Aerogroup International, LLC and Aerogroup Interna v. Wiesner Products, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11962
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-11962
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-51889 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Dec 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Wiesner Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aerogroup International, LLC and Aerogroup International Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 01/05 9:29 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51889 Closed (LMD) |
||
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Dismissal - Notice
Wed 01/03 9:35 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Aerogroup International Holdings LLC, Aerogroup International, LLC (Fay, Erin) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Deposition - Notice
Tue 01/02 6:06 PM
Notice of Deposition of Val A. Formica Filed by Aerogroup International, Inc.. (Fay, Erin) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Tue 01/02 5:02 PM
Notice of Service of First Set of Document Requests Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc. (Glorioso, Alessandra) Modified docket text on 1/3/2018 (LMD) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Deposition - Notice
Tue 01/02 5:00 PM
Notice of Deposition of Alena Margolis, Sandy Coviello, and Gail Telesco Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc. (Glorioso, Alessandra) |
|
25 | 25
order
Temporary Restraining Order
Tue 01/02 11:34 AM
Order Denying Temporary Restraining Order Order Signed on 1/2/2018. (LMD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Fri 12/29 7:18 PM
Notice of Service of Debtors' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Wiesner Products, Inc. Filed by Aerogroup International Holdings LLC, Aerogroup International, LLC (Flasser, Gregory) Modified docket text on 1/2/2018 (LMD) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Deposition - Notice
Fri 12/29 7:07 PM
Notice of Deposition of Wiesner Products, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Filed by Aerogroup International Holdings LLC, Aerogroup International, LLC (Flasser, Gregory) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Fri 12/29 6:50 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Denying Temporary Restraining Order Filed by Aerogroup International Holdings LLC, Aerogroup International, LLC. (Flasser, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi)
Wed 12/27 12:57 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Aerogroup International, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2017 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fay, Erin) Modified Text on 12/27/2017 (LB) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Appearance - Notice
Wed 12/27 12:48 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc. (Glorioso, Alessandra) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 12/27 12:38 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Declaration in Support
Wed 12/27 12:08 PM
Declaration in Support REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION of Declaration of Anand M. Jha Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Brief
Wed 12/27 12:06 PM
Brief REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION of Wiesner Products, Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Debtors' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra) |
|
16 | 16
motion
File Under Seal - Motion (B)
Wed 12/27 11:59 AM
Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Wiesner's Brief in Opposition to Debtors' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Declaration of Anand Jha Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
15 | 15
misc
Declaration in Support
Wed 12/27 11:51 AM
Declaration in Support Declaration of Alessandra Glorioso Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
14 | 14
misc
Declaration in Support
Wed 12/27 11:50 AM
[SEALED] Declaration in Support Declaration of Anand M. Jha Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Brief
Wed 12/27 11:48 AM
[SEALED] Brief Wiesner Products, Inc.'s Brief in Opposition to Debtors' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Wed 12/27 12:51 PM
Attorney Bruce Ewing and Alessandra Glorioso for Wiesner Products, Inc., Janet Weiss and Alessandra Glorioso for Wiesner Products, Inc., Daniel P. Goldberger and Alessandra Glorioso for Wiesner Products, Inc., Fara Sunderji and Alessandra Glorioso for Wiesner Products, Inc., Kaleb McNeely and Alessandra Glorioso for Wiesner Products, Inc. added to case Filed by Wiesner Products, Inc.. (Glorioso, Alessandra) |
||
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Service - Notice
Fri 12/22 3:34 PM
Notice of Service Filed by Aerogroup International, LLC and Aerogroup International Holdings LLC (Fay, Erin) |
|
11 | 11
order
Allow
Fri 12/22 2:39 PM
Order Granting Debtors' Expedited Motion to Schedule Hearing to Consider the Debtors' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Order Signed on 12/22/2017. (LCN) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv)
Fri 12/22 12:36 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Aerogroup International, LLC and Aerogroup International Holdings LLC Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2017 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Fay, Erin) |
|
9 | 9
motion
File Under Seal - Motion (A)
Fri 12/22 10:14 AM
Motion to File Under Seal Certain Portions of the Adversary Complaint, Exhibit A Thereto, and Related Memorandum Filed by Aerogroup International, LLC and Aerogroup International Holdings LLC. Objections due by 1/5/2018. (Fay, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Allow - Motion
Fri 12/22 9:55 AM
Motion to Allow / Debtors' Expedited Motion to Schedule Hearing to Consider the Debtors' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Filed by Aerogroup International, LLC and Aerogroup International Holdings LLC. (Fay, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
7 | 7
30+
pgs
misc
Memorandum of Law
Fri 12/22 9:49 AM
Memorandum of Law in Support of the Debtors' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Filed by Aerogroup International, LLC and Aerogroup International Holdings LLC. (Fay, Erin) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Memorandum of Law
Fri 12/22 9:23 AM
[SEALED]Memorandum of Law in Support of the Debtors' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Filed by Aerogroup International, LLC and Aerogroup International Holdings LLC. (Fay, Erin) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Temporary Restraining Order - Motion
Fri 12/22 9:20 AM
Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Filed by Aerogroup International, LLC and Aerogroup International Holdings LLC. (Fay, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
4 | 4
crditcrd
none
Fri 12/22 9:13 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51889 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8698933, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 12/22 9:08 AM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Wiesner Products, Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/20/2018. (Fay, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
2 | 2
misc
Exhibit
Fri 12/22 8:56 AM
[SEALED] Exhibit(s) / Verified Complaint for Declaratory Relief Against Wiesner Products, Inc. Filed by Aerogroup International, LLC and Aerogroup International Holdings LLC. (Fay, Erin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Fri 12/22 8:53 AM
Adversary case 17-51889 Complaint by Aerogroup International, LLC and Aerogroup International Holdings LLC against Wiesner Products, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 03/22/2018. (Fay, Erin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |