Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark X Mullin
Case #: 4:17-bk-44642
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2017
Terminated:Jan 11, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Preferred Care Inc.
5500 W Plano Pkwy Ste 210
Plano, TX 75093-4835
Represented By
Stephen A. McCartin
Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242


Docket last updated: 11/12/2017 6:00 PM CST
Monday, November 13, 2017
crditcrd none Mon 11/13 4:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 17-44642 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 24446686, amount $1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 303 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Mon 11/13 11:13 AM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Preferred Care Inc. (McCartin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Joint administration Mon 11/13 2:47 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases Case No.: 17-44642 Case No.: 17-44641 Case No.: 17-44644 Case No.: 17-44645 Case No.: 17-44646 Case No.: 17-44647 Case No.: 17-44648 Case No.: 17-44649 Case No.: 17-44650 Case No.: 17-44651 Case No.: 17-44652 Case No.: 17-44653 Case No.: 17-44654 Case No.: 17-44655 Case No.: 17-44656 Case No.: 17-44567 Case No.: 17-44660 Case No.: 17-44661 Case No.: 17-44663 Case No.: 17-44665 Case No.: 17-44666 Case No.: 17-44669 Case No.: 17-44659 Case No.: 17-44662 Case No.: 17-44664 Case No.: 17-44667 Case No.: 17-44670 Case No.: 17-44671 Case No.: 17-44673 Case No.: 17-44674 Case No.: 17-44675 Case No.: 17-44676 Case No.: 17-44677 Case No.: 17-44678 Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 motion First day motions Mon 11/13 3:15 PM
Motion to establish procedures Notice Procedures and Approving Form Notice of Commencement of Cases. Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (McCartin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 motion First day motions Mon 11/13 3:38 PM
Motion to establish procedures Authorize the Filing of a Consolidated List of Creditors and Top 30 Largest Creditors and Proof of Claim. Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (McCartin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 motion Extend/Shorten time Mon 11/13 3:39 PM
Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (McCartin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion First day motions Mon 11/13 3:42 PM
Motion to establish procedures Interim Compensation. Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (McCartin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 motion Pay Mon 11/13 3:46 PM
Motion to pay Utilities Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 motion Pay Mon 11/13 3:47 PM
Motion to pay Insurance Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 motion Pay Mon 11/13 3:48 PM
Motion to pay Wages Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 motion Pay Mon 11/13 3:49 PM
Motion to pay Taxes Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 motion First day motions Mon 11/13 3:51 PM
Motion to establish procedures regarding Resident Refunds. Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 motion First day motions Mon 11/13 3:53 PM
Motion to establish procedures regardings Confidential Patient Information. Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 motion 1st. Day - Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case Mon 11/13 4:34 PM
Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc.. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 motion First day motions Mon 11/13 5:18 PM
Motion to maintain bank accounts. Cash Management Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (McCartin, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 notice Notice of appearance and request for notice Mon 11/13 5:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice NOTICE OF APPEARANCES, REQUEST FOR ALL NOTICES, AND DEMAND FOR SERVICE OF ALL PLEADINGS AND FILINGS by David Weitman filed by Creditor WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Weitman, David)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Cash collateral Mon 11/13 6:30 PM
Motion to use cash collateral HUD Debtors Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Cash collateral Mon 11/13 6:31 PM
Motion to use cash collateral Omega and FC Domino Debtors Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Cash collateral Mon 11/13 6:38 PM
Motion to use cash collateral Wells Fargo DIP Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Request for expedited consideration of first day matter Mon 11/13 6:45 PM
Request for expedited consideration of first day matter. Re: filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. Related [+]. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for joint administration of cases Case No.: 17-44642 Case No.: 17-44641 Case No.: 17-44644 Case No.: 17-44645 Case No.: 17-44646 Case No.: 17-44647 Case No.: 17-44648 Case No.: 17-44649 Case No.: 17-44650 Case No.: 17-44651 Case No.:,4 Motion to establish procedures Notice Procedures and Approving Form Notice of Commencement of Cases. ,5 Motion to establish procedures Authorize the Filing of a Consolidated List of Creditors and Top 30 Largest Creditors and Proof of Claim. ,6 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix,7 Motion to establish procedures Interim Compensation. ,8 Motion to pay Utilities ,9 Motion to pay Insurance ,10 Motion to pay Wages ,11 Motion to pay Taxes ,12 Motion to establish procedures regarding Resident Refunds. ,13 Motion to establish procedures regardings Confidential Patient Information. ,14 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case ,15 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Cash Management ,17 Motion to use cash collateral HUD Debtors ,18 Motion to use cash collateral Omega and FC Domino Debtors ,19 Motion to use cash collateral Wells Fargo DIP
Att: 1 Proposed Order
21 21 notice Notice of hearing Mon 11/13 6:49 PM
Notice of hearing on First Day Matters filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 11/15/2017 at 10:00 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Mullin's Ctrm. for19 and for10 and for12 and for3 and for6 and for5 and for18 and for4 and for17 and for8 and for9 and for13 and for14 and for7 and for15 and for11 , (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for joint administration of cases Case No.: 17-44642 Case No.: 17-44641 Case No.: 17-44644 Case No.: 17-44645 Case No.: 17-44646 Case No.: 17-44647 Case No.: 17-44648 Case No.: 17-44649 Case No.: 17-44650 Case No.: 17-44651 Case No.: 17-44652 Case No.: 17-44653 Case No.: 17-44654 Case No.: 17-44655 Case No.: 17-44656 Case No.: 17-44567 Case No.: 17-44660 Case No.: 17-44661 Case No.: 17-44663 Case No.: 17-44665 Case No.: 17-44666 Case No.: 17-44669 Case No.: 17-44659 Case No.: 17-44662 Case No.: 17-44664 Case No.: 17-44667 Case No.: 17-44670 Case No.: 17-44671 Case No.: 17-44673 Case No.: 17-44674 Case No.: 17-44675 Case No.: 17-44676 Case No.: 17-44677 Case No.: 17-44678 Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),4 Motion to establish procedures Notice Procedures and Approving Form Notice of Commencement of Cases. Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),5 Motion to establish procedures Authorize the Filing of a Consolidated List of Creditors and Top 30 Largest Creditors and Proof of Claim. Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),6 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),7 Motion to establish procedures Interim Compensation. Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),8 Motion to pay Utilities Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),9 Motion to pay Insurance Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),10 Motion to pay Wages Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),11 Motion to pay Taxes Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),12 Motion to establish procedures regarding Resident Refunds. Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),13 Motion to establish procedures regardings Confidential Patient Information. Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),14 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),15 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Cash Management Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order),17 Motion to use cash collateral HUD Debtors Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc.,18 Motion to use cash collateral Omega and FC Domino Debtors Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc.,19 Motion to use cash collateral Wells Fargo DIP Filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc.
22 22 24 pgs misc Declaration Mon 11/13 6:55 PM
Declaration re: in support of First Day Pleadings filed by Debtor Preferred Care Inc. Related [+]. (Moore, Mark)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for joint administration of cases Case No.: 17-44642 Case No.: 17-44641 Case No.: 17-44644 Case No.: 17-44645 Case No.: 17-44646 Case No.: 17-44647 Case No.: 17-44648 Case No.: 17-44649 Case No.: 17-44650 Case No.: 17-44651 Case No.:,4 Motion to establish procedures Notice Procedures and Approving Form Notice of Commencement of Cases. ,5 Motion to establish procedures Authorize the Filing of a Consolidated List of Creditors and Top 30 Largest Creditors and Proof of Claim. ,6 Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix,7 Motion to establish procedures Interim Compensation. ,8 Motion to pay Utilities ,9 Motion to pay Insurance ,10 Motion to pay Wages ,11 Motion to pay Taxes ,12 Motion to establish procedures regarding Resident Refunds. ,13 Motion to establish procedures regardings Confidential Patient Information. ,14 Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case ,15 Motion to maintain bank accounts. Cash Management ,17 Motion to use cash collateral HUD Debtors ,18 Motion to use cash collateral Omega and FC Domino Debtors ,19 Motion to use cash collateral Wells Fargo DIP
Att: 1 Exhibit A