The Zone 999 L.L.C.
Member Case
Lead case is: 0:17-bk-26758
Lead case is: 0:17-bk-26758
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Thomas J Catliota |
Case #: | 0:17-bk-27010 |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 01, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
The Zone 999 L.L.C.
5851 Ammendale Rd
Beltsville, MD 20705-1264 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Greenbelt
6305 Ivy Lane, Suite 600
Greenbelt, MD 20770 |
Docket last updated: 12/20/2017 7:00 PM EST |
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
10
pgs
misc
VOLUNTARY Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 12/21 10:30 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by The Zone 999 L.L.C.. Chapter 11 Plan Exclusivity expires 04/20/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 06/19/2018. Schedule B due 01/4/2018. Schedule A/B due 01/4/2018. Schedule D due 01/4/2018. Schedule F due 01/4/2018. Schedule E/F due 01/4/2018. Schedule G due 01/4/2018. Schedule H due 01/4/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs due 01/4/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 01/4/2018. Incomplete Filings due 01/4/2018 (Nesse, Janet) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 12/21 10:31 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-27010 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 31860094. Fee amount 1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Support Document
Thu 12/21 10:49 AM
Support Document - Corporate Resolution Filed by Janet M. Nesse . (Nesse, Janet) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Line
Thu 12/21 11:15 AM
Line Regarding Federal Employment Identification Numbers on behalf of The Zone 999 L.L.C. Filed by Janet M. Nesse. (Nesse, Janet) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Joint Administration
Thu 12/21 11:51 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by The Zone 999 L.L.C.. (Fasano, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Service List | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 12/21 12:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by US Trustee - Greenbelt. (Kohen, Lynn) |
|
7 | 7
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Thu 12/21 1:49 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) Meeting to be held on 1/22/2018 at 01:00 PM at 341 meeting room 6th Floor at 6305 Ivy Ln., Greenbelt. Proofs of Claims due by 4/23/2018. (Whitfield, Jennifer) |
|
8 | 8
order
Directing Debtor(s) Counsel to Comply
Thu 12/21 2:52 PM
Order Directing Debtor(s) Counsel to Comply with Local Bankruptcy Rule 2016-1(b) . (McKenna, Shannon) |