Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-13575

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ernest M Robles
Case #: 2:17-ap-01540
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2017
Terminated:Mar 20, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Yonggan Pan
Represented By
Yonggan Pan
contact info
Plaintiff
Liberty Asset Management Corporation
Represented By
David B Golubchik
Levene Neale Bender Yoo & Brill LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Wed 03/21 9:30 PM
Receipt of Certification Fee - $11.00 by 03. Receipt Number 20226124. (admin)
Related: [-]
court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Wed 03/21 9:30 PM
Receipt of Forms - $1.50 by 03. Receipt Number 20226124. (admin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
26 26 court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/20 5:13 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-1540 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation,3 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, March 01, 2018
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 03/01 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/01/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion for Default Judgment (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
24 24 order DEFAULT JUDGMENT (BNC-PDF) Tue 02/27 2:50 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment in favor of Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation and against Defendant Yonggang Pan aka Yonggan Pan(BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 2/27/2018. (Lewis, Litaun)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, February 22, 2018
23 23 court Hearing Held (Motion) Thu 02/22 1:02 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] (see ruling attached). Granted. Party to lodge order: Movant. (Lomeli, Lydia R.) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2018 (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation
Tuesday, February 13, 2018
22 22 court Hearing Held (Other) Tue 02/13 3:42 PM
Hearing Held re Status Hearing1 Adversary case 2:17-ap-01540. Complaint by Liberty Asset Management Corporation against Yonggan Pan - This hearing is vacated and no appearances are required. Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Default Judgment which is set for hearing on February 22, 2018. A continued status conference will be held on April 17, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. The continued status conference will go off calendar in the event default judgment is entered. Plaintiff to lodge order; (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
21 21 notice Notice Mon 02/12 3:16 PM
Notice of Continued Status Conference Filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2018
20 20 misc Errata Thu 02/01 11:13 AM
Errata / Notice of Errata Re: Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation Related [+]. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Default Judgment
19 19 court Hearing Set(Motion) Thu 02/01 8:55 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 2/22/2018 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
18 18 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 01/31 4:55 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation Related [+]. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation Default Judgment Motion due by 03/2/2018.
17 17 misc Declaration Wed 01/31 4:52 PM
Memorandum of points and authorities and , Declaration re: Lawrence R. Perkins in Support of Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation Related [+]. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for Default Judgment
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B
Att: 2 Exhibit C-F & proof of service
16 16 motion Default Judgment (motion) Wed 01/31 4:45 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation Default Judgment Motion due by 03/2/2018. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
15 15 misc Status report Tue 01/30 12:01 PM
Status report / Unilateral Status Report Filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation Related [+]. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, January 13, 2018
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 01/13 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/13/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Notice that Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC)
Thursday, January 11, 2018
13 13 misc Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC) Thu 01/11 12:28 PM
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default Against Defendant(s) YONGGAN PAN Related [+] (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 9 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
12 12 misc Declaration Tue 01/09 3:48 PM
Declaration re: David B. Golubchik in Support of Request for Entry of Default Against Yonggan Pan Filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation Related [+]. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-] 9 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1)
Saturday, December 30, 2017
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 12/30 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Notice that Clerk Has Not Entered Default (BNC)
Thursday, December 28, 2017
10 10 misc Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC) Thu 12/28 3:51 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) Yonggan Pan Related [+] (Lomeli, Lydia R.)
Related: [-] 9 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporationquires declaration in support
Friday, December 22, 2017
9 9 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Fri 12/22 3:37 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Yonggan Pan Filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation. (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2017
8 8 court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 12/15 10:08 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/14/2018 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Trial date set for 8/27/2018 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation
Thursday, November 23, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 11/23 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 11/23 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/21 4:04 PM
Summons Service Executed on Yonggan Pan 11/21/2017 (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 11/21 2:34 PM
Order Re: Courtroom Procedures; (BNC-PDF) Signed on 11/21/2017 Related [+]. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation
3 3 order Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Tue 11/21 2:33 PM
Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Signed on 11/21/2017. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/14/2018 at 11:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles Discovery due by 7/28/2018. Trial date set for 8/27/2018 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 11/21 2:20 PM
Summons Issued on Yonggan Pan Date Issued 11/21/2017, Answer Due 12/21/2017 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/13/2018 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 1568, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Ernest M. Robles (Evangelista, Maria)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Liberty Asset Management Corporation
Friday, November 17, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/17 4:30 PM
Adversary case 2:17-ap-01540. Complaint by Liberty Asset Management Corporation against Yonggan Pan. (Fee Not Required). / Complaint for: (1) Slander of Title; (2) Disallowance of Claim [11 U.S.C. § 502(b); (3) Avoidance of Lien; [FRBP 7001] (4) Declaratory Relief; (5) Violation of Cal. Civ. Code § 2943; (6) Punitive Damages; and (7) Attorneys' Fees and Costs Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(81 (Subordination of claim or interest)) (Golubchik, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet