Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-30078

Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Harry C Dees, Jr
Case #: 3:17-ap-03038
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2017
Terminated:Sep 20, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Z Ministries, Inc.
150 West Market Street Suite 800
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Z Ministries, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Joseph J. Zupetz
16500 County Road 327
Buena Vista, CO 81211
Represented By
Joseph J. Zupetz
contact info
Plaintiff
Douglas R. Adelsperger, Trustee
Adelsperger & Kleven, LLP 111 West Wayne Street
Fort Wayne, IN 46802
Represented By
Edmund P. Kos
Kos & Associate
contact info
David M. Mustard
Kos & Associates
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Nancy J. Gargula
100 East Wayne Street, 5th Floor
South Bend, IN 46601


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Saturday, August 29, 2020
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sun 08/30 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Judgment
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sun 08/30 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/29/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Judgment
Thursday, August 27, 2020
19 19 order Judgment Thu 08/27 3:13 PM
Amended Agreed Judgment With Payment Incentives Related [+]. (dlh)
Related: [-] 16 Proposed Agreed Judgment filed by Defendant Z Ministries, Inc., Defendant Joseph J. Zupetz, Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger, Trustee
18 18 order Judgment Thu 08/27 2:55 PM
Order Releasing Judgment and Closing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (dlh)
Related: [-] 15 Report filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger, Trustee
Friday, August 14, 2020
17 17 misc Proposed Order Fri 08/14 3:30 PM
Proposed Order Releasing Judgment and Closing Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger, Trustee (Kos, Edmund)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Proposed Agreed Judgment Fri 08/14 3:28 PM
Proposed Agreed Judgment (Amended) With Payment Incentives Filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger, Trustee, Defendants Z Ministries, Inc., Joseph J. Zupetz (Kos, Edmund)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Report(BK) Fri 08/14 3:25 PM
Report Motion to Enter Amended Agreed Judgment, Release Judgment, and Close Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger, Trustee (Kos, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 15, 2018
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Fri 03/16 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 03/15/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
13 13 6 pgs order Order Tue 03/13 1:37 PM
Agreed Judgment With Payment Incentives Related [+]. (dlh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger, Trustee
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
12 12 misc Proposed Agreed Judgment Tue 03/06 1:41 PM
Proposed Agreed Judgment with Payment Incentives Filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger, Trustee, Defendants Z Ministries, Inc., Joseph J. Zupetz (Kos, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Thu 01/25 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 01/24/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 File
Monday, January 22, 2018
10 10 order File Mon 01/22 1:38 PM
Order Related [+]. Documents due by 1/29/2018. (dlh)
Related: [-] 9 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Z Ministries, Inc.
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/17 3:24 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Z Ministries, Inc. (dlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2017
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 12/27 3:07 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons on Joseph J. Zupetz 12/27/2017 (served to Florida address) . (Mustard, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 12/27 3:02 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons on Joseph J. Zupetz 12/27/2017 (served to Colorado address) . (Mustard, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 12/27 2:55 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons on Z Ministries, Inc. 12/27/2017 . (Mustard, David)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 24, 2017
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Mon 12/25 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 12/24/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Summons Issued
Friday, December 22, 2017
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 12/22 8:55 AM
Summons Issued on Z Ministries, Inc. Date Issued 12/22/2017, Answer Due 1/22/2018; Joseph J. Zupetz Date Issued 12/22/2017, Answer Due 1/22/2018. (dlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2017
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/21 3:17 PM
Notice of Appearance by David M. Mustard Filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger, Trustee (Mustard, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/21 3:14 PM
Notice of Appearance by Edmund P. Kos Filed by Plaintiff Douglas R. Adelsperger, Trustee (Kos, Edmund)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/21 2:51 PM
Adversary case 17-03038 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Complaint by Douglas R. Adelsperger, Trustee against Z Ministries, Inc., Joseph J. Zupetz. Fee Amount $350. (Kos, Edmund)
Related: [-]