Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:17-bk-12914
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2017
Terminated:May 11, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Jan 17, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Orchard Acquisition Company, LLC
160 Greentree Drive Suite 101
Dover, DE 19904
Represented By
Elizabeth Soper Justison
Young Conaway
contact info
Edmon L. Morton
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Elisha D. Graff
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Edward R Linden
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Tara C Pakrouh
Young Conaway
contact info
Randi Lynn Veenstra
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Nicholas Baker
Simpson Thacher & Barlett LLP
contact info
Bryce L. Friedman
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Kathrine A. McLendon
Simpson Thacher And Bartlett LLP
contact info
Haley E Garrett
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:55 PM EST
Attorney
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
Attorney
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP
Auditor
Ernst & Young LLP
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk LLC
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Benjamin Joseph Steele
Prime Clerk LLC
contact info
Creditor
Fidelity Information Services, LLC
11601 Roosevelt Blvd, TA-41
St. Petersburg, FL 33716
Creditor
Jefferies Finance LLC
Represented By
Natasha Tsiouris
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Jeremy William Ryan
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Damian S. Schaible
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Erik Jerrard
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
David Ryan Slaugh
Potter Anderson & Corron LLP
contact info
R. Stephen McNeill
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Creditor
Dell Marketing, L.P.
811 Barton Springs Road Suite 811
Austin, TX 78704
Represented By
Sabrina L. Streusand
Streusand, Landon, Ozburn & Lemmon, LLP
contact info
Creditor
AC Lordi Consulting, LLC.
Represented By
Joseph H. Huston, Jr.
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Interested Party
HPS Investment Partners, LLC and Certain of Its Affiliates
Represented By
Matthew Barr
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Kelly DiBlasi
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Matthew O Talmo
Morris, Nichols Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Curtis S. Miller
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Interested Party
Texas Capital Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Matthew P. Austria
Austria Shrum LLC
contact info
Jason T. Rodriguez
Higier Allen & Lautin
contact info
Other Prof.
Attolon Consulting, LLC
Other Prof.
Evercore Group L.L.C.
Other Prof.
Ankura Consulting Group, LLC
Other Prof.
KPMG LLP
Other Prof.
Prime Clerk, LLC
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Linda J. Casey
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info


1. J.G. Wentworth Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 12/12/2017
Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Friday, June 22, 2018
232 232 court Standing Order/Transcripts Fri 06/22 3:43 PM
The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 6/22/2018 to 7/6/2018. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080. (BJM)
Related: [-]