Neal Goulas v. Lagreca Services, Incorporated, et al
Original Case: 2:12-cv-00898
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:13-pcf-30651 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2013 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2014 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 11, 2016 1:07 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
LAGRECA SERVICES, INCORPORATED, doing business as LaGreca Transportation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHARLES P. LAGRECA, JR., individually and on behalf of said entities as owner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
NEAL P. GOULAS
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 26 2014
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [13-30651 Affirmed ] Judge: PEH , Judge: JLD , Judge: JEG Mandate pull date is 03/19/2014 [13-30651] |