Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-30078

Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Harry C Dees, Jr
Case #: 3:17-ap-03036
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Earl D. Miller
2120 Ramsgate Terrace
Colorado Springs, CO 80919
Represented By
Earl D. Miller
contact info
Plaintiff
Douglas R. Adelsperger
111 West Wayne Street
Fort Wayne, IN 46802
Represented By
Edmund P. Kos
Kos & Associate
contact info
David M. Mustard
Kos & Associates
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Nancy J. Gargula
100 East Wayne Street, 5th Floor
South Bend, IN 46601


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Thursday, January 17, 2019
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Fri 01/18 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 01/17/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Judgment
Tuesday, January 15, 2019
21 21 order Judgment Tue 01/15 2:42 PM
Agreed Judgment With Payment Incentives Related [+]. (dlh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
20 20 notice Other Notice Tue 11/13 4:14 PM
Trustee's Notice of Address Change for Defendant Earl D. Miller Filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger (Kos, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 13, 2018
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Fri 09/14 12:46 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 09/13/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
18 18 order Withdraw As Attorney Tue 09/11 12:58 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney Related [+] (dlh)
Related: [-] 17
Friday, August 31, 2018
17 17 motion Withdraw As Attorney Tue 09/04 4:21 PM
Verified Application And Notice Of Attorney Withdrawal Filed by Attorney Andrew J Thompson (dlh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 30, 2018
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Fri 08/31 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/30/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
15 15 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/28 4:07 PM
Order Canceling August 29, 2018 Pre-Trial Conference Related [+]. (crd)
Related: [-] 10 Order Setting Conference
Friday, August 24, 2018
14 14 misc Proposed Order Fri 08/24 3:02 PM
Proposed Order Canceling August 29, 2018, Pre-Trial Conference Filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger Related [+] (Kos, Edmund)
Related: [-] 10 Order Setting Conference,12 Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing filed by Douglas R. Adelsperger,13 Report filed by Douglas R. Adelsperger, Earl D. Miller
13 13 misc Report Fri 08/24 2:56 PM
Report Filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger, Defendant Earl D. Miller - Report of the Parties in Lieu of Filing a Rule 26(F) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Related [+]. (Kos, Edmund)
Related: [-] 10 Order Setting Conference
Thursday, August 16, 2018
12 12 motion Continue Hearing Thu 08/16 2:29 PM
Trustee's Motion to Continue Hearing On August 29, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. Filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger Related [+] (Kos, Edmund)
Related: [-] 10 Order Setting Conference
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 09, 2018
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Fri 08/10 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/09/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Setting Conference
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
10 10 order Set Conference Tue 08/07 2:42 PM
Order Related [+]. Telephonic Pre-Trial/scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2018 at 10:30 AM at Room 234, 401 South Michigan Street (South Bend). (dlh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger
Monday, March 26, 2018
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/28 9:43 AM
Appearance of Counsel by Andrew J. Thompson Filed by Defendant Earl D. Miller (crd)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2018
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/22 4:29 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defense to Complaint Filed by Defendant Earl D. Miller (dlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2017
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/05 2:01 PM
Notice of Appearance by R. William Jonas(LP) Jr. Filed by Interested Party Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Jonas(LP), R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/28 11:05 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons on Earl D. Miller 11/21/2017 . (Kos, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Thu 11/23 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 11/22/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
Monday, November 20, 2017
4 4 court Summons Issued Mon 11/20 11:51 AM
Summons Issued on Earl D. Miller Date Issued 11/20/2017, Answer Due 12/20/2017. (dlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2017
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/17 4:41 PM
Notice of Appearance by David M. Mustard Filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger (Mustard, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/17 4:37 PM
Notice of Appearance by Edmund P. Kos Filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger (Kos, Edmund)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/17 4:30 PM
Adversary case 17-03036 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer),14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Douglas R. Adelsperger against Earl D. Miller. Fee Amount $350. (Kos, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Unit Purchase Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Signed Lease
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: Gingerich Settlement Agreement & Release
Att: 4 Exhibit 4: Audio Transcription of November 15, 2016, 341 Meeting of Creditors