.A. N/K/A JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. ORDER: THE APPROVED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AS TO THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING CONTEMPLATES THE FILING OF A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. IF NO STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL HAS BEEN FILED ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 15, 2019, THE PARTIES SHALL FILE ON OR BEFORE THAT DATE A JOINT STATUS REPORT. (nc) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 10/03 12:50 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 10/02/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Approval
Mon 09/30 11:45 AM
Endorsed Order dated 9/27/2019 Re:42 Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Approve41 Settlement Agreement. ALLOWED. NO OBJECTIONS FILED. (ymw) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Signature Page
Mon 08/05 12:27 PM
Signature Page filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
43 | 43
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/05 11:18 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
42 | 42
motion
Approve
Mon 08/05 11:17 AM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Approve [Re:41 Settlement Agreement]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
41 | 41
misc
Settlement Agreement
Mon 08/05 11:16 AM
Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank and Chase Bank USA, N.A. N/K/A JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Tue 06/25 9:34 AM
Endorsed Order dated 6/25/2019 Re:39 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Deadlines Set Forth in Discovery Plan Re:11 Scheduling Order. MOTION ALLOWED. (rcontompasis, usbc) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Extend Time
Mon 06/24 4:12 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Deadlines Set Forth in Discovery Plan [Re:11 Scheduling Order]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, May 17, 2019 | ||
court
Case Reassigned
Fri 05/17 8:01 PM
By Order of Chief Judge Christopher J. Panos this case is reassigned to Bankruptcy Judge Frank J. Bailey. (ADI) |
||
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Thu 02/07 8:38 AM
Endorsed Order dated 2/7/2019 Re:37 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents Re:11 Scheduling Order. MOTION ALLOWED. (rcontompasis, usbc) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Extend Time
Wed 02/06 4:38 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to File Documents [Re:11 Scheduling Order]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Mon 09/24 12:24 PM
Endorsed Order dated 9/24/2018 Re:35 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank and Defendant Chase Bank USA, Inc. to Extend Deadlines Set Forth in Discovery Plan Re:11 Scheduling Order. MOTION ALLOWED. (rcontompasis, usbc) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Extend Time
Fri 09/21 11:15 AM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Time to Comply [Re:11 Scheduling Order]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Tue 06/05 3:53 PM
Endorsed Order dated 6/5/2018 Re:33 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Deadlines Set Forth in Discovery Plan. MOTION ALLOWED. (meh, Usbc) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Extend Time
Mon 06/04 4:05 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Deadlines Set Forth in Discovery Plan. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Fri 05/04 10:16 AM
Order dated 5/4/2018 Re:31 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Deadlines Set Forth in Discovery Plan. GRANTED. See Order for Full Text. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Extend Time
Thu 05/03 4:29 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Extend Deadlines Set Forth in Discovery Plan Re:11 Scheduling Order,20 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 04/19 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 04/18/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
17
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order/Authority
Mon 04/16 8:40 AM
Order dated 4/16/2018 Re:27 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank For Entry of Stipulated Protective Order Re:12 Amended Complaint. GRANTED. See Order for Full Text. (Zazeini, Usbc) |
|
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/13 4:42 PM
Amended Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
For Order/Authority
Wed 04/11 3:06 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank For Entry of Stipulated Protective Order Re:12 Amended Complaint. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 12/22 12:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 12/21/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Tue 12/19 11:15 AM
Endorsed Order dated 12/19/2017 Re:17 Motion filed by David Casale on behalf of Christopher O. Rivas to Appear pro hac vice for Defendant Chase Bank USA. ALLOWED. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Affidavit
Mon 12/18 7:26 PM
Affidavit of Christopher O. Rivas filed by Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Casale, David) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration re Electronic Filing | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Approval
Fri 12/15 12:02 PM
Endorsed Order dated 12/15/2017 Re:21 Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Approve . ALLOWED. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 12/14 4:21 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Approve
Thu 12/14 4:21 PM
Joint Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Approve [Re:20 Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference
Thu 12/14 4:20 PM
Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference and Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Court's Order of Deficiency
Mon 12/11 10:04 AM
Court's Order of Deficiency Re:17 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A. The deadline to cure the deficiency is 12/18/2017 at 04:30 PM. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice)
Mon 12/11 9:46 AM
Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice) issued to Christopher Rivas representing Chase Bank USA. PHV Fee Due 12/21/2017 Re:17 Motion to Appear pro hac vice filed by Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Mon 12/11 9:48 AM
Receipt Number phv-16469-1512756436, Fee Amount $100 Re:18 Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice). (lkaine, Usbc) |
||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 12/08 1:26 PM
Motion filed by David Casale on behalf of Christopher O. Rivas to Appear pro hac vice for Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A. with certificate of service. (Casale, David) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Christopher O. Rivas | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Fee Payment Confirmation | ||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 11/15 4:29 PM
Summons Service Executed on Chase Bank USA, N.A. 11/15/2017 (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
court
Summons Issued
Tue 11/14 3:28 PM
Summons Issued on Chase Bank USA, N.A. Answer Due 12/14/2017. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 11/05 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 11/03/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 11/03 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 11/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Amended Document
Wed 11/01 1:56 PM
Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 11/01 9:40 AM
Scheduling Order dated 11/1/2017. Discovery due by 2/2/2018. Pre-Trial Memorandum due by 4/6/2018. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
10 | 10
utility
Corrective Entry
Wed 11/01 9:34 AM
Order Requiring Corrective Action. You are hereby ORDERED to file the required document(s) identified in the attached order within (2) business days of the date of this order Re:5 Motion to Amend filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend
Tue 10/31 1:04 PM
Endorsed Order dated 10/31/2017 Re:5 Assented Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Amend . ALLOWED. (lkaine, Usbc) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 10/31 10:26 AM
DISREGARD. Order dated 10/31/2017. I HEREBY REASSIGN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING TO JUDGE JOAN N. FEENEY. (Telam, Usbc) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Duplicative of Doc. # 7. Modified on 10/31/2017 (Telam, Usbc) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 10/31 10:24 AM
Order dated 10/31/2017. I HEREBY REASSIGN THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING TO JUDGE JOAN N. FEENEY. (Telam, Usbc) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 10/30 6:26 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers with certificate of service filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Casale, David) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Amend
Tue 10/24 3:22 PM
Assented Motion filed by Plaintiff Gary W. Cruickshank to Amend [Re:1 Complaint] with certificate of service. (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 10/19 10:55 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Telam, Usbc) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 09/18 10:56 AM
Summons Service Executed on JPMorgan Chase & Co. 9/18/2017 (Cruickshank, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 09/14 11:53 AM
Summons Issued on JPMorgan Chase & Co. Answer Due 10/16/2017. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (Telam, Usbc) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 09/13 4:42 PM
Adversary case 17-01113 Complaint by Gary W. Cruickshank against JPMorgan Chase & Co.. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Cruickshank, Kathleen) |