Maryland District Court
Judge:Roger W Titus
Case #: 8:10-cv-01958
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2010
Terminated:Aug 28, 2013
Defendant
Does 1-10
Defendant
Geico Casualty Company
Defendant
GEICO Corporation
Defendant
Geico General Insurance Company
Defendant
Geico Indemnity Company
Defendant
Government Employees Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Aaron Kulsic
Plaintiff
Anita Singh
Plaintiff
Anthony Dean Jr.
Plaintiff
Augustus Stansbury Jr.
Plaintiff
Bryan Utterback
Plaintiff
Candido Cubero
Plaintiff
Christopher Sullivan
Plaintiff
Claude Reiher
Plaintiff
Dana Ferrin
Plaintiff
David McCamley
Plaintiff
David McEnry
Plaintiff
Dennis Fulton
Plaintiff
Eberhard Grosser
Plaintiff
Francisco Nogales
Plaintiff
George Wood
Plaintiff
Gerald Dexter
Plaintiff
James L. Hanson
Plaintiff
Jennifer Ricca
Plaintiff
Joan Bischoff
Plaintiff
John Ghetti
Plaintiff
John Halliday
Plaintiff
Joseph Miles Jr.
Plaintiff
Kenneth Miller
Plaintiff
Laverne Holmes
Plaintiff
Leah Hamilton
Plaintiff
Marvin Hourigan
Plaintiff
Maureen Ayling
Plaintiff
Michael Brown
Plaintiff
Michael Creamer
Plaintiff
Michael Headley
Plaintiff
Michael Russell
Plaintiff
Patrick Weise
Plaintiff
Phillip Rondello
Plaintiff
Randall Gibson
Plaintiff
Randall Stewart
Plaintiff
Ricky McCracken
Plaintiff
Robert DeMartino
Plaintiff
Robert Merry
Plaintiff
Samuel Calderon
Plaintiff
Shannon Boyd
Plaintiff
Steven McBride
Plaintiff
Teresa Hartey-Adametz
Plaintiff
Thomas Davidson Jr.
Plaintiff
Thomas F. Brady
Plaintiff
Thomas Fitzgerald
Plaintiff
Thomas Lowe
Plaintiff
Thomas Sturgis
Plaintiff
Vincent Greco
Plaintiff
William Dolinsky

GPO Oct 15 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 10/15/2010. (kn, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Jan 12 2011
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 1/12/2011. (kn, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Feb 14 2012
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 2/14/2012. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Nov 29 2012
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 11/29/2012. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Jul 14 2014
MEMORANDUM/ORDER scheduling further telephone status conference for August 26, 2014 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 7/14/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Aug 27 2014
MEMORANDUM/ ORDER scheduling telephone status conference for September 15, 2014 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 8/26/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.