California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:18-bk-10443
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2018
Discharged:Dec 26, 2023
Terminated:Jan 19, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Oct 03, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Eclipse Berry Farms, LLC
11812 San Vicente Blvd Ste 250
Los Angeles, CA 90049-6632
Represented By
Kevin H Morse
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 2 minutes ago
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
869 869 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report (UST Form 11-PCR) Tue 01/23 8:26 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2023 -[Post-confirmation Report (POS Attached)]- Filed by Attorney Trustee of the EBF Liquidation Trust. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
868 868 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 01/19 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 866 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
867 867 court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 01/19 3:00 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - FINAL DECREE. The plan of reorganization in the above referenced bankruptcy case has been fully implemented. An application for a Final Decree closing this case was granted by the Court and it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, the bond is exonerated, and this case is therefore closed. (sf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
866 866 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Wed 01/17 10:22 AM
Order Granting Ex Parte Application to destroy Documents Submited to the Court Under Seal (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/17/2024 (SF)
Related: [-] 864
865 865 misc Notice of Lodgment Wed 01/17 8:51 AM
Notice of lodgment Filed by Attorney Trustee of the EBF Liquidation Trust Related [+]. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-] 864 Ex parte application -[Ex Parte Application To Destroy Documents Submitted To The Court Under Seal; Declaration Of John-Patrick M. Fritz In Support (POS Attached)]-
864 864 motion Ex parte application (motion) Wed 01/17 8:39 AM
Ex parte application -[Ex Parte Application To Destroy Documents Submitted To The Court Under Seal; Declaration Of John-Patrick M. Fritz In Support (POS Attached)]- Filed by Attorney Trustee of the EBF Liquidation Trust (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]