Aerogroup International, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11962
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11962
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11963 |
Case Filed: | Sep 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 16, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Aerogroup International, LLC
201 Meadow Rd
Edison, NJ 08817-6002 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago |
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
claims
Claims Register
Wed 01/29 4:09 PM
Final Claims Register (Alphabetical) . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Final Claims Register (Numeric) | ||
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/16 10:10 AM
Order (A) Dismissing The Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases and (B) Granting Related Relief. Signed on 1/15/2020 (DMC) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 01/16 1:57 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Murin, Leslie) |
||
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic
Thu 09/05 4:06 PM
Motion to convert was filed in main case # 17-11962 Receipt Number 92012, Fee Amount $15.00 (COH) |
||
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
Case Reassigned
Thu 06/06 2:23 PM
Order of Reassignment of Judge. Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (SH) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Mon 11/20 7:39 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Amended Statement of Financial Affairs of Aerogroup International, LLC Filed by Aerogroup International, LLC. (Fay, Erin) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Mon 11/20 7:38 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Amended Schedules of Assets and Liabilities of Aerogroup International, LLC Filed by Aerogroup International, LLC. (Fay, Erin) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 11/13 10:26 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Aerogroup International, LLC. (Fay, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Financial Affairs | ||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order-Joint Admin
Mon 09/18 2:38 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. The Following Cases are Jointly Administered for Procedural Purposes Only: 17-11962 Aerogroup International, Inc., 17-11961 AGI Holdco, Inc., 17-11963 Aerogroup International LLC, 17-11964 Aerogroup International Holdings LLC, 17-11965 Aerogroup Retail Holdings, Inc. and 17-11966 Aerogroup Gift Card Company, Inc. The Docket in Case No. 17-11962 (KJC) Should Be Consulted for All Matters Affecting This Case. Signed on 9/18/2017 (LB) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Amended Petition
Fri 09/15 12:17 PM
Amended Petition to Amended Petition to Correct County of Debtor Address Filed by Aerogroup International, LLC. (Fay, Erin) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Fri 09/15 6:27 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Aerogroup International, Inc.. (Cousins, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 09/15 6:11 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11963 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8584508, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
25
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 09/15 5:50 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition of Aerogroup International, LLC . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Aerogroup International, LLC. (Cousins, Scott) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Fri 09/15 7:42 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case. (Drechsler, Stacey) |