Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-28077

Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Susan V Kelley
Case #: 2:17-ap-02291
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2017
Terminated:Jun 11, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc.
107 Church Ave.
Oshkosh, WI 54901
Represented By
Paul G. Swanson
Steinhilber Swanson LLP
contact info
Defendant
University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation Alumni Welcome and Conference Center, LLC
625 Pearl Avenue
Oshkosh, WI 54901
Represented By
University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation Alumni Welcome and Conference Center, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Bank First National
402 North 8th Street P.O. Box 10
Manitowoc, WI 54221
Represented By
David M. Pelletier
Axley Brynelson, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 06/14 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 06/13/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Stipulation
Monday, June 11, 2018
13 13 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 06/11 4:02 PM
Order Approving Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice Related [+]. (amg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation
12 12 misc Stipulation Mon 06/11 2:05 PM
Stipulation By Bank First National and University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc., and University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation Alumni Welcome and Conference Center, LLC Filed by Bank First National Related [+] (Pelletier, David)
Related: [-] 11 Proposed Order filed by Plaintiff Bank First National
11 11 misc Proposed Order Mon 06/11 11:49 AM
Proposed Order RE:10 - Audio File filed by Attorney David M. Pelletier of Axley Brynelson, LLP on behalf of Bank First National. (Pelletier, David)
Related: [-]
utility Chambers Docket Notice Mon 06/11 12:55 PM
Notice to counsel: The Court has reviewed the proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice (11 ). No motion to dismiss the adversary proceeding or stipulation for dismissal has been filed. Please file an appropriate request for dismissal. (ecb, Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 06/11 4:03 PM
Disposition of Adversary 17-02291 svk Order on Stipulation (amg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 06/11 4:05 PM
Adversary Case 17-02291 svk Closed (amg, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 22, 2018
10 10 audio Upload Audio File Tue 05/22 12:43 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/22/2018 12:02:09 PM ]. File Size [ 1608 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:21 ]. (Final Pretrial Conference: Recovery of Money/Property). (admin)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Continued (Other) Tue 05/22 2:24 PM
Adjourned pretrial conference held 5/22/2018. David Pelletier appeared for the Plaintiff and Paul Swanson and Nicholas Hahn appeared for the Debtor-Defendant. The parties were engaged in discovery. Mr. Pelletier maintained that the matter could be determined on summary judgment, though Mr. Swanson suggested this might not be appropriate depending on the outcome of discovery. He suggested adjourning the pretrial conference until further discovery had been taken. Mr. Pelletier had no objection. The Court adjourned the pretrial conference to 7/17/2018 at 12:00 p.m. by telephone to set a briefing schedule for dispositive motions or schedule the matter for trial. An audio recording of the hearing is available on the docket. (ecb, Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
court Hearing Continued (Other) Wed 02/28 9:41 AM
Adjourned pretrial conference held 2/27/2018. David Pelletier appeared for the Plaintiff, Paul Swanson appeared for the Debtor-Defendant, and Benjamin LaFrombois appeared for Milk Source. Mr. Pelletier asserted the matter could be determined on summary judgment, but Mr. Swanson sought to conduct additional discovery. The Court scheduled a final pretrial conference for 5/22/2018 at 12:00 p.m. by telephone. At that time, the Court either will schedule a prompt trial or set a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if appropriate. An audio recording of the hearing is available on the docket. (ecb, Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
9 9 audio Upload Audio File Tue 02/27 1:09 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/27/2018 1:12:34 PM ]. File Size [ 1984 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:08 ]. (Adjourned Pretrial Conference: Recovery of Money/Property). (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
court Hearing Continued (Other) Wed 01/24 3:54 PM
Adjourned pretrial conference held 1/23/2018. David Pelletier appeared for the Plaintiff and Paul Swanson appeared for the Debtor-Defendant. The parties agreed to an adjournment pending the Court's decision on a motion to dismiss filed in the Debtor's adversary proceeding against the Board of Regents. The Court adjourned the pretrial conference to 2/27/2018 at 12:00 p.m. by telephone. To participate, call the Court's conference line at 1-888-675-2535, and enter access code 9918878 before the scheduled hearing time. This docket entry serves as electronic notice of the hearing. An audio recording of the hearing is available on the docket. (ecb, Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
8 8 audio Upload Audio File Tue 01/23 1:22 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/23/2018 1:06:35 PM ]. File Size [ 1256 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:37 ]. (Adjourned Pretrial Conference: Recovery of Money/Property). (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2017
court Hearing Continued (Other) Wed 10/25 5:57 PM
Pretrial conference held 10/24/2017. David Pelletier appeared for the Plaintiff; Paul Swanson and Claire Ann Resop appeared for Debtor-Defendant University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc.; Timothy Nixon appeared for Creditor First Business Bank; and Mark Bromley appeared for the Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System. There was no appearance on behalf of Defendant University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation Alumni Welcome and Conference Center, LLC. Mr. Pelletier stated some limited discovery was required, but following discovery, the matter could likely be resolved on summary judgment. Mr. Swanson suggested adjourning the pretrial conference. He believed that if the Debtor prevailed in its adversary proceeding against the Board of Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, that would likely obviate the need for this adversary proceeding. The Court adjourned the pretrial conference to 1/23/2018 at 12:00 p.m. by telephone, with the understanding that the parties will engage in discovery in the meantime. Mr. Pelletier also noted that he was considering filing an involuntary case against the second Defendant. An audio recording of the hearing is available on the docket. (ecb, Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2017
7 7 audio Upload Audio File Tue 10/24 3:22 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/24/2017 12:50:15 PM ]. File Size [ 2208 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:36 ]. (Pretrial Conference: Recovery of Money or Property). (admin)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Response (Not for Claims) Tue 10/24 11:37 AM
Response Filed by Plaintiff Bank First National Answer to Counterclaim to (4 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc.) Filed by Bank First National Related [+] (Pelletier, David)
Related: [-] 4 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc.
Friday, October 06, 2017
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 10/06 10:13 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc. (Hahn, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/06 10:07 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc..(Swanson, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Credit Agreement
Monday, September 18, 2017
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/18 2:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Bank First National (Pelletier, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Electronic Summons Issued Mon 09/18 11:30 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004, and file a certificate of service with the Court. Answer Due by 10/18/2017. United States and its offices and agencies answer due by 10/23/2017. Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/24/2017 at 12:00 p.m. by telephone. (ecb, Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/15 2:16 PM
Adversary case 17-02291 Complaint by Bank First National (attorney David M. Pelletier) against University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc., University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation Alumni Welcome and Conference Center, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other))(Pelletier, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G