Brian Guilford v. County of Eaton, et al
Original Case: 1:15-cv-01053
Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02106 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 09, 2018 3:29 AM CDT |
Defendant
COUNTY OF EATON, Michigan, jointly and severally
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
JONATHAN FROST, in his individual capacity, jointly and severally
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
BRIAN GUILFORD, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Deven Guilford
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/09/2018 3:29 AM CDT |
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
The case manager for this case is: Bryant Crutcher: 513-564-7013. (BLC) | ||
4 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Jonathan Frost. Transcript needed: y. (BLC) | ||
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Brian Guilford by Hugh M. Davis. Certificate of Service: 09/14/2017. 17-2106 (HMD) | ||
MOTION filed by Mr. Hugh M. Davis, Jr. for Brian Guilford to dismiss qualified immunity appeal Certificate of Service: 09/14/2017. 17-2106 (HMD) | ||
Att: 1 6 pgs motion | ||
Att: 2 38 pgs Additional Document | ||
1 pgs [DEFECTIVE FILING. See RE# 11] APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Brian Guilford by Cynthia Heenan. Certificate of Service: 09/14/2017. 17-2106 --[Edited 09/21/2017 by Case Manager Bryant Crutcher] (HMD) |