Sweet v. The Wellcare Group LLC, d/b/a Chesaning Nursing an
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-30077
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-30077
Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Daniel S Oppermanflint |
Case #: | 4:18-ap-03005 |
Nature of Suit | 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jan 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 28, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
The Wellcare Group LLC, d/b/a Chesaning Nursing and Rehabilitation Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel D. Sweet
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
court
Copy of
Tue 06/18 1:53 PM
Copy of: Order Granting Kerr, Russell And Weber, PLC's Motion To Withdraw As Counsel For The Patel Parties (entered in debtor's bankruptcy). (kcm) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
order
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise)
Tue 05/28 4:11 PM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 5/28/19, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Daniel S. Opperman. (kcm) |
|
36 | 36
court
Copy of
Tue 05/28 3:58 PM
Copy of: Order Granting Motion Under Fed. R. Bankrup. P. 9019 To Authorize And Approve Settlement Agreement By and between The Chapter 7 Trustee And The Patel Parties (entered in debtor's bankruptcy) (kcm) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 05/28 4:17 PM
Disposition of Adversary 4:18-ap-3005 : Settled. (kcm) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 05/28 4:18 PM
Adversary Case 4:18-ap-3005 Closed. (kcm) |
||
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
stipulated order
Tue 09/11 12:03 PM
ORDER REGARDING JOINT ADMINISTRATION OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS . (Mum, J) |
|
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation
Tue 09/11 11:28 AM
Stipulation By and Between Chapter 7 Trustee and Defendants Re: Entry of Order Regarding Joint Administration of Adversary Proceedings . Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Response to Discovery
Mon 09/10 11:31 AM
Amended Response to Discovery Filed by Defendant The Wellcare Group, LLC . (Blasses, William) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 09/05 4:15 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet . (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Request for Production of Documents
Wed 09/05 4:14 PM
Request for Production of Documents (Amended) to Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
audio
.
Wed 08/29 6:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/29/2018 3:21:55 PM ]. File Size [ 7348 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:30:37 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP)
Wed 08/29 4:23 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Telephone Status Conference to be held on 10/02/2018 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. (JAM) |
||
court
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP)
Wed 08/29 4:23 PM
Minute Entry. Protocol placed on record. Hearing Adjourned. Hearing scheduled 10/02/2018 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. (JAM) |
||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
court
Notice of Hearing (AP)
Wed 08/22 8:40 AM
Notice of Hearing . Hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 01:30 PM Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St. for26 , (JAM) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
answer
Response
Tue 08/21 10:34 PM
Response to Filed by Defendant The Wellcare Group, LLC (Blasses, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
court
Minute Entry. Status Conference Held
Thu 08/16 9:13 AM
Minute Entry. Status Conference Held. (JAM) |
||
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
court
Notice of Hearing (AP)
Tue 08/14 10:25 AM
Notice of Status Conference. Status Conference to be held on 8/15/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. (JAM) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Compel
Tue 08/07 10:20 AM
Motion to Compel Regarding Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
stipulated order
Fri 08/03 1:03 PM
Protective Order . (Mum, J) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/02 2:56 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff, Defendant Re: Entry of Protective Order . Filed by Defendant The Wellcare Group, LLC. (Blasses, William) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Response to Discovery
Mon 07/09 5:41 PM
Response to Discovery Filed by Defendant The Wellcare Group, LLC . (Blasses, William) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 06/05 11:08 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet . (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Response to Discovery
Tue 06/05 11:08 AM
Response to Discovery Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet . (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 06/01 8:21 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet . (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Interrogatories
Fri 06/01 8:21 AM
Interrogatories , Request for Production of Documents Defendant The Wellcare Group LLC, d/b/a Chesaning Nursing and Rehabilitation Center Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Initial Scheduling/Status Conference (AP)
Fri 05/25 10:20 AM
Order Scheduling Telephonic Status Conference - Telephonic Status Conference to be held on 08/29/2018 at 01:30 PM. (Mum, J) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/16 10:52 PM
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1),, Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant The Wellcare Group, LLC. (Blasses, William) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/16 4:52 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet . (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1)
Wed 05/16 4:51 PM
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Interrogatories
Thu 05/10 4:17 PM
Interrogatories DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF Filed by Defendant The Wellcare Group, LLC. (Blasses, William) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 05/09 12:04 PM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 7/2/2019 at 01:30PM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. Trial date set for 7/30/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. (JAM) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
court
Minute Entry. Scheduling Order To Be Issued
Tue 05/01 11:36 AM
Minute Entry. 26f report filed. Scheduling Order To Be Issued (JAM ) |
||
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference
Mon 04/30 3:29 PM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference
Wed 04/04 9:57 AM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 5/9/2018 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom, Flint, 226 West Second St.. (JAM) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Tue 04/03 11:27 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership of The Wellcare Group LLC Filed by Defendant The Wellcare Group, LLC. (Blasses, William) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/03 11:26 AM
Certificate of Service of Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant The Wellcare Group, LLC . (Blasses, William) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/03 11:24 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by The Wellcare Group, LLC. (Blasses, William) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Extend (Sua Sponte)
Fri 03/16 10:22 AM
Order Extending Deadline For Defendant To File Response To Complaint - Extended to 04/03/2018 . (Mum, J) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Thu 03/15 4:03 PM
Stipulation By and Between Samuel D. Sweet, Chapter 7 Trustee and The Wellcare Group LLC d/b/a Chesaning Nursing and Rehabilitation Center Re: Entry of Order Extending Deadline to File Response to Complaint through April 3, 2018 . Filed by Defendant The Wellcare Group, LLC. (Bank, Jason) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Extend (order)
Thu 02/15 4:17 PM
Order Extending Answer Deadline, Waiving Any Further Service Of Summons And Complaint, And Consenting To Jurisdiction - Extended to 03/15/2018 . (Mum, J) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Thu 02/15 3:57 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendant Re: Entry of Order Extending Answer to Deadline, Waiving Any Further Service of Summons and Complaint, and Consenting to Jurisdiction . Filed by Plaintiff Samuel D. Sweet. (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 01/17 3:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on The Wellcare Group, LLC 1/16/2018 (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Tue 01/16 12:00 PM
Summons Issued on The Wellcare Group LLC, d/b/a Chesaning Nursing and Rehabilitation Center Answer Due 02/15/2018 (Kochis, Anthony) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/16 12:00 PM
Adversary case 18-03005 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Samuel D. Sweet against The Wellcare Group LLC, d/b/a Chesaning Nursing and Rehabilitation Center. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Kochis, Anthony) |