Sweet v. H.D. Smith, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-30077
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-30077
Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Daniel S Oppermanflint |
Case #: | 4:17-ap-03085 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Oct 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
H.D. Smith, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel D. Sweet, Chapter 7 Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
court
Minute Entry. Case Closed
Tue 10/16 10:16 AM
Minute Entry. Case Closed. (JAM) |
||
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 05/04 8:07 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING WITH PREJUDICE . (Mum, J) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
Thu 05/03 1:57 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant . Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise)
Thu 04/26 11:31 AM
Upon Entry of the Order to Authorize and Approve Settlement Agreement in the Bankruptcy Case, Entered on April 26, 2018, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Daniel S. Opperman. (Mum, J) |
|
20 | 20
court
Copy of
Thu 04/26 11:29 AM
Copy of: Order Granting Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 to Authorize and Approve Settlement Agreement by and between the Chapter 7 Trustee H.D. Smith (entered in debtor's bankruptcy). (Mum, J) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Thu 04/26 11:31 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:17-ap-3085 : Settled. (Mum, J) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 04/26 11:32 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3085 Closed. (Mum, J) |
||
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 01/29 1:21 PM
Certificate of Service of Defendants Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Filed by Defendant H.D. Smith, LLC. (Hillegonds, Rachel) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 01/22 9:59 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant H.D. Smith, LLC . (Piggins, John) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1)
Mon 01/22 9:58 AM
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Defendant H.D. Smith, LLC . (Piggins, John) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 01/19 3:38 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet . (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1)
Fri 01/19 3:37 PM
Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 12/22 10:13 AM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 10/2/2018 at 01:30PM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. Trial date set for 10/30/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. (JAM) |
|
court
Minute Entry. Scheduling Order To Be Issued
Fri 12/22 10:06 AM
Minute Entry. 26f Report Filed. Scheduling Order To Be Issued (JAM ) |
||
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 12/19 5:07 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet . (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Interrogatories
Tue 12/19 5:07 PM
Interrogatories , Request for Admissions , Request for Production of Documents Defendant HD Smith, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference
Tue 12/19 5:05 PM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Thu 11/30 2:53 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Corporate parents added to case: H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC. Filed by Defendant H.D. Smith, LLC. (Piggins, John) |
|
9 | 9
court
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference
Thu 11/30 10:28 AM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 1/3/2018 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. (JAM) |
|
8 | 8
court
Deficiency Notice (AP)
Thu 11/30 10:09 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing - Defendant's Statement of Corporate Ownership Due on 12/07/2017. (Mum, J) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 1:29 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant H.D. Smith, LLC . (Piggins, John) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 11/29 1:27 PM
Answer to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses Filed by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Piggins, John) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Extend (order)
Thu 11/16 3:38 PM
Order Extending Deadline For Defendant To File Answer - Extended to 12/01/2017 . (Mum, J) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Thu 11/16 2:23 PM
Stipulation By and Between H. D. Smith, LLC Re: Samuel D. Sweet, Trustee to Extend Deadline forDefendant to File Answer to Complaint . Filed by Defendant H.D. Smith, LLC. (Piggins, John) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 10/27 1:05 PM
Summons Service Executed on H.D. Smith, LLC 10/27/2017 (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Fri 10/27 11:45 AM
Summons Issued on H.D. Smith, LLC Answer Due 11/27/2017 (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/27 11:45 AM
Adversary case 17-03085 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)): Complaint by Samuel D. Sweet against H.D. Smith, LLC. Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Kochis, Anthony) |