University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc.
Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | G Michael Halfenger |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-28077 |
Case Filed: | Aug 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2019 |
Plan Confirmed: | Apr 11, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation, Inc.
107 Church Ave.
Oshkosh, WI 54901 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U. S. Trustee
517 East Wisconsin Ave. Room 430
Milwaukee, WI 53202 |
1. | The University of Wisconsin Oshkosh Foundation Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (ai-cio.com) |
Submitted Mon 08/21/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 12:03 PM CDT |