Phillips 66 Company v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-50085
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-50085
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig A Gargotta |
Case #: | 5:18-ap-05008 |
Nature of Suit | 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 05, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP c/o Toby L. Gerber 2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3600
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deutsche Bank AG, New York Branch
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP c/o Toby L. Gerber 2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3600
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
First River Energy, LLC
1862 W. Bitters
San Antonio, TX 78248 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raymond W. Battaglia
3511 Broadway
San Antonio, TX 78209 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillips 66 Company
Andrews Kurth Kenyon LLP c/o David A. Zdunkewicz 600 Travis, Suite 4200
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 06/05 7:16 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Luna, Emilio) |
||
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 05/08 11:54 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by David A. Zdunkewicz for Plaintiff Phillips 66 Company (Zdunkewicz, David) |
|
Sunday, May 06, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/06 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 05/06/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
AP-Regarding Matter (PDF)
Fri 05/04 1:29 PM
Agreed Order in Interpleader (Order entered on 5/4/2018) (Luna, Emilio) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
court
Update Answer Due Date (Adversary)
Thu 04/12 12:25 PM
Deutsche Bank AG, New York Branch, answer deadline updated to 5/11/2018 and Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas answer deadline updated to 5/11/2018 (Luna, Emilio) |
||
court
Update Answer Due Date (Adversary)
Thu 04/12 12:37 PM
Raymond W. Battaglia answer deadline updated to 5/11/2018 and First River Energy, LLC, answer deadline updated to 5/11/2018. (Luna, Emilio) |
||
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Wed 04/11 1:42 PM
Stipulation Regarding Answer Date to Complaint in Interpleader by Phillips 66 Company filed by Steve A. Peirce for Defendants Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, First River Energy, LLC, Plaintiff Phillips 66 Company (Peirce, Steve) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
court
Update Answer Due Date (Adversary)
Thu 04/05 9:48 AM
Raymond W. Battaglia answer deadline updated to 4/11/2018; Deutsche Bank AG, New York Branch answer deadline updated to 4/11/2018; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas answer deadline updated to 4/11/2018; and First River Energy, LLC answer deadline updated to 4/11/2018. (Luna, Emilio) |
||
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
court
Update Answer Due Date (Adversary)
Wed 03/14 8:48 AM
Phillips 66 Company answer deadline updated to 4/11/2018 (Lornes, Sylvia) |
||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Mon 03/12 4:21 PM
Stipulation Regarding Answer Date to Complaint in Interpleader by Phillips 66 Company filed by Steve A. Peirce for Defendants Deutsche Bank AG, New York Branch, First River Energy, LLC, Plaintiff Phillips 66 Company (Peirce, Steve) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Adversary Summons Served
Fri 02/23 1:27 PM
Summons Served on Raymond W. Battaglia - served on 2/23/2018; Deutsche Bank AG, New York Branch - served on 2/23/2018; Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas - served on 2/23/2018; First River Energy, LLC - served on 2/23/2018 (Zdunkewicz, David) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
AP-Obtain Summons Service (F)
Thu 02/22 4:26 PM
Order to Obtain Summons Service on Deutsch Bank Trust Company Americas; Deutsch Bank AG, New York Branch; First River Energy, LLC; and Raymond W. Battaglia, Receiver. (Order entered on 2/22/2018) (Luna, Emilio) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
~Document (Adversary)
Tue 02/20 1:46 PM
Stipulation Regarding Answer Date to Complaint in Interpleader by Phillips 66 Company filed by Michael M. Parker for Defendants Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, First River Energy, LLC, Plaintiff Phillips 66 Company (Parker, Michael) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (Auto)
Fri 01/19 12:45 PM
Summons Issued on Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas Answer Due 02/20/2018; Deutsche Bank AG, New York Branch Answer Due 02/20/2018; First River Energy, LLC Answer Due 02/20/2018; Raymond W. Battaglia Answer Due 02/20/2018 (Zdunkewicz, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/19 12:45 PM
Adversary case 18-05008 Complaint filed by Phillips 66 Company (attorney David A. Zdunkewicz) against Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank AG, New York Branch, First River Energy, LLC, Raymond W. Battaglia (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other))). (Zdunkewicz, David) |