Original Case: 8:10-cv-01958

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:13-cv.pr-02096
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2013
Terminated:Jun 06, 2014
Last checked: Sunday Jan 10, 2016 10:16 PM EST
Defendant
DOES 1-10
Defendant
GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant
GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Defendant
GEICO CORPORATION
Defendant - Appellant
GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Ze-wen Julius Chen
AKIN, GUMP, STRAUSS, HAUER & FELD, LLP
contact info
Hyland Hunt
AKIN, GUMP, STRAUSS, HAUER & FELD, LLP
contact info
Eric Hemmendinger
SHAWE & ROSENTHAL, LLP
contact info
Pratik A. Shah
AKIN, GUMP, STRAUSS, HAUER & FELD, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Ze-wen Julius Chen
AKIN, GUMP, STRAUSS, HAUER & FELD, LLP
contact info
Hyland Hunt
AKIN, GUMP, STRAUSS, HAUER & FELD, LLP
contact info
Eric Hemmendinger
SHAWE & ROSENTHAL, LLP
contact info
Pratik A. Shah
AKIN, GUMP, STRAUSS, HAUER & FELD, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LAVERNE HOLMES
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LEAH HAMILTON
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RANDALL STEWART
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MICHAEL RUSSELL
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHRISTOPHER SULLIVAN
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
THOMAS STURGIS
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RICKY MCCRACKEN
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOSEPH MILES, JR.
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
EBERHARD GROSSER
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DENNIS FULTON
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
PATRICK WEISE
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
THOMAS DAVIDSON, JR.
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SHANNON BOYD
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ANTHONY DEAN, JR.
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
FRANCISCO NOGALES
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOHN GHETTI
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
GERALD DEXTER
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CLAUDE REIHER
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
STEVEN MCBRIDE
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MICHAEL BROWN
Plaintiff - Appellee
PHILLIP RONDELLO
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ROBERT MERRY
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
WILLIAM DOLINSKY
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MICHAEL HEADLEY
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
AARON KULSIC
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
KENNETH MILLER
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MICHAEL CREAMER
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
GEORGE WOOD
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ROBERT DEMARTINO
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOHN HALLIDAY
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JAMES L. HANSON
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
THOMAS F. BRADY
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DANA FERRIN
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MAUREEN AYLING
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CANDIDO CUBERO
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
THOMAS FITZGERALD
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SAMUEL CALDERON, individually and on behalf of other similarly situated individuals
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MARVIN HOURIGAN
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DAVID MCCAMLEY
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
AUGUSTUS STANSBURY, JR.
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOAN BISCHOFF
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RANDALL GIBSON
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
VINCENT GRECO
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
TERESA HARTEY-ADAMETZ
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
THOMAS LOWE
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DAVID MCENRY
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JENNIFER RICCA
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ANITA SINGH
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
BRYAN UTTERBACK
Represented By
Timothy Clayton Selander
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info
Matthew Hale Morgan
NICHOLS KASTER, PLLP
contact info

GPO Jun 06 2014
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 8:10-cv-01958-RWT. [999370950]. [13-2096, 13-2149]

Docket last updated: 01/10/2016 9:20 PM EST
Thursday, September 05, 2013
1 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:10-cv-01958-RWT. Case manager: SWiley. 13-2096 (SAW)
Related: [-]
2 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 8:10-cv-01958-RWT. Mailed to: S. Hora, P. Lukas, M. Morgan, T. Selander. 13-2096 (SAW)
Related: [-]