Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-44642

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark X Mullin
Case #: 4:17-bk-44641
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2017
Terminated:Feb 06, 2020

TypePartnership
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P.
1561 Newton Ave
Bowling Green, KY 42104-3238
Represented By
Stephen A. McCartin
Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242


Docket last updated: 11/12/2017 6:00 PM CST
Monday, November 13, 2017
crditcrd none Mon 11/13 12:43 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 17-44641 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 24443741, amount $1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 15 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Mon 11/13 11:05 AM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P. (McCartin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Ex parte relief Mon 11/13 11:22 AM
Motion for ex parte relief transfer / reassign cases Filed by Debtor Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P. (McCartin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 9 pgs motion Joint administration Mon 11/13 2:51 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases Case No.: 17-44642 Case No.: 17-44641 Case No.: 17-44644 Case No.: 17-44645 Case No.: 17-44646 Case No.: 17-44647 Case No.: 17-44648 Case No.: 17-44649 Case No.: 17-44650 Case No.: 17-44651 Case No.: 17-44652 Case No.: 17-44653 Case No.: 17-44654 Case No.: 17-44655 Case No.: 17-44656 Case No.: 17-44567 Case No.: 17-44660 Case No.: 17-44661 Case No.: 17-44663 Case No.: 17-44665 Case No.: 17-44666 Case No.: 17-44669 Case No.: 17-44659 Case No.: 17-44662 Case No.: 17-44664 Case No.: 17-44667 Case No.: 17-44670 Case No.: 17-44671 Case No.: 17-44673 Case No.: 17-44674 Case No.: 17-44675 Case No.: 17-44676 Case No.: 17-44677 Case No.: 17-44678 Filed by Debtor Bowling Green Health Facilities, L.P. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 court Notice of deficiency Mon 11/13 4:34 PM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 11/27/2017. Schedule D due 11/27/2017. Schedule E/F due 11/27/2017. Schedule G due 11/27/2017. Schedule H due 11/27/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 11/27/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/27/2017. Creditor matrix due 11/15/2017. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 11/15/2017. (Luna, G)
Related: [-]