Sweet v. Medline Industries, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-30077
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-30077
Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Daniel S Oppermanflint |
Case #: | 4:17-ap-03094 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Dec 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Medline Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel D. Sweet
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago |
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise)
Fri 05/11 11:31 AM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 5/11/18, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Daniel S. Opperman. (kcm) |
|
31 | 31
court
Copy of
Fri 05/11 11:28 AM
Copy of: Order Granting Motion Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 To Authorize And Approve Settlement Agreement By And Between The Chapter 7 Trustee And Medline Industries, Inc. (Entered in debtor's bankruptcy). (kcm) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Fri 05/11 11:32 AM
Disposition of Adversary 4:17-ap-3094 : Settled. (kcm) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 05/11 11:34 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3094 Closed. (kcm) |
||
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
court
Minute Entry. Motion Withdrawn
Mon 04/16 7:45 AM
Minute Entry. Motion Withdrawn. (JAM ) |
||
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Compel
Fri 04/13 4:05 PM
Stipulated Order Withdrawing Plaintiff's Motion To Compel And Cancelling Hearing (Docket #26 ) . (Mum, J) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation
Fri 04/13 3:26 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant Re: Entry of Order Withdrawing Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Cancelling Hearing [Docket No. 26] . Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
court
Notice of Hearing (AP)
Mon 04/02 10:10 AM
Notice of Hearing . Hearing to be held on 4/25/2018 at 09:30 AM Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St. for26 , (JAM) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
answer
Response
Fri 03/30 3:22 PM
Response to Filed by Defendant Medline Industries, Inc. (Elrod, John) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Compel
Fri 03/16 4:12 PM
Motion to Compel Discovery Responses Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/14 8:52 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Medline Industries, Inc. . (Elrod, John) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/14 8:52 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Medline Industries, Inc. . (Elrod, John) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/14 8:51 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Medline Industries, Inc. . (Elrod, John) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/14 8:50 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Medline Industries, Inc. . (Elrod, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Tue 03/13 2:37 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Defendant Medline Industries, Inc.. (Elrod, John) |
|
20 | 20
court
Deficiency Notice (AP)
Tue 03/13 1:48 PM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Non-Compliant - Corrected Proof of Service Due on 03/20/2018. (Mum, J) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Interrogatories
Tue 03/13 12:25 PM
Interrogatories to Chapter 7 Trustee , Request for Admissions to Chapter 7 Trustee , Request for Production of Documents Chapter 7 Trustee Filed by Defendant Medline Industries, Inc.. (Elrod, John) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Response to Discovery
Mon 03/12 4:52 PM
Response to Discovery Filed by Defendant Medline Industries, Inc. . (Rosenthal, Rebecca) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 02/28 11:33 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet . (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1)
Wed 02/28 11:32 AM
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 02/22 12:32 PM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 11/6/2018 at 01:30PM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. Trial date set for 12/4/2018 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. (JAM) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
court
Minute Entry
Wed 02/21 4:01 PM
Minute Entry. 26f report filed. Scheduling order to follow. (JAM ) |
||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference
Fri 02/16 8:58 AM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/06 4:36 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet . (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Interrogatories
Tue 02/06 4:34 PM
Interrogatories and , Request for Production of Documents Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
Deficiency Notice (AP)
Fri 01/19 8:22 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing - Defendant's Statement of Corporate Ownership Due on 01/26/2018. (Mum, J) |
|
10 | 10
court
Deficiency Notice (AP)
Fri 01/19 8:21 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Non-Compliant - Corrected Proof of Service Due on 01/26/2018. (Mum, J) |
|
9 | 9
court
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference
Fri 01/19 8:05 AM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 2/28/2018 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. (JAM) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 01/18 3:22 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Medline Industries, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Rebecca) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Extend (order)
Fri 01/12 10:32 AM
Order (I) Setting Aside Clerk's Entry Of Default And (II) Extending Deadline For Defendant To File Answer - Extended to 01/18/2018 . (Mum, J) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Thu 01/11 2:47 PM
Stipulation By and Between Samuel D. Sweet, Medline Industries, Inc. Re: Stipulation Setting Aside Clerk's Entry of Default and Extending Time to Answer to Complaint . Filed by Defendant Medline Industries, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 01/11 10:00 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Medline Industries, Inc. - Default Judgment Motion due by 01/25/2018. (Mum, J) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/03 7:19 PM
Stipulation By and Between Sweet and Medline Industries, Inc. Re: Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Defendant Medline Industries, Inc.. (Rosenthal, Rebecca) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Mon 12/04 4:58 PM
Summons Service Executed on Medline Industries, Inc. 12/4/2017 (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Mon 12/04 12:13 PM
Summons Issued on Medline Industries, Inc. Answer Due 01/3/2018 (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/04 12:13 PM
Adversary case 17-03094 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Samuel D. Sweet against Medline Industries, Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Kochis, Anthony) |