Edwards v. Private Investigations and Counter Intelligence Se
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-70730
Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Tracey N Wise |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-07039 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Private Investigations and Counter Intelligence Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J. Clair Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/10 6:15 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by GC. Receipt Number 400251. (admin) |
||
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 04/26 4:04 PM
Adversary Proceeding 17-7039 Closed. (Sutphin, Sheila) |
||
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wed 04/11 4:36 PM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (bjp) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
utility
Proposed Order Submitted(AP)
Tue 04/10 3:37 PM
Proposed Order submitted by T. Kent Barber. (Barber, T.) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Remanding
Thu 03/01 9:54 AM
Order Remanding and Striking Trial . (nbw) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice
Wed 02/28 11:07 AM
Notice of Settlement Filed by J. Clair Edwards, Private Investigations and Counter Intelligence Services, Inc.. (Barber, T.) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice
Thu 02/22 10:20 AM
Notice of Settlement Filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Barber, T.) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Agreed Order
Tue 02/06 8:45 AM
Third Agreed Order regarding extension of time . (nbw) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
utility
Proposed Order Submitted(AP)
Mon 02/05 10:49 AM
Proposed Order submitted by Mary Elisabeth Naumann . (Naumann, Mary) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extend Time
Fri 02/02 2:35 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint, filed by Private Investigations and Counter Intelligence Services, Inc. . Last day to file objections: 2/16/2018. (Naumann, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Agreed Order
Wed 01/03 3:11 PM
Second Agreed Order regarding extension of time. (nbw) |
|
12 | 12
utility
Proposed Order Submitted(AP)
Wed 01/03 10:00 AM
Proposed Order submitted by Mary Elisabeth Naumann . (Naumann, Mary) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Agreed Order
Mon 12/04 10:19 AM
Agreed Order regarding extension of time. (nbw) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
utility
Proposed Order Submitted(AP)
Fri 12/01 2:55 PM
Proposed Order submitted by Mary Elisabeth Naumann . (Naumann, Mary) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Certificate of Service
Thu 11/16 10:21 AM
Certificate of Service , filed by T. Kent Barber . (Barber, T.) |
|
8 | 8
court
Summons Service Executed
Thu 11/16 9:47 AM
Summons Service Executed. (Barber, T.) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Trial
Thu 11/09 8:47 AM
Order for Trial . Trial date set for 4/24/2018 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (nbw) Attorney for Plaintiff(s) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice
Wed 11/08 2:17 PM
Notice of Consent to Entry of Final Judgment Filed by J. Clair Edwards. (Barber, T.) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
epo
File Statement re: Consent
Tue 11/07 1:45 PM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7008 and 9027(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a Complaint, Counterclaim, Cross-Claim, Third-Party Complaint and Notice of Removal shall contain a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the Bankruptcy Court. It appearing to the court that the Complaint [ECF No. 1 ] filed by Plaintiff on November 3, 2017 does not contain such a statement, the Court hereby directs that, within 7 days of the entry of this Order, Plaintiff file a statement whether she consents to the entry of final orders or judgment on the Complaint by this Court in conformity with the above-mentioned rules. /s/ Judge Tracey N. Wise. Date due: 11/14/2017.(nbw) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Tue 11/07 1:38 PM
Summons Issued to Plaintiff for Service. (nbw) |
|
3 | 3
order
Application to Defer Filing Fee(O)
Tue 11/07 1:37 PM
Order GRANTING Application to Defer Filing Fee (nbw) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Defer Filing Fee
Mon 11/06 10:15 AM
Application to Defer Filing Fee. (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/03 7:09 PM
Adversary case 17-07039 Complaint, filed by J. Clair Edwards against Private Investigations and Counter Intelligence Services, Inc. Fee Amount 350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer))(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Barber, T.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |