Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-09308

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Carol A Doyle
Case #: 1:17-ap-00573
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2017
Terminated:Aug 29, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
MTZ Enterprises, LLC, MTZ Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
MTZ Enterprises, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald R. Peterson, Ronald R. Peterson
Jenner & Block LLP Jenner & Block LLP 353 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
Nicholas E. Ballen
Jenner Block LLP
contact info
Landon S Raiford
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
18 18 court Close Adversary Case Wed 08/29 11:08 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-573 Closed . (Chavez, Baldo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
17 17 court Hearing Stricken (Other) Tue 08/28 2:20 PM
Hearing Scheduled for August 29, 2018 is Stricken Related [+]. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, August 27, 2018
16 16 misc Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 08/27 2:15 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Ronald Peterson on behalf of Ronald R. Peterson. (Peterson, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 14, 2018
15 15 misc Substitution of Attorney Tue 08/14 12:02 PM
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Nicholas E. Ballen on behalf of Ronald R. Peterson. (Ballen, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
14 14 order Scheduling Thu 03/01 11:15 AM
Discovery Scheduling Order Related [+]. Fact Discovery Cutoff 7/13/2018. Expert Discovery Cutoff 8/10/2018. Initial Disclosure Statement due by 3/14/2018. Post Discovery Status hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Signed on 2/28/2018 (Cabrales, Claudia)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, February 14, 2018
13 13 utility U - Draft Order Wed 02/14 2:28 PM
Draft Order Related [+], due by 2/28/2018. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
12 12 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 02/14 2:28 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 08/29/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 02/14/2018. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, January 10, 2018
11 11 order Extend Time Thu 01/11 1:14 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+]. Answer due by: 1/8/2018. Signed on 1/10/2018. (Cabrales, Claudia)
Related: [-] 7
10 10 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 01/10 12:23 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 02/14/2018 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 742 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 01/10/2018. (Castaneda, Peter)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, January 08, 2018
9 9 notice 4-Notice of Filing Mon 01/08 7:58 PM
Notice of Filing Filed by Joel A Schechter ESQ on behalf of MTZ Enterprises, LLC Related [+]. (Schechter, Joel)
Related: [-] 8 Answer to Complaint
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/08 7:58 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Joel A Schechter ESQ on behalf of MTZ Enterprises, LLC. (Schechter, Joel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2017
7 7 motion Extend Time Wed 12/27 1:52 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Extend Time To File Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint Filed by Joel A Schechter ESQ on behalf of MTZ Enterprises, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 1/10/2018 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Schechter, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/28 10:11 AM
Summons Service Executed on MTZ Enterprises, LLC Related [+]. (Ballen, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
5 5 misc Appearance Tue 11/28 10:06 AM
Appearance Filed by Nicholas E. Ballen on behalf of Ronald R. Peterson. (Ballen, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Appearance Tue 11/28 10:04 AM
Appearance Filed by Landon S Raiford on behalf of Ronald R. Peterson. (Raiford, Landon)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd none Tue 11/28 9:46 AM
Receipt of Complaint 17-00573 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 36019930. Fee Amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, November 27, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 11/27 2:42 PM
Summons Issued on MTZ Enterprises, LLC Answer Due 12/27/2017 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/27 2:42 PM
Adversary case 17-00573 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (72 (Injunctive relief - other)): Complaint by Ronald R. Peterson against MTZ Enterprises, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 1/10/2018 at 10:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 742, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Peterson, Ronald)
Related: [-]