The J.G. Wentworth Company, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-12914
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-12914
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin Gross |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-12915 |
Case Filed: | Dec 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
The J.G. Wentworth Company, LLC
1200 Morris Dr Ste 300
Chesterbrook, PA 19087-5507 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Final Claims Register (Alphabetical) . Filed by Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 04/11 2:47 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SH) |
||
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Final Decree and Order Closing the Chapter 11 Cases and Terminating Claims and Noticing Services. Signed on 4/10/2018 (SJS) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Authorizing the Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Orchard Acquisition Company LLC, The JG Wentworth Company LLC, The JG Wentworth Company, J.G. Wentworth LLC and JGW Holdings Inc. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Orchard Acquisition Company LLC, Case No. 17-12914 KG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 12/13/2017 (SH) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 12/12 11:22 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-12915 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8685171, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by The J.G. Wentworth Company, LLC. (Morton, Edmon) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Tue 12/12 8:10 AM
Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Casey, Linda) |
||
court
Case Assigned
Tue 12/12 8:19 AM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case (LCo) |