Ayyadurai v. Floor64, Inc., et al
Original Case: 1:17-cv-10011
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-civil-01945 |
Type | civil / private / torts |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Case Filed: | Sep 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 16, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 28, 2021 6:26 PM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
FLOOR64, INC., d/b/a Techdirt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL DAVID MASNICK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LEIGH BEADON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
LEIGH BEADON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
FLOOR64, INC., d/b/a Techdirt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
MICHAEL DAVID MASNICK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
SHIVA AYYADURAI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
SHIVA AYYADURAI
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/28/2021 6:26 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #50) filed by Appellant Shiva Ayyadurai. Docketing Statement due 10/11/2017. Transcript Report/Order form due 10/11/2017. Appearance form due 10/11/2017. 17-1945 (KC) | ||
Att: 1 58 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Case Opening Notice | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF |