Member Case
Lead case is: 2:18-bk-10443

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:18-bk-10453
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2018
Discharged:Dec 26, 2023
Terminated:Jan 19, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Oct 19, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC
11812 San Vicente Blvd Ste 250
Los Angeles, CA 90049-6632
Represented By
Kevin H Morse
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Friday, January 19, 2024
37 37 court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 01/19 10:57 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed - FINAL DECREE. The plan of reorganization in the above referenced bankruptcy case has been fully implemented. An application for a Final Decree closing this case was granted by the Court and it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, the bond is exonerated, and this case is therefore closed. (SF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 12/28 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Order on Final Decree and Order Closing Case or for an Order Closing Case on Interim Basis - Chapter 11 (BNC-PDF)
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 12/28 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 12/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 11 (Form 3180C1) (BNC)
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
34 34 2 pgs order ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 11 (Form 3180C1) (BNC) Tue 12/26 4:06 PM
ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Chapter 11 (BNC) for Debtor (SF)
Related: [-]
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Final Decree and Order Closing Case or for an Order Closing Case on Interim Basis - Chapter Tue 12/26 4:05 PM
Order on Motion For Final Decree and Order Closing Case. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/26/2023. (SF)
Related: [-] []
Friday, January 14, 2022
32 32 claims Withdrawal of Claim Fri 01/14 4:00 PM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 18 Filed by Creditor Employment Development Department. (Puertas-Samara, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
31 31 misc Notice of Change of Address (multi) Tue 10/26 8:51 AM
Notice of Change of Address . (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
30 30 claims Withdrawal of Claim Tue 11/13 3:13 PM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 17 Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC. (Puertas-Samara, Amelia)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 21, 2018
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Mon 10/22 9:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/21/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan (BNC-PDF)
Friday, October 19, 2018
28 28 order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan (BNC-PDF) Fri 10/19 10:46 AM
Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan (BNC-PDF) - Order entered on 10/3/2018 in lead case of jointly administered 18-10443BR Signed on 10/19/2018. (Fortier, Stacey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
27 27 misc Monthly Operating Report Wed 10/17 6:52 AM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 9. For the Month Ending September 30, 2018 Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC. (Morse, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
26 26 misc Monthly Operating Report Tue 09/18 11:13 AM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 8. For the Month Ending August 31, 2018 Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC. (Morse, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
25 25 misc Monthly Operating Report Fri 08/10 3:38 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 7. For the Month Ending July 31, 2018 Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC. (Morse, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 02, 2018
24 24 claims Withdrawal of Claim Mon 08/06 11:19 AM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 14 Filed by Creditor California Department of Food and Agriculture. (Ventura, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 12, 2018
23 23 misc Monthly Operating Report Thu 07/12 12:52 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 6. For the Month Ending June 30, 2018 Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC. (Morse, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
22 22 claims Withdrawal of Claim Wed 07/11 10:37 AM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 12 Filed by creditor Pedro Estrada Lopezre: Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC. (Ventura, Olivia)
Related: [-]
21 21 claims Withdrawal of Claim Wed 07/11 10:34 AM
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 11 Filed by creditor Rosa Elia Ramirez Lopezre: Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC. (Ventura, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
20 20 misc Monthly Operating Report Tue 06/12 7:49 AM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 5. For the Month Ending May 31, 2018 Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC. (Morse, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
19 19 misc Monthly Operating Report Tue 05/15 10:15 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 4. For the Month Ending April 30, 2018 Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC. (Morse, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
18 18 misc Monthly Operating Report Wed 04/11 10:02 AM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 3. For the Month Ending March 31, 2018 Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC. (Morse, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
17 17 misc Monthly Operating Report Tue 03/06 5:09 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 2. For the Month Ending February 28, 2018 Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC. (Morse, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
16 16 misc Monthly Operating Report Wed 02/28 5:08 PM
Monthly Operating Report. Operating Report Number: 1. For the Month Ending January 2018 Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC. (Morse, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2018
15 15 notice Notice of Bar Date For Filing Proofs of Claim (Ch 11) Mon 02/19 12:48 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claim in a Chapter 11 (with Proof of Service) Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC. (Morse, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2018
14 14 misc List of Equity Security Holders Mon 02/12 9:36 AM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC Related [+]. (Morse, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thursday, February 08, 2018
13 13 misc Chapter 11 or Chapter 9: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insi Thu 02/08 5:53 PM
Schedule A/B Non-Individual: Property (Official Form 106A/B or 206A/B) , Schedule D Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Official Form 106D or 206D) , Schedule E/F Non-Individual: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Official Form 106F or 206F) , Schedule G Non-Individual: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Official Form 106G or 206G) , Schedule H Non-Individual: Your Codebtors (Official Form 106H or 206H) , Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individual (Official Form 106Sum or 206Sum) , Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Form 104 or 204) (Amended) , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filing for Bankruptcy (Official Form 107 or 207) Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC Related [+]. (Morse, Kevin)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
12 12 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Thu 02/08 9:18 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Fritz, John-Patrick. (Fritz, John-Patrick)
Related: [-]
11 11 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Thu 02/08 9:11 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Neale, David. (Neale, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2018
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 01/26 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion For Joint Administration (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
9 9 order Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) Wed 01/24 4:24 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration (BNC-PDF) on Lead Case 2:18-bk-10443 with Member Case 2:18-bk-10453BR and 18-10464BR Related [+] Signed on 1/24/2018. (Fortier, Stacey)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
8 8 misc Notice of Lodgment Tue 01/23 2:51 PM
Notice of lodgment of Order in Bankruptcy Case Re; Debtors' Motion for an Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Cases.....(with proof of service) Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC Related [+]. (Sarenas, Lovee)
Related: [-] 3 Motion for Joint Administration - Debtors' Motion for an Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Cases Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(B) (with proof of service)
Att: 1 Exhibit a
Sunday, January 21, 2018
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 01/21 9:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 01/21/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Friday, January 19, 2018
6 6 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Fri 01/19 2:15 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Lerner, Leib. (Lerner, Leib)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Fri 01/19 12:03 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/26/2018 at 01:15 PM at RM 7, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 4/27/2018. (Ventura, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2018
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 01/18 10:01 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC
3 3 motion Joint Administration (motion) Thu 01/18 2:01 PM
Motion for Joint Administration - Debtors' Motion for an Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Cases Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(B) (with proof of service) Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC (Sarenas, Lovee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
2 2 misc Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR F1007-1) Tue 01/16 10:41 AM
Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) Filed by Debtor Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC. (Morse, Kevin)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 01/16 10:37 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Harvest Moon Strawberry Farms, LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 01/30/2018. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/30/2018. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/30/2018. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 01/30/2018. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/30/2018. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/30/2018. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/30/2018. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/30/2018. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 01/30/2018. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 01/30/2018. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/30/2018. Incomplete Filings due by 01/30/2018. (Morse, Kevin)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 01/16 10:39 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(2:18-bk-10453) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 46282176. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Case Reassigned (Manual) Tue 01/16 2:54 PM
Judge Barry Russell added to case due to related case 2:18-bk-10443-BR. Involvement of Judge Robert N. Kwan Terminated (Fleming, Lachelle)
Related: [-]