Original Case: 6:11-cv-06026

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:13-cv-01257
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2013
Terminated:Feb 07, 2014
Last checked: Monday Jan 11, 2016 10:29 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
City of Rochester
Represented By
John Michael Campolieto
Office of the Corporation Counsel, City of Rochester
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Investigator Iacutone
Represented By
John Michael Campolieto
Office of the Corporation Counsel, City of Rochester
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Sergeant DeBellis
Represented By
John Michael Campolieto
Office of the Corporation Counsel, City of Rochester
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Monroe County
Represented By
Howard Alvin Stark
Monroe County Law Department
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Michael Green
Represented By
Howard Alvin Stark
Monroe County Law Department
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Grace M. Carducci
Represented By
Howard Alvin Stark
Monroe County Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
James Schnitter
Represented By
Christina A. Agola
Christina A. Agola, PLLC
contact info
James Schnitter
-
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/11/2016 9:47 AM EST
Monday, April 08, 2013
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant James Schnitter, FILED. [899274] 13-1257 [Entered: 04/08/2013 09:27 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant James Schnitter, district court receipt # 0209-1778893, FILED.[899281] 13-1257 [Entered: 04/08/2013 09:29 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/05/2013, RECEIVED.[899284] 13-1257 [Entered: 04/08/2013 09:29 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/06/2013, RECEIVED.[899285] 13-1257 [Entered: 04/08/2013 09:30 AM]
Related: [-]
8 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant James Schnitter, FILED. Service date 04/08/2013 by CM/ECF.[899802] 13-1257 [Entered: 04/08/2013 12:10 PM]
Related: [-]
9 9 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant James Schnitter, FILED. Service date 04/08/2013 by CM/ECF.[899806] 13-1257 [Entered: 04/08/2013 12:13 PM]
Related: [-]
10 10 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant James Schnitter, FILED. Service date 04/08/2013 by CM/ECF.[899844] 13-1257 [Entered: 04/08/2013 12:27 PM]
Related: [-]
11 11 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant James Schnitter, informing Court of proposed due date 07/05/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 04/08/2013 by CM/ECF.[899845] 13-1257 [Entered: 04/08/2013 12:28 PM]
Related: [-]
16 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Grace M. Carducci, Michael Green and Monroe County, FILED. Service date 04/08/2013 by CM/ECF.[899935] 13-1257 [Entered: 04/08/2013 01:23 PM]
Related: [-]
17 17 NEW CASE MANAGER, Deborah Holmes, ASSIGNED.[900095] 13-1257 [Entered: 04/08/2013 02:52 PM]
Related: [-]